This case was last updated from PACER on 04/03/2020 at 06:02:54 (UTC).

B.W.C., et al v. Randall Williams, et al

Case Summary

On 02/03/2020 B W C filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Randall Williams. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eighth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-1222

  • Filing Date:

    02/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eighth Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellants

I.E.G.M.

Zach Baker, Individually

Michael W. Cheek

Brian Robinson

J.R.

Mykala N. Martin

W.B., a minor, by and through his parents and next of friends

Audrey Baker, Individually

Linda D. Cheek

B.W.C.

Amber Robinson

Defendant / Appellees

Crossroads Academy-Central Street

Randall Williams, Director of the Missouri Department of Health & Senior Services

Eva Copeland, in her individual capacity

Bobbie Grant, in his individual capacity

Karis Parker, in her individual capacity

Eric S. Schmitt, in his official capacity as Missouri Attorney General

Christina Stamper, in her individual capacity

Clever R-V School District

Miller County R-III School District

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Linus L. Baker

6732 W. 185Th Terrace

Stilwell, KS 66085-8922

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Angus White Dwyer

Attorney at SPENCER & FANE

Suite 1400, 1000 Walnut Street

Kansas City, MO 64106-2140

Stephanie Lovett-Bowman

Attorney at SPENCER & FANE

Suite 1400, 1000 Walnut Street

Kansas City, MO 64106-2140

Robert Hatley

Attorney at ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE

Suite 401, 615 E. 13Th Street

Kansas City, MO 64106

Dean John Sauer

Attorney at ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE

207 W. High Street, P.O. Box 899

Jefferson City, MO 65102-0000

Thomas A. Mickes Ph. D.

Attorney at MICKES & O'TOOLE

12444 Powerscourt Drive

Saint Louis, MO 63131

Grant D. Wiens

Attorney at MICKES & O'TOOLE

12444 Powerscourt Drive

Saint Louis, MO 63131

Steven D. Hall

Attorney at MICKES & O'TOOLE

12444 Powerscourt Drive

Saint Louis, MO 63131

 

Court Documents

Open Document

CLERK ORDER:Granting [ # 4897155-2 ] motion for extension of time to file brief filed by Mr. Dean John Sauer. Brief of Clever R-V School District, Eva Copeland, Crossroads Academy-Central Street, Bobbie Grant, Miller County R-III School District, Karis Parker, Eric S. Schmitt, Christina Stamper and Randall Williams due 04/23/2020. [4897215] [20-1222] (CMD) [Entered: 03/31/2020 08:27 AM]

Open Document

MOTION for extension of time to file brief until 04/23/2020, filed by Attorney Mr. Dean John Sauer for Appellees Mr. Eric S. Schmitt and Randall Williams w/service 03/30/2020. [4897155] [20-1222] (DJS) [Entered: 03/30/2020 04:44 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by D. John Sauer for Appellees Mr. Eric S. Schmitt and Randall Williams w/service 03/30/2020 [4896982] [20-1222] (DJS) [Entered: 03/30/2020 02:26 PM]

Open Document

CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Attorney Mr. Linus L. Baker for Appellants B.W.C., Ms. Audrey Baker, Mr. Zach Baker, Ms. Linda D. Cheek, Mr. Michael W. Cheek, I.E.G.M., J.R., Ms. Mykala N. Martin, Ms. Amber Robinson, Brian Robinson and W.B. correcting [ # 4886437-2 ] Submitted brief filed by Appellants. [4888990] [20-1222] THIS EVENT WAS MODIFIED TO REFLECT THE FILING OF A CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, NOT CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE.--[Edited 03/09/2020 by CMD] (LLB) [Entered: 03/07/2020 09:21 AM]

Open Document

ADDENDUM of APPELLANT FILED by Appellants B.W.C., Ms. Audrey Baker, Mr. Zach Baker, Ms. Linda D. Cheek, Mr. Michael W. Cheek, I.E.G.M., J.R., Ms. Mykala N. Martin, Ms. Amber Robinson, Brian Robinson and W.B. , w/service 03/03/2020 [4887439] [20-1222] (CMD) [Entered: 03/03/2020 03:50 PM]

