This case was last updated from PACER on 05/31/2019 at 06:04:29 (UTC).

Brud Rossmann v. Susan Wojcicki, et al

Case Summary

On 04/01/2019 Brud Rossmann filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Susan Wojcicki. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-55359

  • Filing Date:

    04/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

LENNERT LEADER

ELLEN SEGAL HUVELLE, US District Court Judge, US District Court

MIRIAM SEWELL, The District of Columbia, Rehabilitation Services Agency, Department of Disability Services

ANWAR GRAVES, AUSA, US Attorney's Office

SUNDAR PICHAI, CEO Alphapet, and Google

CRYSTAL LUSTIG, US Probation Office, US District Court

PATRICIA HENRICKS

ROSEMARY COLLYER, US District Court Judge, US District Court

TOYIN FASAKIN, The District of Columbia Rehabilitation Services Agency, Department of Disability Services

JOHN DOE, 1, 2, Sub N

LES VERMILLION, Professor, University of District of Columbia

MARK GEMBICKI, CEO, The Resilient Corporation

SUSAN WOJCICKI, CEO, You Tube

CATHY ROJKO, Trial Attorney, US Department of Justice, Environment and Natural Resources Division

SUSAN BELL

G. MICHAEL HARVEY, US Magistrate, US District Court

SERGEY IVANOV, Professor, University of District of Columbia

Plaintiff / Appellant

BRUD ROSSMANN

San Diego, CA 92120

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

AUSA Esquire

Attorney at Office of the US Attorney

880 Front Street, Room 6293

San Diego, CA 92101-8893

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Brud Rossmann

Attorney at Hanover Mission Gorge

4440 Twain Ave.

San Diego, CA 92120

 

Court Documents

1 #3

Attorneys Not Registered for E-Filing

#1

Docketing Letter

1 #2

Case Opening Packet

#3

(#3) Filed order (DIARMUID F. O'SCANNLAIN, WILLIAM A. FLETCHER and PAUL J. WATFORD) A review of the record demonstrates that this court lacks jurisdiction over this appeal because the district court has not issued any orders that are final or appealable. See 28 U.S.C. 1291. Consequently, this appeal is dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. DISMISSED. [11275662] (OC) [Entered: 04/24/2019 01:51 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Filed order (DIARMUID F. O'SCANNLAIN, WILLIAM A. FLETCHER and PAUL J. WATFORD) A review of the record demonstrates that this court lacks jurisdiction over this appeal because the district court has not issued any orders that are final or appealable. See 28 U.S.C. 1291. Consequently, this appeal is dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. DISMISSED. [11275662] (OC) [Entered: 04/24/2019 01:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • (#2) Mail returned on 04/15/2019 addressed to Brud Rossmann, re: 04/01/2019 case opening information [ # 1 ]. Returned envelope notes: return to sender, no such number, unable to forward. Resending to: 4560 Macarthur Boulevard, NW, Unit 201, Washington, DC 20007. [11266381]--[Edited: address updated. 04/17/2019 by RY] (LA) [Entered: 04/16/2019 07:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL AND PRO SE APPELLANT. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Brud Rossmann opening brief due 05/28/2019. Appellees Susan Bell, Rosemary Collyer, Toyin Fasakin, Mark Gembicki, Anwar Graves, G. Michael Harvey, Patricia Henricks, Ellen Segal Huvelle, Sergey Ivanov, John Doe, Lennert Leader, Crystal Lustig, Sundar Pichai, Cathy Rojko, Miriam Sewell, Les Vermillion and Susan Wojcicki answering brief due 06/28/2019. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11248126] (RT) [Entered: 04/01/2019 11:13 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.