This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 08/16/2021 at 06:09:28 (UTC).

Buffalo Xerographix Inc. v. Sentinel Insurance Company, Li

Case Summary

On 06/17/2021 Buffalo Xerographix Inc filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Sentinel Insurance Company, Li. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-1502

  • Filing Date:

    06/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

 

Party Details

Defendants

Hartford Accident & Indemnity Company

Twin City Fire Insurance Company

New England Insurance Company

Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company

Hartford Insurance Company of Illinois

Property and Casualty Insurance Company of Hartford

Pacific Insurance Company, Limited

The Hartford Insurance Group, AKA The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc.

Hartford Fire Insurance Company

New England Reinsurance Corporation

Trumbull Insurance Company

Plaintiff / Appellants

Shatkin F.I.R.S.T. LLC

Buffalo Xerographix Inc., for itself and on behalf of a class of similarly situated policyholders

Todd E. Shatkin DDS PLLC

Defendant / Appellees

Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest

Hartford Casualty Insurance Company

Sentinel Insurance Company, Limited

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Christopher M. Berloth

Attorney at Duke, Holzman, Photiadis & Gresens LLP

701 Seneca Street

Buffalo, NY 14210

Steven W. Klutkowski Esq.

Attorney at Duke, Holzman, Photiadis & Gresens LLP

701 Seneca Street

Buffalo, NY 14210

Thomas David Lyons Esq.

Attorney at Duke, Holzman, Photiadis & Gresens LLP

701 Seneca Street

Buffalo, NY 14210

Charles C. Ritter Esq. Jr.

Attorney at Duke, Holzman, Photiadis & Gresens LLP

701 Seneca Street

Buffalo, NY 14210

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Jonathan Freiman Esq.

Attorney at Wiggin and Dana LLP

1 Century Tower, 265 Church Street

New Haven, CT 06510

Charles A. Michael

Attorney at Steptoe & Johnson LLP

1114 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10036

Shai Silverman Esq.

Attorney at Wiggin and Dana LLP

437 Madison Avenue

New York, NY 10022

 

Court Documents

#39

#38

#37

33 #8

Form C - Addendum B

33 #7

Form C - Addendum A - Attach 5

33 #6

Form C - Addendum A - Attach 4

33 #5

Form C - Addendum A - Attach 3

33 #4

Form C - Addendum A - Attach 2

33 #3

Form C - Addendum A - Attach 1

33 #2

Form C - Addendum A

#32

#9

#8

#4

#3

#2

1 #2

Case FILED

#1

Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant Buffalo Xerographix Inc., Shatkin F.I.R.S.T. LLC and Todd E. Shatkin DDS PLLC Brief due date as 09/30/2021. Joint Appendix due date as 09/30/2021, FILED.[3140911] [21-1502] [Entered: 07/20/2021 02:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Buffalo Xerographix Inc., Shatkin F.I.R.S.T. LLC and Todd E. Shatkin DDS PLLC, informing Court of proposed due date 09/30/2021, RECEIVED. Service date 07/20/2021 by CM/ECF, email.[3140900] [21-1502] [Entered: 07/20/2021 02:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) NEW CASE MANAGER, Wilson Dudley, ASSIGNED.[3134164] [21-1502] [Entered: 07/08/2021 04:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) CURED DEFECTIVE FORM C, [ # 32 ], [ # 33 ], on behalf of Appellant Buffalo Xerographix Inc., Shatkin F.I.R.S.T. LLC and Todd E. Shatkin DDS PLLC, FILED.[3132692] [21-1502] [Entered: 07/07/2021 11:15 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Buffalo Xerographix Inc., Shatkin F.I.R.S.T. LLC and Todd E. Shatkin DDS PLLC, FILED. Service date 07/07/2021 by CM/ECF, email.[3132601] [21-1502] [Entered: 07/07/2021 10:36 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Form C, [23], on behalf of Appellant Buffalo Xerographix Inc., Shatkin F.I.R.S.T. LLC and Todd E. Shatkin DDS PLLC, FILED.[3132568] [21-1502] [Entered: 07/07/2021 10:20 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) ATTORNEY, Charles C. Ritter Jr. for Shatkin F.I.R.S.T. LLC Buffalo Xerographix Inc. Todd E. Shatkin DDS PLLC, in case 21-1502, [ # 22 ], ADDED.[3131526] [21-1502] [Entered: 07/06/2021 10:12 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) ATTORNEY, Thomas David Lyons for Shatkin F.I.R.S.T. LLC Buffalo Xerographix Inc. Todd E. Shatkin DDS PLLC, in case 21-1502, [ # 20 ], ADDED.[3131521] [21-1502] [Entered: 07/06/2021 10:09 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) ATTORNEY, Steven W. Klutkowski for Shatkin F.I.R.S.T. LLC Buffalo Xerographix Inc. Todd E. Shatkin DDS PLLC, in case 21-1502, [ # 21 ], ADDED.[3131525] [21-1502] [Entered: 07/06/2021 10:10 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Buffalo Xerographix Inc., Shatkin F.I.R.S.T. LLC and Todd E. Shatkin DDS PLLC, FILED. Service date 07/01/2021 by CM/ECF, email.[3131188] [21-1502] [Entered: 07/01/2021 06:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ATTORNEY,Jonathan Freiman, [ # 9 ], in place of attorney Charles A. Michael, SUBSTITUTED.[3123662] [21-1502] [Entered: 06/22/2021 11:26 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CURED DEFECTIVE NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, [ # 8 ], [ # 9 ], on behalf of Appellee Hartford Casualty Insurance Company, Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest and Sentinel Insurance Company, Limited, FILED.[3123656] [21-1502] [Entered: 06/22/2021 11:25 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Hartford Casualty Insurance Company, Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest and Sentinel Insurance Company, Limited, FILED. Service date 06/22/2021 by CM/ECF. [3123652] [21-1502] [Entered: 06/22/2021 11:21 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Notice of Appearance as Substitute Counsel, [7], on behalf of Appellee Hartford Casualty Insurance Company, Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest and Sentinel Insurance Company, Limited, FILED.[3123314] [21-1502] [Entered: 06/21/2021 06:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Hartford Casualty Insurance Company, Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest and Sentinel Insurance Company, Limited, FILED. Service date 06/21/2021 by CM/ECF. [3123182] [21-1502] [Entered: 06/21/2021 03:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • Docket(#5) PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Buffalo Xerographix Inc., Shatkin F.I.R.S.T. LLC and Todd E. Shatkin DDS PLLC, USCA receipt # 02094278554, FILED.[3122889] [21-1502] [Entered: 06/21/2021 12:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DISTRICT COURT JUDGEMENT, dated 06/16/2021, RECEIVED.[3122888] [21-1502] [Entered: 06/21/2021 12:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 06/16/2021, RECEIVED.[3122886] [21-1502] [Entered: 06/21/2021 12:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 05/19/2021, RECEIVED.[3122884] [21-1502] [Entered: 06/21/2021 12:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Buffalo Xerographix Inc., Shatkin F.I.R.S.T. LLC and Todd E. Shatkin DDS PLLC, FILED. [3122881] [21-1502] [Entered: 06/21/2021 12:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where New England Reinsurance Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where PACIFIC INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where HARTFORD CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, A FOREIGN INSURER is a litigant