This case was last updated from PACER on 03/07/2019 at 07:01:59 (UTC).

Byron Manning v. Nancy Berryhill

Case Summary

On 01/04/2019 Byron Manning filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Nancy Berryhill. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-15021

  • Filing Date:

    01/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

BYRON MANNING

Defendant / Appellee

NANCY A. BERRYHILL, Commissioner of Social Security Administration

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Oliver Ehlinger

Attorney at Legal Services of Northern California

1810 Capitol Street

Vallejo, CA 94590

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Edward Alan Olsen Esquire

Attorney at USSAC - Office of the US Attorney

501 I Street

Sacramento, CA 95814

Margaret Branick-Abilla Esquire

Attorney at Social Security Administration

160 Spear Street

San Francisco, CA 94105

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: The Mediation Program of the Ninth Cir. Court of Appeals facilitates settlement while appeals are pending. See FRAP 33 & Ninth Cir.R. 33-1. Mediation assessment conferences are not routinely scheduled in social security appeals. Csl are encouraged to contact circuit mediator if they believe this social security appeal has remand potential or is otherwise amenable to resolution. Specifically, csl are requested to contact the mediator if claimant has been awarded benefits after the district court's decision or if claimant is deceased. The mediator can also assist csl with procedural matters that may lead to the resolution of an appeal. Csl for the party contacting the Mediation Program are encouraged to copy csl for the other party to the appeal on any such requests. Info regarding the medation program may be found at www.ca9.uscourts.gov/mediation. [11152351] (MS) [Entered: 01/14/2019 02:51 PM]

#2

RESTRICTED

1 #4

Mediation Questionnaire

1 #3

Mediation Letter

1 #2

Case Opening Packet

#1

Docketing Letter

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/11/2019
  • (#6) Streamlined request [5] by Appellant Byron Manning to extend time to file the brief is approved. Amended briefing schedule: Appellant Byron Manning opening brief due 04/03/2019. Appellee Nancy A. Berryhill answering brief due 05/03/2019. The optional reply brief is due 21 days from the date of service of the answering brief. [11185186] (BG) [Entered: 02/11/2019 10:01 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • (#5) Filed (ECF) Streamlined request for extension of time to file Opening Brief by Appellant Byron Manning. New requested due date is 04/04/2019. [11185077] [19-15021] (Ehlinger, Oliver) [Entered: 02/11/2019 09:27 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: The Mediation Program of the Ninth Cir. Court of Appeals facilitates settlement while appeals are pending. See FRAP 33 & Ninth Cir.R. 33-1. Mediation assessment conferences are not routinely scheduled in social security appeals. Csl are encouraged to contact circuit mediator if they believe this social security appeal has remand potential or is otherwise amenable to resolution. Specifically, csl are requested to contact the mediator if claimant has been awarded benefits after the district court's decision or if claimant is deceased. The mediator can also assist csl with procedural matters that may lead to the resolution of an appeal. Csl for the party contacting the Mediation Program are encouraged to copy csl for the other party to the appeal on any such requests. Info regarding the medation program may be found at www.ca9.uscourts.gov/mediation. [11152351] (MS) [Entered: 01/14/2019 02:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • (#3) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 01/10/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11148516] (AD) [Entered: 01/10/2019 12:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Filed (ECF) Appellant Byron Manning Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 01/10/2019. [11148039] [19-15021] (Ehlinger, Oliver) [Entered: 01/10/2019 09:30 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 01/11/2019. Appellant Byron Manning opening brief due 03/04/2019. Appellee Nancy A. Berryhill answering brief due 04/02/2019. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11141468] (JMR) [Entered: 01/04/2019 10:47 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less