This case was last updated from PACER on 08/24/2019 at 06:03:56 (UTC).

Brud Rossmann v. Susan Wojcicki, et al

Case Summary

On 06/25/2019 Brud Rossmann filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Susan Wojcicki. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-55731

  • Filing Date:

    06/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

LENNERT LEADER

ELLEN SEGAL HUVELLE, US District Court Judge, US District Court

MIRIAM SEWELL, The District of Columbia, Rehabilitation Services Agency, Department of Disability Services

ANWAR GRAVES, AUSA, US Attorney's Office

SUNDAR PICHAI, CEO Alphapet, and Google

CRYSTAL LUSTIG, US Probation Office, US District Court

PATRICIA HENRICKS

ROSEMARY COLLYER, US District Court Judge, US District Court

TOYIN FASAKIN, The District of Columbia Rehabilitation Services Agency, Department of Disability Services

JOHN DOE, 1, 2, Sub N

LES VERMILLION, Professor, University of District of Columbia

MARK GEMBICKI, CEO, The Resilient Corporation

SUSAN WOJCICKI, CEO, You Tube

CATHY ROJKO, Trial Attorney, US Department of Justice, Environment and Natural Resources Division

SUSAN BELL

G. MICHAEL HARVEY, US Magistrate, US District Court

SERGEY IVANOV, Professor, University of District of Columbia

Plaintiff / Appellant

BRUD ROSSMANN

Washington, DC 20007

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Brud Rossmann

4560 Macarthur Boulevard, Nw, Unit 201

Washington, DC 20007

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: JW): Appellants motion for voluntary dismissal (Docket Entry No. [ # 3 ]) is denied because the motion requests dismissal without prejudice. If appellant seeks voluntary dismissal of this appeal, the motion must request dismissal with prejudice. Within 14 days of this order, appellant may file a renewed motion for voluntary dismissal requesting dismissal with prejudice. If a renewed motion is not filed, appellant remains obligated to comply with the July 1, 2019 order. [11405906]--[Edited: docket text updated to include link to 08/05/2019 motion in entry [ # 3 ]. 08/21/2019 by RY] (CKP) [Entered: 08/21/2019 03:47 PM]

#4

(#4) Filed Appellant Brud Rossmann letter dated 08/12/2019 re: Page substitute of previous motion. Paper filing deficiency: None. [11404630] (NAC) [Entered: 08/21/2019 08:20 AM]

#3

(#3) Filed Appellant Brud Rossmann motion to dismiss case pursuant to FRAP 42(b). Deficiencies: None. Served on. [11388538] (RR) [Entered: 08/06/2019 11:26 AM]

2 #4

Additional Document

2 #3

Additional Document

#2

Additional Document

2 #1

Main Document

1 #2

Case Opening Packet

#1

Docketing Letter

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: JW): Appellants motion for voluntary dismissal (Docket Entry No. [ # 3 ]) is denied because the motion requests dismissal without prejudice. If appellant seeks voluntary dismissal of this appeal, the motion must request dismissal with prejudice. Within 14 days of this order, appellant may file a renewed motion for voluntary dismissal requesting dismissal with prejudice. If a renewed motion is not filed, appellant remains obligated to comply with the July 1, 2019 order. [11405906]--[Edited: docket text updated to include link to 08/05/2019 motion in entry [ # 3 ]. 08/21/2019 by RY] (CKP) [Entered: 08/21/2019 03:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Filed Appellant Brud Rossmann letter dated 08/12/2019 re: Page substitute of previous motion. Paper filing deficiency: None. [11404630] (NAC) [Entered: 08/21/2019 08:20 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Filed Appellant Brud Rossmann motion to dismiss case pursuant to FRAP 42(b). Deficiencies: None. Served on. [11388538] (RR) [Entered: 08/06/2019 11:26 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: JW): A review of the district courts docket reflects that the district court denied appellant leave to proceed in forma pauperis because it found that the action was frivolous. This court may dismiss a case at any time, if the court determines the case is frivolous. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2). Within 35 days after the date of this order, appellant must: (1) file a motion to dismiss this appeal, see Fed. R. App. P. 42(b), or (2) file a statement explaining why the appeal is not frivolous and should go forward. If appellant files a statement that the appeal should go forward, appellant also must: (1) file in this court a motion to proceed in forma pauperis, OR (2) pay to the district court $505.00 for the filing and docketing fees for this appeal AND file in this court proof that the $505.00 was paid. If appellant does not respond to this order, the Clerk will dismiss this appeal for failure to prosecute, without further notice. See 9th Cir. R. 42-1. If appellant files a motion to dismiss the appeal, the Clerk will dismiss this appeal, pursuant to Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 42(b). If appellant submits any response to this order other than a motion to dismiss the appeal, the court may dismiss this appeal as frivolous, without further notice. The briefing schedule for this appeal is stayed. The Clerk shall serve on appellant: (1) a form motion to voluntarily dismiss the appeal, (2) a form statement that the appeal should go forward, and (3) a Form 4 financial affidavit. Appellant may use the enclosed forms for any motion to dismiss the appeal, statement that the appeal should go forward, and/or motion to proceed in forma pauperis. [11350250] (CKP) [Entered: 07/01/2019 11:24 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCE OF PRO SE APPELLANT AND NO APPEARANCE FOR APPELLEES. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Brud Rossmann opening brief due 08/23/2019. [11344011] (RT) [Entered: 06/25/2019 02:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less