Open Document

BRIEF FILED - APPELLANT BRIEF filed by B.W.C., Ms. Audrey Baker, Mr. Zach Baker, Ms. Linda D. Cheek, Mr. Michael W. Cheek, I.E.G.M., J.R., Ms. Mykala N. Martin, Ms. Amber Robinson, Brian Robinson and W.B.. w/service 03/01/2020 , Length: 12,980 words 10 COPIES OF PAPER BRIEFS (WITHOUT THE APPELLATE PDF FOOTER) FROM B.W.C., Audrey Baker, Zach Baker, Linda D. Cheek, Michael W. Cheek, I.E.G.M., J.R., Mykala N. Martin, Amber Robinson, Brian Robinson and W.B. due 03/09/2020 WITH certificate of service for paper briefs. Appellee/Responsive brief of Clever R-V School District, Eva Copeland, Crossroads Academy-Central Street, Bobbie Grant, Miller County R-III School District, Karis Parker, Eric S. Schmitt, Christina Stamper and Randall Williams due on 04/02/2020. [4887427] [20-1222] (CMD) [Entered: 03/03/2020 03:41 PM]

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Document

Addendum deficiency notice sent to counsel, Attorney Mr. Linus L. Baker for Appellants W.B., Brian Robinson, B.W.C., J.R., Ms. Mykala N. Martin, Mr. Michael W. Cheek, I.E.G.M., Ms. Linda D. Cheek, Ms. Amber Robinson, Mr. Zach Baker and Ms. Audrey Baker. New electronic copy of addendum due on 03/09/2020 [4887106] [20-1222] (CMD) [Entered: 03/03/2020 10:58 AM]

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Document

No Description Available

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Stephanie Lovett-Bowman for Appellee Crossroads Academy-Central Street w/service 02/05/2020 [4878443] [20-1222] (SL) [Entered: 02/05/2020 02:34 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Grant D. Wiens for Appellees Clever R-V School District, Mr. Bobbie Grant, Miller County R-III School District and Ms. Christina Stamper w/service 02/04/2020 [4877816] [20-1222] (SDH) [Entered: 02/04/2020 11:29 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Steven D. Hall for Appellees Clever R-V School District, Mr. Bobbie Grant, Miller County R-III School District and Ms. Christina Stamper w/service 02/04/2020 [4877808] [20-1222] (SDH) [Entered: 02/04/2020 11:23 AM]

Open Document

CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellants B.W.C., Ms. Audrey Baker, Mr. Zach Baker, Ms. Linda D. Cheek, Mr. Michael W. Cheek, I.E.G.M., J.R., Ms. Mykala N. Martin, Ms. Amber Robinson, Brian Robinson and W.B.. - FOR CAL [4877390] [20-1222] (LLB) [Entered: 02/03/2020 01:40 PM]

Open Document

METHOD of appendix preparation filed by Appellants B.W.C., Ms. Audrey Baker, Mr. Zach Baker, Ms. Linda D. Cheek, Mr. Michael W. Cheek, I.E.G.M., J.R., Ms. Mykala N. Martin, Ms. Amber Robinson, Brian Robinson and W.B. - Separate Appendix - w/service 02/03/2020 [4877388] [20-1222] (LLB) [Entered: 02/03/2020 01:38 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Linus L. Baker for Appellants B.W.C., Ms. Audrey Baker, Mr. Zach Baker, Ms. Linda D. Cheek, Mr. Michael W. Cheek, I.E.G.M., J.R., Ms. Mykala N. Martin, Ms. Amber Robinson, Brian Robinson and W.B. w/service 02/03/2020 [4877380] [20-1222] (LLB) [Entered: 02/03/2020 01:26 PM]

Open Document

BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Appendix due on 03/16/2020. BRIEF OF APPELLANT B.W.C., Audrey Baker, Zach Baker, Linda D. Cheek, Michael W. Cheek, I.E.G.M., J.R., Mykala N. Martin, Amber Robinson, Brian Robinson and W.B. due 03/16/2020. Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. [4877320] [20-1222] (RLS) [Entered: 02/03/2020 12:13 PM]

