This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 11/14/2021 at 06:10:55 (UTC).

Buxton R. Bailey, P.C. v. Alejandro Mayorkas

Case Summary

On 09/15/2021 Buxton R Bailey, P C filed an Other lawsuit against Alejandro Mayorkas. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-2011

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellants

BUXTON R. BAILEY, P.C.

PRESIDENT BUXTON REED BAILEY, Representing Buxton R. Bailey, P.C. and suing separately in his own name pro se

Raleigh, NC 27615

Defendant / Appellees

ALEJANDRO N. MAYORKAS, Secretary Department of Homeland Security

UR MENDOZA JADDOU, Director of U.S.Citizenship and Immigration Services

SUSAN DIBBINS, Chief Administrative Appeals Office

TAE D. JOHNSON, Acting Director of U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Buxton Reed Bailey

Attorney at BUXTON R. BAILEY, PC

126 Mine Lake Court

Raleigh, NC 27615

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Sharon Coull Wilson

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEY

150 Fayetteville Street

Raleigh, NC 27601-1461

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#4

#5

(#5) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Sharon C. Wilson, Assistant United States Attorney for Susan Dibbins, Ur Mendoza Jaddou, Tae D. Johnson and Alejandro N. Mayorkas. [1001025103] [21-2011] Sharon Wilson [Entered: 09/17/2021 11:43 AM]

#6

(#6) DOCKETING FORMS FOLLOW-UP NOTICE ISSUED to Buxton Reed Bailey and Buxton R. Bailey, P.C. re: filing of docketing statement. Docketing statement due from Buxton Reed Bailey and Buxton R. Bailey, P.C. on 10/12/2021, filing of appearance form. Appearance form due on 10/12/2021 from Buxton Reed Bailey, filing of disclosure form. Disclosure statement due from Buxton Reed Bailey and Buxton R. Bailey, P.C. on 10/12/2021. [21-2011] RE [Entered: 10/06/2021 11:54 AM]

#7

(#7) DOCKETING STATEMENT by Buxton Reed Bailey and Buxton R. Bailey, P.C.. [21-2011] Buxton Bailey [Entered: 10/06/2021 06:04 PM]

#8

(#8) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Buxton Reed Bailey and Buxton R. Bailey, P.C.. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1001037054] [21-2011] Buxton Bailey [Entered: 10/06/2021 06:05 PM]

#9

(#9) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Buxton Reed Bailey for Buxton Reed Bailey and Buxton R. Bailey, P.C.. [1001037055] [21-2011] Buxton Bailey [Entered: 10/06/2021 06:11 PM]

#10

(#10) MOTION by Buxton Reed Bailey and Buxton R. Bailey, P.C. to extend filing time for opening brief and appendix until 45 days from October 25, 2021 the current deadline... Date and method of service: 10/21/2021 ecf. [1001046624] [21-2011] Buxton Bailey [Entered: 10/22/2021 06:44 PM]

#11

(#11) ORDER filed updating/ resuming briefing order deadlines. Number of days granted; 21. Opening brief and appendix due 11/15/2021. Response brief due 12/13/2021. Paper copy requirements are temporarily suspended unless the case is under pre-argument review or being scheduled for argument, in which case a total of four paper copies of formal briefs and appendices are required. Copies to all parties. [1001046778] [21-2011] RE [Entered: 10/25/2021 09:32 AM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER filed updating/ resuming briefing order deadlines. Number of days granted; 21. Opening brief and appendix due 11/15/2021. Response brief due 12/13/2021. Paper copy requirements are temporarily suspended unless the case is under pre-argument review or being scheduled for argument, in which case a total of four paper copies of formal briefs and appendices are required. Copies to all parties. [1001046778] [21-2011] RE [Entered: 10/25/2021 09:32 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION by Buxton Reed Bailey and Buxton R. Bailey, P.C. to extend filing time for opening brief and appendix until 45 days from October 25, 2021 the current deadline... Date and method of service: 10/21/2021 ecf. [1001046624] [21-2011] Buxton Bailey [Entered: 10/22/2021 06:44 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Buxton Reed Bailey for Buxton Reed Bailey and Buxton R. Bailey, P.C.. [1001037055] [21-2011] Buxton Bailey [Entered: 10/06/2021 06:11 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Buxton Reed Bailey and Buxton R. Bailey, P.C.. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1001037054] [21-2011] Buxton Bailey [Entered: 10/06/2021 06:05 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) DOCKETING STATEMENT by Buxton Reed Bailey and Buxton R. Bailey, P.C.. [21-2011] Buxton Bailey [Entered: 10/06/2021 06:04 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) DOCKETING FORMS FOLLOW-UP NOTICE ISSUED to Buxton Reed Bailey and Buxton R. Bailey, P.C. re: filing of docketing statement. Docketing statement due from Buxton Reed Bailey and Buxton R. Bailey, P.C. on 10/12/2021, filing of appearance form. Appearance form due on 10/12/2021 from Buxton Reed Bailey, filing of disclosure form. Disclosure statement due from Buxton Reed Bailey and Buxton R. Bailey, P.C. on 10/12/2021. [21-2011] RE [Entered: 10/06/2021 11:54 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Sharon C. Wilson, Assistant United States Attorney for Susan Dibbins, Ur Mendoza Jaddou, Tae D. Johnson and Alejandro N. Mayorkas. [1001025103] [21-2011] Sharon Wilson [Entered: 09/17/2021 11:43 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) BRIEFING ORDER filed. Paper copy requirements are temporarily suspended unless the case is under pre-argument review or being scheduled for argument, in which case a total of four paper copies of formal briefs and appendices are required. Opening Brief and Appendix due 10/25/2021. Response Brief due 11/24/2021 [21-2011] RE [Entered: 09/15/2021 01:27 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case. Originating case number: 5:20-cv-00253-M. [21-2011] RE [Entered: 09/15/2021 01:22 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 5:20-cv-00253-M. Case manager: REdwards. [21-2011] RE [Entered: 09/15/2021 01:19 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Tae D. Johnson, Acting Director, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement is a litigant

Latest cases where Alejandro N. Mayorkas, Secretary, U.S. Department of Homeland Security is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sharon C. Wilson