This case was last updated from PACER on 09/14/2019 at 06:03:04 (UTC).

Cadet v. Silva

Case Summary

On 07/16/2019 Cadet filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Silva. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, First Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1697

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, First Circuit

 

Party Details

Petitioner / Appellant

PIERRE PAUL CADET

Norfolk, MA 02056-0000

Respondent / Appellee

STEVEN SILVA, Superintendent

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner / Appellant Attorney

Pierre Paul Cadet

Attorney at MCI Norfolk

Po Box 43

Norfolk, MA 02056-0000

Respondent / Appellee Attorney

Jennifer Kay Zalnasky

Attorney at MA Attorney General's Office

1441 Main St, Ste 1200

Springfield, MA 01103-1400

 

Court Documents

Open Document #2

Affidavit to Accompany Motion for IFP

Open Document #1

Main Document

Open Document #2

Case Opening Notice

Open Document

ORDER advising petitioner the request for a certificate of appealability will be submitted to this court for a decision. Date of denial by district court: May 30, 2019. [19-1697] (GK) [Entered: 08/27/2019 01:23 PM]

Open Document

MOTION to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Appellant Pierre Paul Cadet. Certificate of service dated 08/07/2019. [19-1697] (ALW) [Entered: 08/16/2019 03:01 PM]

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Document #1

Order

Open Document #3

Notice Regarding Native PDF

Open Document

SUPPLEMENTAL record filed. Docket entries: 71 (Electronic Order entered on August 26, 2019 by Judge Stearns [69] granting Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis). [19-1697] (GK) [Entered: 08/27/2019 01:18 PM]

Open Document

COURTESY Copy of Notice of Appeal filed by Appellant Pierre Paul Cadet. Certificate of service was not included. [19-1697] CLERK'S NOTE: Docket entry was edited to replace an attachment and to modify the file date. (ALW) [Entered: 07/23/2019 04:17 PM]

Open Document

MOTION for certificate of appealability filed by Appellant Pierre Paul Cadet. Certificate of service dated 07/06/2019. [19-1697] (AL) [Entered: 07/16/2019 04:40 PM]

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Document #1

Abbreviated Record

Open Restricted Document #1

Motion

Open Document

ORDER transmitting Motion to Proceed In Form Pauperis to the district court for a ruling. [19-1697] (TS) [Entered: 08/19/2019 12:03 PM]

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER advising petitioner the request for a certificate of appealability will be submitted to this court for a decision. Date of denial by district court: May 30, 2019. [19-1697] (GK) [Entered: 08/27/2019 01:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • Request to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal filed by Appellant Pierre Paul Cadet was granted in the district court by order dated 08/26/2019. [19-1697] (GK) [Entered: 08/27/2019 01:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUPPLEMENTAL record filed. Docket entries: 71 (Electronic Order entered on August 26, 2019 by Judge Stearns [69] granting Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis). [19-1697] (GK) [Entered: 08/27/2019 01:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER transmitting Motion to Proceed In Form Pauperis to the district court for a ruling. [19-1697] (TS) [Entered: 08/19/2019 12:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • AFFIDAVIT in support of motion to proceed in forma pauperis [ # 6275518-2 ] filed by Appellant Pierre Paul Cadet. Certificate of service was not included. [19-1697] (ALW) [Entered: 08/16/2019 03:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Appellant Pierre Paul Cadet. Certificate of service dated 08/07/2019. [19-1697] (ALW) [Entered: 08/16/2019 03:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • AFFIDAVIT in support of motion to proceed in forma pauperis [ # 6274640-2 ] filed by. Certificate of service dated 08/07/2019. [19-1697] (ALW) [Entered: 08/13/2019 02:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Appellant Pierre Paul Cadet. Certificate of service dated 08/07/2019. [19-1697] (ALW) [Entered: 08/13/2019 02:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Steven Silva filed by Attorney Jennifer K. Zalnasky. Certificate of service dated 08/09/2019. [19-1697] (JKZ) [Entered: 08/09/2019 04:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER entered: Petitioner-appellant has filed a request for a certificate of appealability in the court of appeals. However, this court cannot consider the request until appellant either pays the docketing fee or moves for in forma pauperis status in accordance with Fed. R. App. P. 24. Petitioner-appellant is advised that by August 13, 2019 , he must either 1) pay the $505 fee to the district court, or 2) file in the district court a motion to proceed in forma pauperis accompanied by Form 4, Financial Affidavit, and prison trust account statement, if incarcerated. See Fed. R. App. P. 24; Form 4. [19-1697]. CLERK'S NOTE: Docket entry was edited to modify the docket text. (TS) [Entered: 07/23/2019 12:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COURTESY Copy of Notice of Appeal filed by Appellant Pierre Paul Cadet. Certificate of service was not included. [19-1697] CLERK'S NOTE: Docket entry was edited to replace an attachment and to modify the file date. (ALW) [Entered: 07/23/2019 04:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION for certificate of appealability filed by Appellant Pierre Paul Cadet. Certificate of service dated 07/06/2019. [19-1697] (AL) [Entered: 07/16/2019 04:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #66) filed by Appellant Pierre Paul Cadet. Fee due 07/30/2019. [19-1697]. CLERK'S NOTE: Docket entry was edited to modify the docket text. (TS) [Entered: 07/16/2019 02:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.