This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 06/25/2021 at 06:11:42 (UTC).

California Chamber of Commerce v. Rob Bonta, et al

Case Summary

On 04/26/2021 California Chamber of Commerce filed a Civil Right - State Statute Constitutionality lawsuit against Rob Bonta. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-15745

  • Filing Date:

    04/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - State Statute Constitutionality

 

Party Details

Defendants

XAVIER BECERRA

ROB BONTA

Intervenor Defendant / Appellant

COUNCIL FOR EDUCATION AND RESEARCH ON TOXICS, a California public benefit corporation

Plaintiff / Appellee

CALIFORNIA CHAMBER OF COMMERCE

Intervenors

PENNY NEWMAN

CHEMICAL TOXIN WORKING GROUP INC. DBA HEALTHY LIVING FOUNDATION INC.

Amicus Curiae

CONSUMER BRANDS ASSOCIATION, AMERICAN BAKERS ASSOCIATION, AMERICAN BEVERAGE ASSOCIATION, CALIFORNIA GRAIN AND FEED ASSOCIATION, CALIFORNIA LEAGUE OF FOOD PRODUCERS, CALIFORNIA GROCERS ASSOCIATION, CALIFORNIA RETAILERS ASSOCIATION, CALIFORNIA SEED ASS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Intervenor Defendant / Appellant Attorney

Raphael Metzger Esquire

Attorney at Metzger Law Group

555 E. Ocean Boulevard, Suite 800

Long Beach, CA 90802

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

David Barnes

Attorney at Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP

Three Embarcadero Center, 10Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111-4024

S. Zachary Fayne

Attorney at Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP

Three Embarcadero Center, 10Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111-4024

Trenton H. Norris Esquire

Attorney at Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP

Three Embarcadero Center, 10Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111-4024

Intervenor Attorney

Aida Poulsen

Attorney at Poulsen Law P.C.

282 11Th Avenue, Suite 2612

New York, NY 10001

Amicus Curiae Attorney

Jeffrey B. Margulies

Attorney at Fulbright & Jaworski LLP

555 South Flower Street, 41St Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

#33

32 #2

Amicus Curiae Brief of Consumer Brands Association, et al.

32 #1

Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief ISO Plaintiff-Appellee and Aiffirma

