This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 01/22/2023 at 06:20:23 (UTC).

Bruce v. City of Colorado Springs, et al

Case Summary

On 11/23/2022 Bruce filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against City of Colorado Springs,. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-1413

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

DOUGLAS BRUCE, an individual

Defendant / Appellees

CITY OF COLORADO SPRINGS, a municipal government within the State of Colorado

PIKES PEAK REGIONAL BUILDING DEPARTMENT, an intergovernmental agency within the State of Colorado

ROGER LOVELL, in his official capacity as the Director of the Pikes Peak Regional Building Department

EL PASO COUNTY, a municipal government within the State of Colorado

MARK LOWDERMAN, in his official capacity as the El Paso County Public Trustee

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Aaron C. Garrett

Attorney at Nonprofit Legal Services of Utah

623 East 2100 South, Suite B1

Salt Lake City, UT 84106

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

William Erik Lamphere

Attorney at Colorado Springs City Attorney's Office

30 South Nevada Avenue, Suite 501

Colorado Springs, CO 80903

Justin Michael DeRosa

Attorney at Sparks Willson

24 South Weber Street, Suite 400

Colorado Springs, CO 80903

Eric V. Hall

Attorney at Sparks Willson

24 South Weber Street, Suite 400

Colorado Springs, CO 80903

Steven Klaffky

Attorney at El Paso County Attorney's Office

200 South Cascade Avenue, Suite 150

Colorado Springs, CO 80903-2208

 

Court Documents

Open Document #1

Preliminary ROA

Open Document #2

General Docket Letter - Counsel - Civil

Open Document

[10958144] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Eric V. Hall for Pikes Peak Regional Building Department and Roger Lovell. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 11/29/2022. Manner of Service: email [22-1413] [Entered: 11/29/2022 08:24 AM]

Open Document

[10958151] Entry of appearance filed by Justin Michael DeRosa for Pikes Peak Regional Building Department and Roger Lovell. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 11/29/2022. Manner of Service: email [22-1413] [Entered: 11/29/2022 08:33 AM]

Open Document

[10959718] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Steven Klaffky for El Paso County and Mark Lowderman. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 12/05/2022. Manner of Service: email [22-1413] [Entered: 12/05/2022 02:21 PM]

Open Document

[10959979] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. William Erik Lamphere for City of Colorado Springs. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 12/06/2022. Manner of Service: email [22-1413] [Entered: 12/06/2022 11:20 AM]

Open Document

No Description Available

Open Document

[10960326] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Aaron C. Garrett for Mr. Douglas Bruce. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 12/07/2022. Manner of Service: email. [22-1413] [Entered: 12/07/2022 03:26 PM]

Open Document

[10960328] Docketing statement filed by Mr. Douglas Bruce. Served on 12/07/2022. Manner of Service: email. [22-1413] ACG [Entered: 12/07/2022 03:27 PM]

Open Document #1

Mediation Conference Notice

Open Document #2

Mediation Contact Form

Open Document

[10969767] Appellant's appendix filed by Mr. Douglas Bruce. Total number of volumes filed: 1. Served on 01/17/2023. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required privacy and virus certifications: Yes. [22-1413] ACG [Entered: 01/17/2023 03:35 PM]

Open Document

[10969768] Notice of appellant's deficient brief received from Mr. Douglas Bruce. Type of deficiency: No reasons oral argument is requested. See attached letter for specifics. Appellant's brief due on 01/20/2023 for Douglas Bruce. [22-1413] [Entered: 01/17/2023 03:39 PM]

Open Document

[10969782] Appellant/Petitioner's brief filed by Mr. Douglas Bruce. Served on 01/17/2023 by email. Oral argument requested? Yes. Word/page count: 3785. This pleading complies with all required privacy and virus certifications: Yes. [22-1413] ACG [Entered: 01/17/2023 03:58 PM]

