This case was last updated from PACER on 04/16/2019 at 06:05:40 (UTC).

Brooks v. Williams

Case Summary

On 02/15/2019 Brooks filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Williams. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-421

  • Filing Date:

    02/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

Michael C. Lynch, New York State Appellate Court Judge

Justice William E. McCarthy, New York State Appellate Court Judge

Donald Williams, New York State Supreme Court Justice

Hon. Stan L. Pritzker, New York State Appellate Court Judge

Eugene P. Devine, New York State Appellate Court Judge

Janet DiFiore, New York State Court of Appeals Judge

Christine M. Clark, New York State Appellate Court Judge

Plaintiff / Appellant

Stephen Brooks

Stormville, NY 12582-4000

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Barbara D. Underwood

Attorney at New York State Office of the Attorney General

28 Liberty Street

New York, NY 10005

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Stephen Brooks

Attorney at Green Haven Correctional Facility

P.O. Box 4000

Stormville, NY 12582-4000

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Christine M. Clark, Eugene P. Devine, Janet DiFiore, Michael C. Lynch, William E. McCarthy, Stan L. Pritzker and Donald Williams, informing the Court that they are not represented by the New York Attorney General's Office, the defendants are not parties to the litigation, RECEIVED. Service date 03/15/2019 by US mail.[2519366] [19-421] [Entered: 03/15/2019 06:18 PM]

#12

(#12) CERTIFIED PRISONER AUTHORIZATION FORM dated 03/13/2019, in care of Warden, ISSUED.[2517178] [19-421] [Entered: 03/13/2019 02:04 PM]

#11

(#11) NOTICE, to Appellee Christine M. Clark, Eugene P. Devine, Janet DiFiore, Michael C. Lynch, William E. McCarthy, Stan L. Pritzker and Donald Williams, for failure to file an appearance, SENT.[2517170] [19-421] [Entered: 03/13/2019 01:58 PM]

10 #3

Trust_Fund_acct_statement

10 #2

Warden_Notice_of_Prisoner_Authorization

10 #1

PLRA Authorization Form FILED (c)

#8

(#8) LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Stephen Brooks, informing Court of proposed due date 03/28/2019, RECEIVED. Service date 03/01/2019 by US mail.[2517157] [19-421] [Entered: 03/13/2019 01:48 PM]

#7

(#7) FORM D-P, on behalf of Appellant Stephen Brooks, FILED. Service date 03/01/2019 by US mail.[2517151] [19-421] [Entered: 03/13/2019 01:45 PM]

#6

(#6) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FORM, on behalf of Party Stephen Brooks, FILED. Service date 03/01/2019 by US mail.[2517145] [19-421] [Entered: 03/13/2019 01:44 PM]

5 #2

Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED

5 #1

Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed

#4

(#4) INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[2500426] [19-421] [Entered: 02/20/2019 11:08 AM]

#3

(#3) AUTHORIZATION FORM, REQUESTED.[2500422] [19-421] [Entered: 02/20/2019 11:06 AM]

1 #2

Case FILED

#1

Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) TRUST ACCOUNT STATEMENT, on behalf of Appellant Stephen Brooks, FILED. Service date 03/21/2019 by US mail.[2526812] [19-421] [Entered: 03/27/2019 12:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Christine M. Clark, Eugene P. Devine, Janet DiFiore, Michael C. Lynch, William E. McCarthy, Stan L. Pritzker and Donald Williams, informing the Court that they are not represented by the New York Attorney General's Office, the defendants are not parties to the litigation, RECEIVED. Service date 03/15/2019 by US mail.[2519366] [19-421] [Entered: 03/15/2019 06:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) CERTIFIED PRISONER AUTHORIZATION FORM dated 03/13/2019, in care of Warden, ISSUED.[2517178] [19-421] [Entered: 03/13/2019 02:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE, to Appellee Christine M. Clark, Eugene P. Devine, Janet DiFiore, Michael C. Lynch, William E. McCarthy, Stan L. Pritzker and Donald Williams, for failure to file an appearance, SENT.[2517170] [19-421] [Entered: 03/13/2019 01:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) PRISON LITIGATION REFORM ACT AUTHORIZATION FORM, FILED. No Service.[2517163] [19-421] [Entered: 03/13/2019 01:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION, to proceed in forma pauperis, on behalf of Appellant Stephen Brooks, FILED. Service date 03/01/2019 by US mail.[2517159] [19-421] [Entered: 03/13/2019 01:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Stephen Brooks, informing Court of proposed due date 03/28/2019, RECEIVED. Service date 03/01/2019 by US mail.[2517157] [19-421] [Entered: 03/13/2019 01:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) FORM D-P, on behalf of Appellant Stephen Brooks, FILED. Service date 03/01/2019 by US mail.[2517151] [19-421] [Entered: 03/13/2019 01:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FORM, on behalf of Party Stephen Brooks, FILED. Service date 03/01/2019 by US mail.[2517145] [19-421] [Entered: 03/13/2019 01:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2506090] [19-421] [Entered: 02/27/2019 09:46 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[2500426] [19-421] [Entered: 02/20/2019 11:08 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) AUTHORIZATION FORM, REQUESTED.[2500422] [19-421] [Entered: 02/20/2019 11:06 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 11/13/2018, RECEIVED.[2500420] [19-421] [Entered: 02/20/2019 11:06 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF PRISONER APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Stephen Brooks, FILED. [2500404] [19-421] [Entered: 02/20/2019 11:01 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less