This case was last updated from PACER on 05/19/2019 at 06:05:01 (UTC).

Brown v. Flowers, et al

Case Summary

On 03/20/2019 Brown filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Flowers. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-7011

  • Filing Date:

    03/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendants

MIKE SINNETT

JOHN CHRISTIAN, Pontotoc County Sheriff

Defendant / Appellant

ROGER FLOWERS

Plaintiff / Appellee

BRITTNEY BROWN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Robert Todd Goolsby

Attorney at Goolsby, Proctor, Heefner & Gibbs

701 North Broadway Avenue, Suite 400

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

James Leroy Gibbs II

Attorney at Goolsby, Proctor, Heefner & Gibbs

701 North Broadway Avenue, Suite 400

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Wellon B. Poe Jr.

Attorney at Collins Zorn & Wagner

429 Ne 50Th Street, 2Nd Floor

Oklahoma City, OK 73105

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Randall James Wood

Attorney at Pierce Couch Hendrickson

1109 North Francis Avenue

Oklahoma City, OK 73106-6813

Robert S. Lafferrandre

Attorney at Pierce Couch Hendrickson

1109 North Francis Avenue

Oklahoma City, OK 73106-6813

Charles A. Schreck

Attorney at Pierce Couch Hendrickson

1109 North Francis Avenue

Oklahoma City, OK 73106-6813

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorney

Stephen Joseph Capron

Attorney at Capron & Edwards

406 South Boulder Avenue, Suite 400

Tulsa, OK 74103

 

Court Documents

Open Document

[10645044] Order filed by Clerk of the Court dismissing the cross appeal, Case No. 19-7015; lifting tolling of briefing in Case No. 19-7011 and directing appellant to file an opening brief and appendix within 40 days of the date of this order. (Appellant's brief and appendix due on 06/10/2019 for Roger Flowers.) Served on 04/30/2019. (See the attachment for the entire order.) [19-7011] [Entered: 04/30/2019 10:30 AM]

Open Document

[10641955] Order filed by Clerk of the Court - Plaintiff shall file and serve a memorandum brief addressing jurisdiction or file a motion to voluntarily dismiss this cross-appeal (see order for details). Memorandum brief due 05/01/2019. Briefing on the merits of both appeals is tolled pending further order of this court. Served on 04/17/2019. [19-7011, 19-7015] [Entered: 04/17/2019 11:20 AM]

Open Document

[10641864] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Stephen Joseph Capron for Brittney Brown in 19-7015, 19-7011. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 04/16/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-7015, 19-7011] [Entered: 04/17/2019 08:01 AM]

Open Document

[10641831] Docketing statement filed by Brittney Brown in 19-7015. Served on 04/16/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-7015, 19-7011] SJC [Entered: 04/16/2019 05:08 PM]

Open Document

[10641830] Notice received from Brittney Brown in 19-7015 that a transcript is not necessary for this appeal. Served on: 04/16/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-7015, 19-7011] SJC [Entered: 04/16/2019 05:07 PM]

Open Document

[10640500] Deficiency notice issued. No entry of appearance on file for Brittney Brown. Notice of appearance due on 04/22/2019 for Brittney Brown. [19-7011] [Entered: 04/11/2019 10:44 AM]

Open Document

[10638568] Order filed by Clerk of the Court directing the parties to address in their merits briefs the jurisdictional question of finality for purposes of appellate review, providing specific authority supporting immediate review in this particular case when the final judgment has not yet been entered. See order for additional information. Served on 04/04/2019. [19-7011] [Entered: 04/04/2019 10:02 AM]

Open Document

[10638442] Entry of appearance filed by Robert S. Lafferrandre, Charles A. Schreck and Randall James Wood for Roger Flowers. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 04/03/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-7011] [Entered: 04/03/2019 04:29 PM]

Open Document

[10638413] Notice received from Roger Flowers that a transcript is not necessary for this appeal. Served on: 04/03/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-7011] CAS [Entered: 04/03/2019 03:32 PM]

