This case was last updated from PACER on 01/26/2020 at 06:08:28 (UTC).

Brown v. Town of Valley Brook, et al

Case Summary

On 11/27/2019 Brown filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Town of Valley Brook. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-6172

  • Filing Date:

    11/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

JOHN DOES, Officers 1 and 2

THE TOWN OF VALLEY BROOK

MICHAEL STAMP, Police Chief of the Town of Valley Brook

Plaintiff / Appellant

HAROLD W. BROWN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Alison B. Levine

Attorney at Collins Zorn & Wagner

429 Ne 50Th Street, 2Nd Floor

Oklahoma City, OK 73105

Ambre C. Gooch Esq.

Attorney at Collins Zorn & Wagner

429 Ne 50Th Street, 2Nd Floor

Oklahoma City, OK 73105

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Marvel E. Lewis

Attorney at Marvel E. Lewis Law Office

P.O. Box 338

Guthrie, OK 73044

Jeffrey J. Box

Attorney at Jeffrey J. Box Law Office

400 North Walker Avenue, Suite 330

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

 

Court Documents

Open Document

[10710938] Appellant's appendix filed by Harold W. Brown. Total number of volumes filed: 1. Served on 01/17/2020. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-6172] JJB [Entered: 01/17/2020 03:17 PM]

Open Document

[10710926] Appellant/Petitioner's brief filed by Harold W. Brown. Served on 01/17/2020 by email. Oral argument requested? No. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-6172] JJB [Entered: 01/17/2020 03:14 PM]

Open Document

[10701367] Entry of appearance filed by Ms. Alison B. Levine and Ms. Ambre C. Gooch, Esq. for The Town of Valley Brook and Michael Stamp. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 12/10/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-6172] [Entered: 12/10/2019 04:42 PM]

Open Document

[10701196] Filed notice record is complete. Served on 12/10/2019. Appellant's brief and appendix due on 01/21/2020 for Harold W. Brown. [19-6172] [Entered: 12/10/2019 11:45 AM]

Open Document

[10701122] Docketing statement filed by Harold W. Brown. Served on 12/10/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-6172] MEL [Entered: 12/10/2019 09:46 AM]

Open Document

[10701117] Notice that a transcript is not necessary for this appeal filed by Harold W. Brown. Served on: 12/10/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-6172]--[Edited 12/10/2019 by KLP to correct the event code and docket text.] MEL [Entered: 12/10/2019 09:40 AM]

Open Document

[10699634] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Jeffrey J Box for Harold W. Brown. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 12/03/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-6172] [Entered: 12/03/2019 04:42 PM]

Open Document

[10699607] Entry of appearance filed by Marvel E. Lewis for Harold W. Brown. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 12/03/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-6172] [Entered: 12/03/2019 04:09 PM]

Open Document #3

General Docket Letter - Counsel - Civil

Open Document #2

Transmittal letter

Open Document #1

Preliminary Record

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2020
  • [10712332] Paper copies of appellant's opening brief received from Harold W. Brown. [19-6172] [Entered: 01/23/2020 01:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • [10711012] Minute order filed - the brief and appendix submitted by appellant are accepted for filing. Paper copies shall now be filed with the court within 5 business days of this order. All copies must be exact replicas of the electronic filings, including all attachments and number of volumes filed (for appendices).Paper copies of Appellant's brief and apendix now due by 1/27/20 for Harld W. Brown. Appellees' brief now due by 02/18/2020 for Michael Stamp and The Town of Valley Brook. (Text Only - No Attachment) [19-6172] [Entered: 01/17/2020 03:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • [10710938] Appellant's appendix filed by Harold W. Brown. Total number of volumes filed: 1. Served on 01/17/2020. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-6172] JJB [Entered: 01/17/2020 03:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • [10710926] Appellant/Petitioner's brief filed by Harold W. Brown. Served on 01/17/2020 by email. Oral argument requested? No. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-6172] JJB [Entered: 01/17/2020 03:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10701367] Entry of appearance filed by Ms. Alison B. Levine and Ms. Ambre C. Gooch, Esq. for The Town of Valley Brook and Michael Stamp. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 12/10/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-6172] [Entered: 12/10/2019 04:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • [10701251] Entry of appearance submitted by Ambre C. Gooch and Alison B. Levine for Appellees Michael Stamp and The Town of Valley Brook for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 12/10/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-6172]--[Edited 12/10/2019 by JM PDF removed filed by the court on 12/10/19.] ACG [Entered: 12/10/2019 01:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10701196] Filed notice record is complete. Served on 12/10/2019. Appellant's brief and appendix due on 01/21/2020 for Harold W. Brown. [19-6172] [Entered: 12/10/2019 11:45 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • [10701124] Minute order filed - Notice due that record is complete by 12/17/2019 for Carmelita Reeder Shinn. (Text Only - No Attachment) [19-6172] [Entered: 12/10/2019 09:48 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10701122] Docketing statement filed by Harold W. Brown. Served on 12/10/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-6172] MEL [Entered: 12/10/2019 09:46 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10701117] Notice that a transcript is not necessary for this appeal filed by Harold W. Brown. Served on: 12/10/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-6172]--[Edited 12/10/2019 by KLP to correct the event code and docket text.] MEL [Entered: 12/10/2019 09:40 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10699634] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Jeffrey J Box for Harold W. Brown. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 12/03/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-6172] [Entered: 12/03/2019 04:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10699607] Entry of appearance filed by Marvel E. Lewis for Harold W. Brown. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 12/03/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-6172] [Entered: 12/03/2019 04:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • [10699603] Entry of appearance submitted by Marvel E. Lewis for Appellant Harold W. Brown for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 12/03/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-6172] --[Edited 12/03/2019 by SLS to remove PDF from docket entry as the document has been filed.] MEL [Entered: 12/03/2019 04:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • [10699583] Entry of appearance submitted by Jeffrey J. Box for Appellant Harold W. Brown for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 12/03/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-6172]--[Edited 12/03/2019 by JM PDF removed filed by the court on 12/2/19.] JJB [Entered: 12/03/2019 03:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10698454] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 11/26/2019 Docketing statement, transcript order form and notice of appearance due 12/11/19 for Harold W. Brown. Notice of appearance also due on 12/11/2019 for Michael Stamp and The Town of Valley Brook [19-6172] [Entered: 11/27/2019 11:38 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.