This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 01/27/2021 at 17:44:24 (UTC).

C. L. v. Del Amo Hospital, Inc., et al

Case Summary

On 09/12/2019 C L filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Del Amo Hospital, Inc . This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-56074

  • Filing Date:

    09/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

DEL AMO HOSPITAL, INC., a California corporation

DOES, 1-10, inclusive

Plaintiff / Appellant

C. L., an individual

Amicus Curiae

NATIONAL DISABILITY RIGHTS NETWORK, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF PEOPLE WITH DISABILITIES, AUTISTIC SELF ADVOCACY NETWORK, DISABILITY RIGHTS CALIFORNIA, MENTAL HEALTH AMERICA, NATIONAL COUNCIL ON INDEPENDENT LIVING, and PSYCHIATRIC SERVICE DOG PARTNERS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Scott D. Buchholz Esquire

Attorney at Dummit, Buchholz & Trapp

101 West Broadway

San Diego, CA 92101

Ernest W. Klatte Esquire III

Attorney at Klatte, Budensiek & Young-Agriesti

20341 Sw Birch Street, Suite 200

Newport Beach, CA 92660-1514

Ernest William Klatte III

Attorney at Klatte, Budensiek & Young-Agriesti, LLP

100 Bayview Circle, Suite 4500

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Moira Brennan

Attorney at Dummit, Buchholz & Trapp

101 West Broadway

San Diego, CA 92101

Raul L. Martinez Esquire

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP

633 W. 5Th Street, Suite 4000

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Christopher H. Knauf

Attorney at Disability Rights Legal Center

1541 Wilshire Blvd., Suite 400

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Julia Garrison

Attorney at BRAZELON CENTER FOR MENTAL

1101 - 15Th St, Nw

Washington, DC 20005

Celia McGuinness Esquire

Attorney at Derby, McGuinness & Goldsmith LLP

1999 Harrison Street, Suite 1800

Oakland, CA 94612

Alexandra M. Robertson Esquire

Attorney at Disability Rights Legal Center

1541 Wilshire Blvd., Suite 400

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Jennifer Mathis

Attorney at BAZELON CENTER FOR MENTAL HEALTH LAW

1101 15Th Street, N.W.