Open Document

[10638411] Docketing statement filed by Roger Flowers. Served on 04/03/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-7011] CAS [Entered: 04/03/2019 03:31 PM]

Open Document #2

General Docket Letter - Counsel - Civil

Open Document #1

Main Document

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10645044] Order filed by Clerk of the Court dismissing the cross appeal, Case No. 19-7015; lifting tolling of briefing in Case No. 19-7011 and directing appellant to file an opening brief and appendix within 40 days of the date of this order. (Appellant's brief and appendix due on 06/10/2019 for Roger Flowers.) Served on 04/30/2019. (See the attachment for the entire order.) [19-7011] [Entered: 04/30/2019 10:30 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • [10645025] Order filed by Clerk of the Court granting the motion to dismiss the cross-appeal, 19-7015. Text only entry - no attachment. (See the case termination entry for the order.) [19-7011, 19-7015] [Entered: 04/30/2019 09:52 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10641955] Order filed by Clerk of the Court - Plaintiff shall file and serve a memorandum brief addressing jurisdiction or file a motion to voluntarily dismiss this cross-appeal (see order for details). Memorandum brief due 05/01/2019. Briefing on the merits of both appeals is tolled pending further order of this court. Served on 04/17/2019. [19-7011, 19-7015] [Entered: 04/17/2019 11:20 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10641864] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Stephen Joseph Capron for Brittney Brown in 19-7015, 19-7011. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 04/16/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-7015, 19-7011] [Entered: 04/17/2019 08:01 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10641831] Docketing statement filed by Brittney Brown in 19-7015. Served on 04/16/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-7015, 19-7011] SJC [Entered: 04/16/2019 05:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10641830] Notice received from Brittney Brown in 19-7015 that a transcript is not necessary for this appeal. Served on: 04/16/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-7015, 19-7011] SJC [Entered: 04/16/2019 05:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10640500] Deficiency notice issued. No entry of appearance on file for Brittney Brown. Notice of appearance due on 04/22/2019 for Brittney Brown. [19-7011] [Entered: 04/11/2019 10:44 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10638568] Order filed by Clerk of the Court directing the parties to address in their merits briefs the jurisdictional question of finality for purposes of appellate review, providing specific authority supporting immediate review in this particular case when the final judgment has not yet been entered. See order for additional information. Served on 04/04/2019. [19-7011] [Entered: 04/04/2019 10:02 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • [10638544] Filed notice record is complete. Served on 04/04/2019. Text only entry on the district court docket. Appellant's brief and appendix due on 05/14/2019 for Roger Flowers.--[Edited 04/17/2019 by MLB - Briefing on the merits is tolled per 04/17/19 order.] [19-7011] [Entered: 04/04/2019 09:34 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10638442] Entry of appearance filed by Robert S. Lafferrandre, Charles A. Schreck and Randall James Wood for Roger Flowers. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 04/03/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-7011] [Entered: 04/03/2019 04:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • [10638428] Minute order filed - Notice due that record is complete by 04/10/2019 for Patrick Keaney, Clerk of Court. (Text Only - No Attachment) [19-7011] [Entered: 04/03/2019 04:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10638413] Notice received from Roger Flowers that a transcript is not necessary for this appeal. Served on: 04/03/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-7011] CAS [Entered: 04/03/2019 03:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10638411] Docketing statement filed by Roger Flowers. Served on 04/03/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-7011] CAS [Entered: 04/03/2019 03:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • [10638409] Entry of appearance submitted by Charles A. Schreck, Robert S. Lafferrandre, Randal J. Wood for Appellant Roger Flowers for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 04/03/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-7011] --[Edited 04/03/2019 by SLS to remove PDF from docket entry as the document has been filed.] CAS [Entered: 04/03/2019 03:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10634453] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 03/20/2019 Docketing statement, transcript order form and notice of appearance due 04/03/2019 for Roger Flowers. Notice of appearance due on 04/03/2019 for Brittney Brown [19-7011]--[Edited 03/21/2019 by DD replaced transmittal letter] [Entered: 03/20/2019 09:16 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less