This case was last updated from PACER on 09/13/2019 at 06:03:02 (UTC).

Bryan Patterson v. M. Spearman, et al

Case Summary

On 07/15/2019 Bryan Patterson filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against M Spearman. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-16387

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

S. HITCHCOCK, Correctional Registered Nurse

Y. VANG, Correctional Officer

F. WILLIAMS, Correctional Officer

J. FILCE, Correctional Officer

L. TAGUDIN, Correctional Officer

V. ZUMPANO, Correctional Captain

C. FACKRELL, Correctional Liuetenant

C. ROMERO, Correctional Sergeant

K. PETIG, Correctional Supervising Registered Nurse

M. ELIOT SPEARMAN, Warden

Plaintiff / Appellant

BRYAN DAMON PATTERSON

San Quentin, CA 94974

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Andrew Whisnand Esquire

Attorney at AGCA-Office of the California Attorney General

1300 I Street, Suite 125

Sacramento, CA 95814

Yevgeniy Mikhail Parkman

Attorney at California Department of Justice

455 Golden Gate Avenue, Suite 11000

San Francisco, CA 94102

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Bryan Damon Patterson

Attorney at KVSP - KERN VALLEY STATE PRISON

Inmate Mail

San Quentin, CA 94974

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) Filed order (A. WALLACE TASHIMA, MILAN D. SMITH, JR. and MARK J. BENNETT) A review of the record demonstrates that this court lacks jurisdiction over this appeal because the order challenged in the appeal is not final or appealable. See 28 U.S.C. 1291; Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(b); Chacon v. Babcock, 640 F.2d 221, 222 (9th Cir. 1981) (order is not appealable unless it disposes of all claims as to all parties or judgment is entered in compliance with rule). DISMISSED. [11411884] (HC) [Entered: 08/27/2019 11:41 AM]

1 #2

Pro Se Case Information Packet

#1

Docketing Letter

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Filed order (A. WALLACE TASHIMA, MILAN D. SMITH, JR. and MARK J. BENNETT) A review of the record demonstrates that this court lacks jurisdiction over this appeal because the order challenged in the appeal is not final or appealable. See 28 U.S.C. 1291; Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(b); Chacon v. Babcock, 640 F.2d 221, 222 (9th Cir. 1981) (order is not appealable unless it disposes of all claims as to all parties or judgment is entered in compliance with rule). DISMISSED. [11411884] (HC) [Entered: 08/27/2019 11:41 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • (#3) Attorney Andrew Whisnand in 19-16387 substituted by Attorney Yevgeniy Mikhail Parkman in 19-16387 [11410709] (NAC) [Entered: 08/26/2019 03:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • (#2) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Yevgeniy Mikhail Parkman (California Department of Justice, Office of Attorney General, 455 Golden Gate Ave, Suite 11000, San Francisco, CA 94102) for Appellees J. Filce and F. Williams. Substitution for Attorney Andrew Whisnand, Esquire for Appellees J. Filce and F. Williams. Date of service: 08/26/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11410699] [19-16387] (Parkman, Yevgeniy) [Entered: 08/26/2019 03:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL AND PRO SE APPELLANT. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Bryan Damon Patterson opening brief due 09/09/2019. Appellees C. Fackrell, J. Filce, S. Hitchcock, K. Petig, C. Romero, M. Eliot Spearman, Warden, L. Tagudin, Y. Vang, F. Williams and V. Zumpano answering brief due 10/09/2019. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11363209] (HC) [Entered: 07/15/2019 11:27 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.