Washington, DC 20005

Amicus Curiae Attorneys

Adam R. Lawton

Attorney at Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP

350 South Grand Avenue, 50Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Gina F. Elliott

Attorney at Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP

350 South Grand Avenue, 50Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

#35

19 #1

Main Document

19 #2

Addendum

#45

#62

#59

#58

#53

#52

#50

#48

#46

#43

#41

#40

#37

#36

#31

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#62) Filed Audio recording of oral argument. Note: Video recordings of public argument calendars are available on the Court's website, at # http://www.ca9.uscourts.gov/media/ [11926627] (DLM) [Entered: 12/14/2020 02:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • Docket(#61) ARGUED AND SUBMITTED TO RONALD M. GOULD, RYAN D. NELSON and BRIAN M. COGAN. [11924279] (DLM) [Entered: 12/11/2020 12:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • Docket(#60) Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice by Attorney Gina F. Elliott for Amicus Curiae NDRN. Hearing in Pasadena on 12/11/2020 at 09:30 A.M. (Courtroom: 3). Filer sharing argument time: Yes. (Argument minutes: 3.) Special accommodations: NO. Filer admission status: I certify that I am admitted to practice before this Court. Date of service: 11/25/2020. [11906756] [19-56074] (Elliott, Gina) [Entered: 11/25/2020 01:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#59) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: OC) Plaintiff-Appellant C.L. and Amicis joint motion for leave to allow Amici to participate in oral argument is GRANTED. Fifteen minutes is allotted to Plaintiff-Appellant and Defendants-Appellees. Per the parties agreement, counsel for Plaintiff-Appellant will be allotted twelve minutes, and counsel for Amici will be allotted three minutes. [11903939] (OC) [Entered: 11/23/2020 03:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#58) Filed (ECF) Amicus Curiae NDRN Joint Motion for miscellaneous relief [Motion for Leave to Divide Oral Argument Time]. Date of service: 11/20/2020. [11901616] [19-56074] (Elliott, Gina) [Entered: 11/20/2020 02:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • Docket(#57) Added Attorney(s) Gina F. Elliott for party(s) Amicus Curiae NDRN, in case 19-56074. [11900525] (QDL) [Entered: 11/20/2020 09:11 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • Docket(#56) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Gina F. Elliott (Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP, 350 S Grand Ave, Fiftieth Floor, Los Angeles, CA 90071) for Amicus Curiae NDRN. Date of service: 11/20/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11900500] [19-56074] (Elliott, Gina) [Entered: 11/20/2020 08:56 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • Docket(#55) Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice by Attorney Raul L. Martinez, Esquire for Appellee Del Amo Hospital, Inc.. Hearing in Pasadena on 12/11/2020 at 09:30 A.M. (Courtroom: Courtroom 3). Filer sharing argument time: No. (Argument minutes: 15.) Special accommodations: NO. Filer admission status: I certify that I am admitted to practice before this Court. Date of service: 11/12/2020. [11891054] [19-56074] (Martinez, Raul) [Entered: 11/12/2020 03:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • Docket(#54) Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice by Attorney Mr. Christopher H. Knauf for Appellant C. L.. Hearing in Pasadena on 12/11/2020 at 09:30 A.M. (Courtroom: Courtroom 3). Filer sharing argument time: Yes. (Argument minutes: 12.) Special accommodations: NO. Filer admission status: I certify that I am admitted to practice before this Court. Date of service: 11/12/2020. [11890157] [19-56074] (Knauf, Christopher) [Entered: 11/12/2020 11:29 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#53) Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [ # 23 ] submitted by National Disability Rights Network; et al., is filed. No additional paper copies are required. [11885288] (SML) [Entered: 11/06/2020 04:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
42 More Docket Entries
  • 10/08/2019
  • Docket(#10) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Celia McGuinness (Derby, McGuinness & Goldsmith LLP, 300 Lakeside Drive, Suite 1000, Oakland CA 94612) for Appellant C. L.. Date of service: 10/07/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11457776] [19-56074] (McGuinness, Celia) [Entered: 10/08/2019 11:17 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • Docket(#9) Added Attorney(s) Alexandra M. Robertson for party(s) Appellant C. L., in case 19-56074. [11451834] (QDL) [Entered: 10/02/2019 02:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • Docket(#8) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Alexandra M. Robertson (Knauf Associates, 2001 Wilshire Blvd., Suite 305, Santa Monica, California 90403) for Appellant C. L.. Date of service: 10/02/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11451814] [19-56074] (Robertson, Alexandra) [Entered: 10/02/2019 02:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: The Mediation Program of the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals facilitates settlement while appeals are pending. By 10/11/2019, counsel for all parties intending to file briefs in this matter are requested to inform the Circuit Mediator by email of their clients' views on whether the issues on appeal or the underlying dispute might be amenable to settlement presently or in the foreseeable future. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested... This communication should not be filed with the court... The existing briefing schedule remains in effect... [11445728] (CL) [Entered: 09/27/2019 08:59 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Filed (ECF) Appellee Del Amo Hospital, Inc. Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 09/19/2019. [11437831] [19-56074] (Brennan, Moira) [Entered: 09/19/2019 03:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • Docket(#5) Added Attorney(s) Moira Brennan for party(s) Appellee Del Amo Hospital, Inc., in case 19-56074. [11437465] (QDL) [Entered: 09/19/2019 01:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • Docket(#4) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Moira Sioban Brennan (Dummit, Buchholz & Trapp, 101 W. Broadway, Suite 1400; San Diego, CA 92101) for Appellee Del Amo Hospital, Inc.. Date of service: 09/19/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11437339] [19-56074] (Brennan, Moira) [Entered: 09/19/2019 01:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • Docket(#3) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 09/19/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11437271][19-56074] (AD) [Entered: 09/19/2019 12:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellant C. L. Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 09/19/2019. [11437064] [19-56074] (Knauf, Christopher) [Entered: 09/19/2019 10:58 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 09/19/2019. Transcript ordered by 10/11/2019. Transcript due 11/12/2019. Appellant C. L. opening brief due 12/20/2019. Appellees Del Amo Hospital, Inc. and Does answering brief due 01/21/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11429328] (JBS) [Entered: 09/12/2019 09:51 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NATIONAL DISABILITY RIGHTS NETWORK, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where DEL AMO HOSPITAL, INC., a California corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Adam R. Lawton