This case was last updated from PACER on 06/23/2019 at 06:08:49 (UTC).

Bryant v. Matrix Trust Company

Case Summary

On 04/24/2019 Bryant filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Matrix Trust Company. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1149

  • Filing Date:

    04/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellee

MATRIX TRUST COMPANY, LLC, a Colorado limited liability company, FKA MG Trust Company, LLC

Plaintiff / Appellant

JEANNE B. BRYANT, solely in her capacity as court-appointed Independent Fiduciary for Retirement Security Plan and Trust

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Sarah L. Hartley

Attorney at Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner

1700 Lincoln Street, Suite 4100

Denver, CO 80203

Michael Peter Carey

Attorney at Bryan Cave

1201 West Peachtree Street, N.W., One Atlantic Center, Fourteenth Floor

Atlanta, GA 30309

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

James S. Helfrich

Attorney at Allen Vellone Wolf Helfrich & Factor

1600 Stout Street, Suite 1100

Denver, CO 80202

Matthew T. Christensen

Attorney at Angstman Johnson

199 North Capitol Boulevard, Suite 200

Boise, ID 83702

 

Court Documents

Open Document #2

Mediation Contact Form

Open Document #1

Mediation Conference Notice

Open Document

[10649024] Notice sent to Clerk of District Court that ROA completion notice has not been received. Notice due that record is complete by 05/23/2019 for Jeffrey P. Colwell, Clerk of Court. [19-1149] [Entered: 05/16/2019 07:05 AM]

Open Document

[10647364] Entry of appearance filed by Sarah L. Hartley for Matrix Trust Company, LLC. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 05/08/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-1149] [Entered: 05/09/2019 06:33 AM]

Open Document

[10647279] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Matthew T. Christensen and Mr. James S. Helfrich for Jeanne B. Bryant. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 05/08/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-1149] [Entered: 05/08/2019 02:47 PM]

Open Document

[10647274] Docketing statement filed by Jeanne B. Bryant. Served on 05/08/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-1149] JSH [Entered: 05/08/2019 02:39 PM]

Open Document

[10647271] Notice received from Jeanne B. Bryant that a transcript is not necessary for this appeal. Served on: 05/08/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-1149] JSH [Entered: 05/08/2019 02:38 PM]

Open Document #2

General Docket Letter - Counsel - Civil

Open Document #1

Main Document

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10649267] Notice of Mediation Conference filed by the Tenth Circuit Mediation Office. Telephone conference scheduled for 05/31/2019 at 10:00 am (MT). The mediation contact form must be completed and returned to the Mediation Office within four days of the date of this notice. [Please open the Notice for important information.] [19-1149] [Entered: 05/16/2019 02:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • [10649141] Filed notice record is complete. Served on 05/16/2019. Appellant's brief and appendix due on 06/25/2019 for Jeanne B. Bryant. [text only entry - no document attached] [19-1149] [Entered: 05/16/2019 10:08 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10649024] Notice sent to Clerk of District Court that ROA completion notice has not been received. Notice due that record is complete by 05/23/2019 for Jeffrey P. Colwell, Clerk of Court. [19-1149] [Entered: 05/16/2019 07:05 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10647364] Entry of appearance filed by Sarah L. Hartley for Matrix Trust Company, LLC. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 05/08/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-1149] [Entered: 05/09/2019 06:33 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • [10647360] Entry of appearance submitted by Sarah L. Hartley for Appellee Matrix Trust Company, LLC for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 05/08/2019. Manner of Service: email.--[Edited 05/09/2019 by LAB to remove PDF from entry as pleading was filed 5/8/19.] [19-1149] SLH [Entered: 05/08/2019 06:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • [10647299] Minute order filed - Notice due that record is complete by 05/15/2019 for Jeffrey P. Colwell, Clerk of Court. (Text Only - No Attachment). [19-1149] [Entered: 05/08/2019 03:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10647279] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Matthew T. Christensen and Mr. James S. Helfrich for Jeanne B. Bryant. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 05/08/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-1149] [Entered: 05/08/2019 02:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • [10647276] Entry of appearance submitted by James S. Helfrich, Matthew T. Christensen for Appellant Jeanne B. Bryant for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 05/08/2019. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 05/08/2019 by SDS to remove pdf from entry as the pleading has been filed] [19-1149] JSH [Entered: 05/08/2019 02:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10647274] Docketing statement filed by Jeanne B. Bryant. Served on 05/08/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-1149] JSH [Entered: 05/08/2019 02:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10647271] Notice received from Jeanne B. Bryant that a transcript is not necessary for this appeal. Served on: 05/08/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-1149] JSH [Entered: 05/08/2019 02:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10643758] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 04/24/2019 Docketing statement, transcript order form, and notice of appearance due 05/08/2019 for Jeanne B. Bryant. Notice of appearance due on 05/08/2019 for Matrix Trust Company, LLC. [19-1149] [Entered: 04/24/2019 04:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Matrix Trust Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew T. Christensen

Latest cases represented by Lawyer James S. Helfrich