This case was last updated from PACER on 07/29/2021 at 11:48:55 (UTC).

Brooke Ryan, et al v. Temple University

Case Summary

On 05/27/2021 Brooke Ryan filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Temple University. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-2016

  • Filing Date:

    05/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellee

TEMPLE UNIVERSITY

Plaintiff / Appellants

CHRISTINA FUSCA, on behalf of of herself all others similarly situated

BROOKE RYAN, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Roberta D. Liebenberg Esq.

Attorney at Fine Kaplan & Black

One South Broad Street, Suite 2300

Philadelphia, PA 19107

Jessica Davis Khan Esq.

Attorney at Fine Kaplan & Black

One South Broad Street, Suite 2300

Philadelphia, PA 19107

Gerard A. Dever Esq.

Attorney at Fine Kaplan & Black

One South Broad Street, Suite 2300

Philadelphia, PA 19107

Burt M. Rublin Esq.

Attorney at Ballard Spahr

1735 Market Street, 51St Floor

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Edward W. Ciolko Esq.

Attorney at Carlson Lynch

1133 Penn Avenue, 5Th Floor

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Gary F. Lynch Esq.

Attorney at Carlson Lynch

1133 Penn Avenue, 5Th Floor

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Stuart A. Carpey Esq.

600 West Germantown Pike

Plymouth Meeting, PA 19462

Roy T. Willey Esq. IV

Attorney at Anastopoulo Law Firm

32 Ann Street

Charleston, SC 29403

Eric Poulin Esq.

Attorney at Anastopoulo Law Firm

32 Ann Street

Charleston, SC 29403

Nicholas Colella Esq.

Attorney at Carlson Lynch

1133 Penn Avenue, 5Th Floor

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

 

Court Documents

21 #6

Exhibit E

21 #5

Exhibit D

21 #4

Exhibit C

21 #3

Exhibit B

21 #2

Exhibit A

21 #1

Motion(s)

#20

(#20) ECF FILER: AMENDED CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellants Christina Fusca and Brooke Ryan. [21-2016] (EWC) [Entered: 06/30/2021 10:58 AM]

#19

(#19) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Burt M. Rublin on behalf of Appellee(s) Temple University. [21-2016] (BMR) [Entered: 06/25/2021 11:21 AM]

#6

(#6) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Roberta D. Liebenberg on behalf of Appellee(s) Temple University. [21-2016] (RDL) [Entered: 06/10/2021 09:59 AM]

#5

(#5) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Roy T. Willey, IV on behalf of Appellant(s) Brooke Ryan, Christina Fusca. [21-2016] (RTW) [Entered: 06/10/2021 09:47 AM]

#4

(#4) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Eric M. Poulin on behalf of Appellant(s) Christina Fusca and Brooke Ryan. [21-2016] (EP) [Entered: 06/10/2021 07:55 AM]

#6

(#22) CLERK ORDER The motions to consolidate Nos. 21-2013 and 21-2016 are granted, and a third appeal (No. 21-2232) is also consolidated, as follows. The three above-captioned appeals are consolidated for the purposes of scheduling and disposition. All previously issued briefing schedules are vacated. At the appropriate time, briefing schedules will be simultaneously issued in all three appeals. The parties are encouraged to file joint briefs or adopt portions of other briefs by reference. See Fed. R. App. P. 28(i). The Court strongly disfavors redundant briefing. All case-opening forms, motions, briefs, and other documents should be electronically filed only in the appeal(s) to which the document relates. Failure to file documents in the appropriate appeal may result in the issuance of a noncompliance order. If any party is unsure how to file a particular document, he or she should call the case manager prior to filing the document. [21-2013, 21-2016, 21-2232] (ARR) [Entered: 07/02/2021 04:11 PM]

#3

(#3) Appendix Citation Notice sent to Stuart A. Carpey, Esq., Edward W. Ciolko, Esq., Gary F. Lynch, Esq., Eric Poulin, Esq.. If unable to comply you must respond on or before 06/11/2021. (AMR) [Entered: 05/27/2021 10:54 AM]

