This case was last updated from PACER on 12/10/2020 at 05:16:44 (UTC).

California Professional Firefi, et al v. USEPA, et al

Case Summary

On 12/08/2020 California Professional Firefi filed an Other lawsuit against USEPA. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-73578

  • Filing Date:

    12/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Petitioners

LEARNING DISABILITIES ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA

CALIFORNIA COMMUNITIES AGAINST TOXICS

CALIFORNIA PROFESSIONAL FIREFIGHTERS

SIERRA CLUB

Respondents

ANDREW WHEELER, Administrator, United States Environmental Protection Agency

U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Sharmeen Morrison

Attorney at Earthjustice

48 Wall Street, 15Th Floor

New York, NY 10005

Lakendra Barajas

Attorney at Earthjustice

48 Wall Street, 15Th Floor

New York, NY 10005

Tosh Sagar

Attorney at Earthjustice

1001 G Street Nw, Suite 1000

Washington, DC 20001

Respondent Attorney

Jessica O'Donnell

Attorney at DOJ - U.S. Department of Justice

P.O. Box 7611, Ben Franklin Station

Washington, DC 20044-7611

 

Court Documents

1 #5

Case Opening Packet

1 #4

Petition for Review

1 #3

Mediation Letter

1 #2

Notice to all Parties and Counsel

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) FILED PETITION FOR REVIEW. DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. NOTIFIED RESPONDENTS OF FILING. SEND MQ: Yes. Petitioners California Communities Against Toxics, California Professional Firefighters, Learning Disabilities Association of America and Sierra Club Mediation Questionnaire due on 12/15/2020. Petitioner brief due 02/26/2021 for California Communities Against Toxics, California Professional Firefighters, Learning Disabilities Association of America and Sierra Club. Respondent brief due 03/29/2021 for U.S. Environmental Protection Agency and Andrew Wheeler. Petitioner's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11918900] (JMR) [Entered: 12/08/2020 01:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CALIFORNIA COMMUNITIES AGAINST TOXICS is a litigant

Latest cases where California Professional Firefighters is a litigant

Latest cases where Andrew Wheeler, Administrator of the United States Environmental Protection Agency is a litigant

Latest cases where U.S. Environmental Protection Agency is a litigant