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/17/2023
  • Docket[10969788] Minute order filed - the brief and appendix submitted by appellant is accepted for filing. Paper copies shall now be filed with the court within 5 business days of this order. All copies must be exact replicas of the electronic filings, including all attachments and number of volumes filed for appendices. Paper copies of appellant's brief and appendix due 01/24/2023 by Douglas Bruce. Appellees' brief now due 02/16/2023 for City of Colorado Springs, Pikes Peak Regional Building Department, Mark Lowderman, El Paso County and Roger Lovell. (Text Only - No Attachment) [22-1413] [Entered: 01/17/2023 04:03 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10969782] Appellant/Petitioner's brief filed by Mr. Douglas Bruce. Served on 01/17/2023 by email. Oral argument requested? Yes. Word/page count: 3785. This pleading complies with all required privacy and virus certifications: Yes. [22-1413] ACG [Entered: 01/17/2023 03:58 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10969768] Notice of appellant's deficient brief received from Mr. Douglas Bruce. Type of deficiency: No reasons oral argument is requested. See attached letter for specifics. Appellant's brief due on 01/20/2023 for Douglas Bruce. [22-1413] [Entered: 01/17/2023 03:39 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10969767] Appellant's appendix filed by Mr. Douglas Bruce. Total number of volumes filed: 1. Served on 01/17/2023. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required privacy and virus certifications: Yes. [22-1413] ACG [Entered: 01/17/2023 03:35 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketThis entry has been removed from the docket. Corrected brief filed 01/17/2023. [sds] [10969765] Appellant/Petitioner's brief filed by Mr. Douglas Bruce. Served on 01/17/2023 by email. Oral argument requested? Yes. Word/page count: 3745. This pleading complies with all required privacy and virus certifications: Yes. --[Edited 01/17/2023 by SDS to cite as deficient] [22-1413] ACG [Entered: 01/17/2023 03:32 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10960645] Notice of Mediation Conference filed by the Tenth Circuit Mediation Office. ZoomGov conference scheduled for 12/23/2022 at 10:00 am (MT). The mediation contact form must be completed and returned to the Mediation Office within four days of the date of this notice. [Please open the Notice for important information.] [22-1413] [Entered: 12/08/2022 01:42 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10960328] Docketing statement filed by Mr. Douglas Bruce. Served on 12/07/2022. Manner of Service: email. [22-1413] ACG [Entered: 12/07/2022 03:27 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10960326] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Aaron C. Garrett for Mr. Douglas Bruce. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 12/07/2022. Manner of Service: email. [22-1413] [Entered: 12/07/2022 03:26 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • Docket[10960322] Filed notice record is complete. Served on 12/07/2022. Appellant's brief and appendix due on 01/17/2023 for Douglas Bruce. [22-1413] [Entered: 12/07/2022 03:14 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • Docket[10960259] Minute order filed - Notice due that record is complete by 12/14/2022 for Jeffrey P. Colwell, Clerk of Court (oclk). (Text Only - No Attachment) [22-1413] [Entered: 12/07/2022 12:48 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 12/07/2022
  • Docket[10960214] Entry of appearance submitted by Aaron C. Garrett for Appellant Mr. Douglas Bruce for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 12/07/2022. Manner of Service: email. [22-1413] --[Edited 12/07/2022 by AT to remove PDF as pleading was filed on 12/7/22.] ACG [Entered: 12/07/2022 11:42 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10959979] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. William Erik Lamphere for City of Colorado Springs. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 12/06/2022. Manner of Service: email [22-1413] [Entered: 12/06/2022 11:20 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • Docket[10959975] Entry of appearance submitted by W. Erik Lamphere for Appellee City of Colorado Springs for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 12/06/2022. Manner of Service: email.--[Edited 12/06/2022 by JJH to remove pdf as pleading filed 12/06/2022] [22-1413] WEL [Entered: 12/06/2022 11:15 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10959718] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Steven Klaffky for El Paso County and Mark Lowderman. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 12/05/2022. Manner of Service: email [22-1413] [Entered: 12/05/2022 02:21 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • Docket[10959708] Entry of appearance submitted by Steven A. Klaffky for Appellees El Paso County and Mark Lowderman for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 12/05/2022. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 12/05/2022 by JJH to remove pdf as pleading filed 12/05/2022][22-1413] SK [Entered: 12/05/2022 02:15 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10958151] Entry of appearance filed by Justin Michael DeRosa for Pikes Peak Regional Building Department and Roger Lovell. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 11/29/2022. Manner of Service: email [22-1413] [Entered: 11/29/2022 08:33 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10958144] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Eric V. Hall for Pikes Peak Regional Building Department and Roger Lovell. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 11/29/2022. Manner of Service: email [22-1413] [Entered: 11/29/2022 08:24 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • Docket[10958141] Entry of appearance submitted by Justin M. DeRosa for Appellees Pikes Peak Regional Building Department and Roger Lovell for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 11/29/2022. Manner of Service: email. [22-1413] [Edited to remove PDF as pleading has been filed-- Edited 11/29/2022 by NA] JMD [Entered: 11/29/2022 08:23 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • Docket[10958136] Entry of appearance submitted by Eric V. Hall for Appellees Pikes Peak Regional Building Department and Roger Lovell for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 11/29/2022. Manner of Service: email.--[Edited 11/29/2022 by JJH to remove pdf as pleading filed 11/29/2022] [22-1413] EVH [Entered: 11/29/2022 08:19 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10957485] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 11/23/2022. Docketing statement, transcript order form and entry of appearance due 12/07/2022 for Douglas Bruce. Notice of appearance due on 12/07/2022 for City of Colorado Springs, El Paso County, Roger Lovell, Mark Lowderman and Pikes Peak Regional Building Department [22-1413] [Entered: 11/23/2022 10:20 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Eric V. Hall