29 #2

Additional Document

29 #1

Main Document

28 #2

Additional Document

28 #1

Main Document

#26

#25

#10

#9

#7

#5

#3

#2

1 #3

Mediation Letter

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

#1

Docketing Letter

41 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/24/2021
  • Docket(#34) Entered appearance of Amici Curiae - Pending Consumer Brands Association, et al. [12153079] (KWG) [Entered: 06/24/2021 09:51 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) Filed (ECF) Intervenor - Pending Chemical Toxin Working Group Inc. dba Healthy Living Foundation Inc. response to motion ([ # 28 ] Motion (ECF Filing), [ # 28 ] Motion (ECF Filing)). Date of service: 06/23/2021. [12152825] [21-15745] (Poulsen, Aida) [Entered: 06/23/2021 11:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review and filed Motion to become amicus curiae. Submitted by Consumer Brands Association, American Bakers Association, American Beverage Association, California Grain and Feed Association, California League of Food Producers, California Grocers Association, California Retailers Association, et al.. Date of service: 06/23/2021. [12152804] [21-15745] (Margulies, Jeffrey) [Entered: 06/23/2021 09:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) Received 6 paper copies of Answering Brief [ # 25 ] filed by California Chamber of Commerce. [12152176] (AML) [Entered: 06/23/2021 01:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) Received 3 paper copies of supplemental excerpts of record [ # 26 ] in 1 volume(s) filed by Appellee California Chamber of Commerce. [12152162] (KWG) [Entered: 06/23/2021 01:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) Filed (ECF) Appellee California Chamber of Commerce response opposing motion ([ # 21 ] Motion (ECF Filing), [ # 21 ] Motion (ECF Filing) motion to intervene). Date of service: 06/21/2021. [12150100] [21-15745] (Norris, Trenton) [Entered: 06/21/2021 08:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) Filed (ECF) Appellee California Chamber of Commerce Motion for miscellaneous relief [Request for Leave to File Objection]. Date of service: 06/21/2021. [12150038] [21-15745] (Norris, Trenton) [Entered: 06/21/2021 05:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) Filed clerk order: The answering brief [ # 25 ] submitted by California Chamber of Commerce is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 6 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification (attached to the end of each copy of the brief) that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: red. The supplemental excerpts of record [ # 26 ] submitted by California Chamber of Commerce are filed. Within 7 days of this order, filer is ordered to file 3 copies of the excerpts in paper format securely bound on the left side, with white covers. The paper copies shall be submitted to the principal office of the Clerk. [12149120] (KT) [Entered: 06/21/2021 11:17 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) Submitted (ECF) supplemental excerpts of record. Submitted by Appellee California Chamber of Commerce. Date of service: 06/16/2021. [12149108]--[COURT ENTERED FILING to correct entry [ # 25 ].] (KT) [Entered: 06/21/2021 11:14 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) Submitted (ECF) Answering Brief for review. Submitted by Appellee California Chamber of Commerce. Date of service: 06/16/2021. [12146557] [21-15745]--[COURT UPDATE: attached corrected PDF of answering brief, removed PDF of supplemental excerpts of record, re-entered correctly in entry [ # 26 ]. 06/21/2021 by KT] (Norris, Trenton) [Entered: 06/16/2021 05:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant settlement discussions while the appeal is pending. [12109170] (BLS) [Entered: 05/11/2021 12:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Filed (ECF) Appellant Council For Education and Research On Toxics reply to response (motion to stay lower court action, ). Date of service: 05/10/2021. [12107271] [21-15745] (Metzger, Raphael) [Entered: 05/10/2021 10:35 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • Docket(#8) - Xavier Becerra in 21-15745 substituted by - Rob Bonta in 21-15745 [12107235] (TYL) [Entered: 05/10/2021 10:23 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Filed (ECF) Appellee California Chamber of Commerce response opposing motion ([ # 5 ] Motion (ECF Filing), [ # 5 ] Motion (ECF Filing)). Date of service: 05/06/2021. [12105182] [21-15745] (Norris, Trenton) [Entered: 05/06/2021 05:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: AC): The court has received appellants emergency motion for a stay pending appeal. Any response to that motion is due Thursday, May 6, 2021. The optional reply in support of the motion is due Monday, May 10, 2021. [12100966] (OC) [Entered: 05/04/2021 09:07 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Filed (ECF) Appellant Council For Education and Research On Toxics EMERGENCY Motion to stay lower court action. Date of service: 04/30/2021. [12098563] [21-15745] (Metzger, Raphael) [Entered: 04/30/2021 02:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • Docket(#4) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 04/29/2021. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[12097530]. [21-15745] (AD) [Entered: 04/29/2021 06:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Filed (ECF) Appellant Council For Education and Research On Toxics Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 04/29/2021. [12097009] [21-15745] (Metzger, Raphael) [Entered: 04/29/2021 01:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: TSP): The appeal filed April 21, 2021, is a preliminary injunction appeal. Accordingly, Ninth Circuit Rule 3-3 shall apply. The mediation questionnaire is due three days after the date of this order. If they have not already done so, within 7 calendar days after the filing date of this order, the parties shall make arrangements to obtain from the court reporter an official transcript of proceedings in the district court that will be included in the record on appeal. The briefing schedule shall proceed as follows: the opening brief and excerpts of record are due not later than May 19, 2021; the answering brief is due June 16, 2021 or 28 days after service of the opening brief, whichever is earlier; and the optional reply brief is due within 21 days after service of the answering brief. See 9th Cir. R. 3-3(b). No streamlined extensions of time will be approved. See 9th Cir. R. 31-2.2(a)(3). Any request for an extension of time to file a brief must be made by written motion under Ninth Circuit Rule 31-2.2(b). Failure to file timely the opening brief shall result in the automatic dismissal of this appeal by the Clerk for failure to prosecute. See 9th Cir. R. 42-1. [12088243] (OC) [Entered: 04/27/2021 10:59 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: To be set. Preliminary Injunction Appeal, C.R. 3-3. [12087000] (JBS) [Entered: 04/26/2021 02:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COUNCIL FOR EDUCATION AND RESEARCH ON TO- is a litigant

Latest cases where California Chamber of Commerce is a litigant

Latest cases where THE CHEMICAL TOXIN WORKING GROUP INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jeffrey Margulies