This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 04/27/2019 at 06:08:25 (UTC).

Cabelas LLC v. Matthew Highby

Case Summary

On 02/26/2019 Cabelas LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Matthew Highby. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1423

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees and Defendants

HIGHBY OUTDOORS LLC, a Nebraska limited liability company

MATTHEW HIGHBY, an individual

MOLLY HIGHBY, an individual

Plaintiff / Appellant

CABELAS LLC, a Delaware limited liability company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee and Defendant Attorneys

Karen R. Poppel Esq.

Attorney at RatnerPrestia

1007 Orange Street, Suite 205

Wilmington, DE 19801

Jeffrey B. Bove Esq.

Attorney at RatnerPrestia

1007 Orange Street, Suite 205

Wilmington, DE 19801

Andrew J. Koopman Esq.

Attorney at RatnerPrestia

2200 Renaissance Boulevard, Suite 350

King Of Prussia, PA 19406

Rex A. Donnelly Esq. IV

Attorney at RatnerPrestia

1007 Orange Street, Suite 205

Wilmington, DE 19801

Christopher H. Blaszkowski Esq.

Attorney at RatnerPrestia

1007 Orange Street, Suite 205

Wilmington, DE 19801

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Matthew W. Walch Esq.

Attorney at Latham & Watkins

330 North Wabash Avenue, Suite 2800

Chicago, IL 60611

Sarah Gragert Esq.

Attorney at Latham & Watkins

555 11Th Street, N.W., Suite 1000

Washington, DC 20004

Kevin M. Coen Esq.

Attorney at Morris Nichols Arsht & Tunnell

1201 North Market Street, 16Th Floor, P.O. Box 1347

Wilmington, DE 19801

Alexandra M. Cumings Esq.

Attorney at Morris Nichols Arsht & Tunnell

1201 North Market Street, 16Th Floor, P.O. Box 1347

Wilmington, DE 19801

David John Teklits Esq.

Attorney at Morris Nichols Arsht & Tunnell

1201 North Market Street, 16Th Floor, P.O. Box 1347

Wilmington, DE 19801

Michael Bern Esq.

Attorney at Latham & Watkins

555 11Th Street, N.W., Suite 1000

Washington, DC 20004

Reuben J. Stob Esq.

Attorney at Latham & Watkins

140 Scott Drive

Menlo Park, CA 94025

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/15/2019
  • HARD COPY RECEIVED from Appellant Cabelas LLC - Reply Brief. Copies: 7. (KEL) [Entered: 04/15/2019 03:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC REPLY BRIEF on behalf of Appellant Cabelas LLC, filed. Certificate of Service dated 04/11/2019 by ECF. [19-1423] (AMC) [Entered: 04/11/2019 11:49 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • HARD COPY RECEIVED from Appellees Matthew Highby and Molly Highby - Brief. Copies: 7. (SJB) [Entered: 04/04/2019 03:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC BRIEF on behalf of Appellees Matthew Highby and Molly Highby, filed. Certificate of Service dated 04/04/2019 by ECF. [19-1423] (JBB) [Entered: 04/04/2019 11:23 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER (MCKEE, SHWARTZ and FUENTES, Circuit Judges) The unopposed motion to seal Appendix Volume III is granted but nothing herein prohibits the Court from including information embodied in Volume III in its publicly filed opinion if it determines that the information has been mentioned in public filings, is not confidential, or the disclosure of the information would not result in a clearly defined and serious injury. See Publicker Indus., Inc. v. Cohen, 733 F.2d 1059, 1071 (3d Cir. 1984), filed. McKee, Authoring Judge. (CJG) [Entered: 04/03/2019 09:33 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • HARD COPY RECEIVED from Appellant Cabelas LLC - Joint Appendix. Copies: 4. Volumes: 3 (Volume I attached to Brief and Volume III UNDER SEAL). (MCW) [Entered: 03/18/2019 01:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • HARD COPY RECEIVED from Appellant Cabelas LLC - Brief with Volume I of Appendix attached. Copies: 7. (LM) [Entered: 03/15/2019 02:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: SEALED ELECTRONIC JOINT APPENDIX on behalf of Appellant Cabelas LLC, filed. Certificate of Service dated 03/14/2019 by ECF. [19-1423] (AMC) [Entered: 03/14/2019 11:38 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC JOINT APPENDIX on behalf of Appellant Cabelas LLC, filed. Certificate of service dated 03/14/2019 by ECF. [19-1423] (AMC) [Entered: 03/14/2019 11:36 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC BRIEF with Volume I of Appendix attached on behalf of Appellant Cabelas LLC, filed. Certificate of Service dated 03/14/2019 by ECF. [19-1423] (AMC) [Entered: 03/14/2019 11:31 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Cabelas LLC, filed. [19-1423] (KMC) [Entered: 02/26/2019 07:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Cabelas LLC, filed. [19-1423] (KMC) [Entered: 02/26/2019 07:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Matthew W. Walch on behalf of Appellant(s) Cabela's LLC. [19-1423] (KMC) [Entered: 02/26/2019 07:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Reuben J. Stob on behalf of Appellant(s) Cabela's LLC. [19-1423] (KMC) [Entered: 02/26/2019 07:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Sarah M. Gragert on behalf of Appellant(s) Cabela's LLC. [19-1423] (KMC) [Entered: 02/26/2019 07:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Michael E. Bern on behalf of Appellant(s) Cabela's LLC. [19-1423] (KMC) [Entered: 02/26/2019 07:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Alexandra M. Cumings on behalf of Appellant(s) Cabela's LLC. [19-1423] (KMC) [Entered: 02/26/2019 07:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Kevin M. Coen on behalf of Appellant(s) Cabela's LLC. [19-1423] (KMC) [Entered: 02/26/2019 07:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (TMK) [Entered: 02/26/2019 10:16 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Cabela's LLC in District Court No. 1-18-cv-01223. (TMK) [Entered: 02/26/2019 10:12 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Cabelas, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sarah M. Gragert

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David John Teklits

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kevin Michael Coen