Open Document

Civil case docketed. [4877291] [20-1222] (RLS) [Entered: 02/03/2020 11:45 AM]

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK ORDER:Granting [ # 4897155-2 ] motion for extension of time to file brief filed by Mr. Dean John Sauer. Brief of Clever R-V School District, Eva Copeland, Crossroads Academy-Central Street, Bobbie Grant, Miller County R-III School District, Karis Parker, Eric S. Schmitt, Christina Stamper and Randall Williams due 04/23/2020. [4897215] [20-1222] (CMD) [Entered: 03/31/2020 08:27 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION for extension of time to file brief until 04/23/2020, filed by Attorney Mr. Dean John Sauer for Appellees Mr. Eric S. Schmitt and Randall Williams w/service 03/30/2020. [4897155] [20-1222] (DJS) [Entered: 03/30/2020 04:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by D. John Sauer for Appellees Mr. Eric S. Schmitt and Randall Williams w/service 03/30/2020 [4896982] [20-1222] (DJS) [Entered: 03/30/2020 02:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • DocketPaper copies Appellant/Petitioner Brief, [ # 4887427-2 ] filed by B.W.C., Ms. Audrey Baker, Mr. Zach Baker, Ms. Linda D. Cheek, Mr. Michael W. Cheek, I.E.G.M., J.R., Ms. Mykala N. Martin, Ms. Amber Robinson, Brian Robinson and W.B. 10 copies paper copies received. w/Addendum attached [4891237] [20-1222] (CMD) [Entered: 03/13/2020 03:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketRECORD FILED - APLNT/PET APPENDIX, 1 volumes, Location STL, Comments: 3 copies [4891241] [20-1222] (CMD) [Entered: 03/13/2020 03:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Attorney Mr. Linus L. Baker for Appellants B.W.C., Ms. Audrey Baker, Mr. Zach Baker, Ms. Linda D. Cheek, Mr. Michael W. Cheek, I.E.G.M., J.R., Ms. Mykala N. Martin, Ms. Amber Robinson, Brian Robinson and W.B. correcting [ # 4886437-2 ] Submitted brief filed by Appellants. [4888990] [20-1222] THIS EVENT WAS MODIFIED TO REFLECT THE FILING OF A CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, NOT CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE.--[Edited 03/09/2020 by CMD] (LLB) [Entered: 03/07/2020 09:21 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADDENDUM of APPELLANT FILED by Appellants B.W.C., Ms. Audrey Baker, Mr. Zach Baker, Ms. Linda D. Cheek, Mr. Michael W. Cheek, I.E.G.M., J.R., Ms. Mykala N. Martin, Ms. Amber Robinson, Brian Robinson and W.B. , w/service 03/03/2020 [4887439] [20-1222] (CMD) [Entered: 03/03/2020 03:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBRIEF FILED - APPELLANT BRIEF filed by B.W.C., Ms. Audrey Baker, Mr. Zach Baker, Ms. Linda D. Cheek, Mr. Michael W. Cheek, I.E.G.M., J.R., Ms. Mykala N. Martin, Ms. Amber Robinson, Brian Robinson and W.B.. w/service 03/01/2020 , Length: 12,980 words 10 COPIES OF PAPER BRIEFS (WITHOUT THE APPELLATE PDF FOOTER) FROM B.W.C., Audrey Baker, Zach Baker, Linda D. Cheek, Michael W. Cheek, I.E.G.M., J.R., Mykala N. Martin, Amber Robinson, Brian Robinson and W.B. due 03/09/2020 WITH certificate of service for paper briefs. Appellee/Responsive brief of Clever R-V School District, Eva Copeland, Crossroads Academy-Central Street, Bobbie Grant, Miller County R-III School District, Karis Parker, Eric S. Schmitt, Christina Stamper and Randall Williams due on 04/02/2020. [4887427] [20-1222] (CMD) [Entered: 03/03/2020 03:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAddendum of APPELLANT submitted for review by B.W.C., Ms. Audrey