This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 10/05/2021 at 06:02:16 (UTC).

Brown v. Pennsylvania Department of Cor, et al

Case Summary

On 08/06/2021 Brown filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Pennsylvania Department of Cor. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-2454

  • Filing Date:

    08/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

 

Party Details

Defendant

JOHN DOES 1-10

Plaintiff / Appellant

DAWN LANELLE BROWN

Palmyra, PA 17078

Defendant / Appellees

PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS

MICHAEL WENEROWICZ

HAROLD KERTES

JAMES MEINTEL

REED DAVY

DOUGLAS BENNER

MARTIN KUZAR

STEPHEN NOLL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Dawn Lanelle Brown

1280 Duke Street

Palmyra, PA 17078

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Lindsey A. Bedell Esq.

Attorney at Office of Attorney General of Pennsylvania

Strawberry Square

Harrisburg, PA 17120

Nicole J. Boland Esq.

Attorney at Office of Attorney General of Pennsylvania

Strawberry Square

Harrisburg, PA 17120

Anthony T. Kovalchick Esq.

Attorney at Office of Attorney General of Pennsylvania

1251 Waterfront Place, Mezzanine Level

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

 

Court Documents

#1

Notice of Appeal

1 #2

District Court Memorandum_Opinion_07212021

1 #3

District_Court_Judgment_07212021

1 #4

District Court_Order_07212021

1 #5

Case_Caption

1 #6

Case Opening Letter

#3

5 #1

Standing_Order_Excess_Pagination_010912

5 #2

Briefing Information

5 #3

Informal Brief

5 #4

Briefing and Scheduling Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED. Brief on behalf of Appellant Dawn Lanelle Brown due on or before 10/19/2021. Appendix due on or before 10/19/2021. (DW) [Entered: 09/09/2021 11:30 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • Docket(#4) Notice received from the district court that the docketing and filing fees were paid by the appellant on 08/13/2021. (DW) [Entered: 09/09/2021 11:26 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Anthony Thomas Kovalchick on behalf of Appellee(s) Commonwealth of Pennsylvania Department of Corrections, Michael Wenerowicz, Harold Kertes, James Meintel, Reed Davy, Douglas Benner, Martin Kuzar, Stephen Noll. [21-2454] (ATK) [Entered: 08/09/2021 03:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • Docket(#2) RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (DW) [Entered: 08/06/2021 02:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Dawn Lanelle Brown in District Court No. 1-15-cv-00918. (DW) [Entered: 08/06/2021 02:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Anthony Thomas Kovalchick(Designation Retained)

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nicole J. Boland Esq.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lindsey A. Bedell Esq.