1 #5

Case Opening Letter

1 #4

Case Caption

1 #3

District Court Order

1 #2

District Court Memorandum

#1

Notice of Appeal

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) CLERK ORDER The motions to consolidate Nos. 21-2013 and 21-2016 are granted, and a third appeal (No. 21-2232) is also consolidated, as follows. The three above-captioned appeals are consolidated for the purposes of scheduling and disposition. All previously issued briefing schedules are vacated. At the appropriate time, briefing schedules will be simultaneously issued in all three appeals. The parties are encouraged to file joint briefs or adopt portions of other briefs by reference. See Fed. R. App. P. 28(i). The Court strongly disfavors redundant briefing. All case-opening forms, motions, briefs, and other documents should be electronically filed only in the appeal(s) to which the document relates. Failure to file documents in the appropriate appeal may result in the issuance of a noncompliance order. If any party is unsure how to file a particular document, he or she should call the case manager prior to filing the document. [21-2013, 21-2016, 21-2232] (ARR) [Entered: 07/02/2021 04:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ECF FILER: Motion filed by Appellee Temple University to consolidate for disposition ONLY case numbers 21-2016 & 21-2013. Certificate of Service dated 07/01/2021. Service made by ECF. [21-2016] (RDL) [Entered: 07/01/2021 12:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ECF FILER: AMENDED CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellants Christina Fusca and Brooke Ryan. [21-2016] (EWC) [Entered: 06/30/2021 10:58 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Burt M. Rublin on behalf of Appellee(s) Temple University. [21-2016] (BMR) [Entered: 06/25/2021 11:21 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • Docket(#18) BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED. Brief on behalf of Appellants Christina Fusca and Brooke Ryan due on or before 07/27/2021. Appendix due on or before 07/27/2021. VACATED PURSUANT TO THE CLERK'S ORDER DATED JULY 2, 2021.--[Edited 07/02/2021 by ARR] (ARR) [Entered: 06/17/2021 09:39 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • Docket(#17) Attorney Bar status modified for Stuart A. Carpey, Esq. for Brooke Ryan and Christina Fusca. Status is now active. (TMK) [Entered: 06/16/2021 12:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE REGARDING ATTORNEY STATUS for APPEARANCE FORM filed by Attorney Stuart A. Carpey, Esq. for Appellants Brooke Ryan and Christina Fusca. Counsel's current status in this Court's attorney rolls is inactive. An attorney must have active status in order to appear before this Court. R.A.D.E. 17.3. If you wish to return to active status or if you believe that you have been marked inactive in error, please complete the Attorney Admission Renewal/Adjustment of Status Form available on this Court's website by 06/30/2021. Future filings will not be accepted from an attorney in inactive status. (TMK) [Entered: 06/16/2021 09:04 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellants Christina Fusca and Brooke Ryan. [21-2016] (EWC) [Entered: 06/10/2021 05:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellants Christina Fusca and Brooke Ryan. [21-2016] (EWC) [Entered: 06/10/2021 04:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellants Christina Fusca and Brooke Ryan. [21-2016] (EWC) [Entered: 06/10/2021 04:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Nicholas A. Colella on behalf of Appellant(s) Brooke Ryan and Christina Fusca. [21-2016] (NC) [Entered: 06/10/2021 11:13 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Edward W. Ciolko on behalf of Appellant(s) Brooke Ryan and Christina Fusca. [21-2016] (EWC) [Entered: 06/10/2021 11:10 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Gary F. Lynch on behalf of Appellant(s) Brooke Ryan and Christina Fusca. [21-2016] (GFL) [Entered: 06/10/2021 11:05 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Gerard A. Dever on behalf of Appellee(s) Temple University. [21-2016] (GAD) [Entered: 06/10/2021 10:02 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Roberta D. Liebenberg on behalf of Appellee(s) Temple University. [21-2016] (RDL) [Entered: 06/10/2021 09:59 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Roy T. Willey, IV on behalf of Appellant(s) Brooke Ryan, Christina Fusca. [21-2016] (RTW) [Entered: 06/10/2021 09:47 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Eric M. Poulin on behalf of Appellant(s) Christina Fusca and Brooke Ryan. [21-2016] (EP) [Entered: 06/10/2021 07:55 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Appendix Citation Notice sent to Stuart A. Carpey, Esq., Edward W. Ciolko, Esq., Gary F. Lynch, Esq., Eric Poulin, Esq.. If unable to comply you must respond on or before 06/11/2021. (AMR) [Entered: 05/27/2021 10:54 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • Docket(#2) RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (AMR) [Entered: 05/27/2021 10:53 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellants Christina Fusca and Brooke Ryan in District Court No. 5-20-cv-02164. (AMR) [Entered: 05/27/2021 10:47 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TEMPLE UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL-EPISCOPAL CAMPUS is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nicholas Colella

Latest cases represented by Lawyer STUART A. CARPEY

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Eric Poulin