Baker, Mr. Zach Baker, Ms. Linda D. Cheek, Mr. Michael W. Cheek, I.E.G.M., J.R., Ms. Mykala N. Martin, Ms. Amber Robinson, Brian Robinson and W.B.. To open/view this addendum, you must first login to CM/ECF and then open the document link in your Notice of Docket Activity. [4887130] [20-1222] (LLB) [Entered: 03/03/2020 11:14 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAddendum deficiency notice sent to counsel, Attorney Mr. Linus L. Baker for Appellants W.B., Brian Robinson, B.W.C., J.R., Ms. Mykala N. Martin, Mr. Michael W. Cheek, I.E.G.M., Ms. Linda D. Cheek, Ms. Amber Robinson, Mr. Zach Baker and Ms. Audrey Baker. New electronic copy of addendum due on 03/09/2020 [4887106] [20-1222] (CMD) [Entered: 03/03/2020 10:58 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Stephanie Lovett-Bowman for Appellee Crossroads Academy-Central Street w/service 02/05/2020 [4878443] [20-1222] (SL) [Entered: 02/05/2020 02:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Grant D. Wiens for Appellees Clever R-V School District, Mr. Bobbie Grant, Miller County R-III School District and Ms. Christina Stamper w/service 02/04/2020 [4877816] [20-1222] (SDH) [Entered: 02/04/2020 11:29 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Steven D. Hall for Appellees Clever R-V School District, Mr. Bobbie Grant, Miller County R-III School District and Ms. Christina Stamper w/service 02/04/2020 [4877808] [20-1222] (SDH) [Entered: 02/04/2020 11:23 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellants B.W.C., Ms. Audrey Baker, Mr. Zach Baker, Ms. Linda D. Cheek, Mr. Michael W. Cheek, I.E.G.M., J.R., Ms. Mykala N. Martin, Ms. Amber Robinson, Brian Robinson and W.B.. - FOR CAL [4877390] [20-1222] (LLB) [Entered: 02/03/2020 01:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMETHOD of appendix preparation filed by Appellants B.W.C., Ms. Audrey Baker, Mr. Zach Baker, Ms. Linda D. Cheek, Mr. Michael W. Cheek, I.E.G.M., J.R., Ms. Mykala N. Martin, Ms. Amber Robinson, Brian Robinson and W.B. - Separate Appendix - w/service 02/03/2020 [4877388] [20-1222] (LLB) [Entered: 02/03/2020 01:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of transcript filed by Appellants B.W.C., Ms. Audrey Baker, Mr. Zach Baker, Ms. Linda D. Cheek, Mr. Michael W. Cheek, I.E.G.M., J.R., Ms. Mykala N. Martin, Ms. Amber Robinson, Brian Robinson and W.B.. No Transcript[4877386] [20-1222] (LLB) [Entered: 02/03/2020 01:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Linus L. Baker for Appellants B.W.C., Ms. Audrey Baker, Mr. Zach Baker, Ms. Linda D. Cheek, Mr. Michael W. Cheek, I.E.G.M., J.R., Ms. Mykala N. Martin, Ms. Amber Robinson, Brian Robinson and W.B. w/service 02/03/2020 [4877380] [20-1222] (LLB) [Entered: 02/03/2020 01:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Appendix due on 03/16/2020. BRIEF OF APPELLANT B.W.C., Audrey Baker, Zach Baker, Linda D. Cheek, Michael W. Cheek, I.E.G.M., J.R., Mykala N. Martin, Amber Robinson, Brian Robinson and W.B. due 03/16/2020. Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. [4877320] [20-1222] (RLS) [Entered: 02/03/2020 12:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, order dated 01/30/2020, judgment dated 01/30/2020. [4877304] [20-1222] (RLS) [Entered: 02/03/2020 11:57 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case docketed. [4877291] [20-1222] (RLS) [Entered: 02/03/2020 11:45 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stephanie Lovett-Bowman