Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 04/04/2021 at 06:04:02 (UTC).

Bridgett Memorial Healthcare v. Becerra

Case Summary

On 02/03/2021 Bridgett Memorial Healthcare filed a Government Benefit - Medicare lawsuit against Becerra. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-20063

  • Filing Date:

    02/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Medicare

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

Alex M. Azar, II, Secretary, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services

Norris Cochran, Acting Secretary, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services

Xavier Becerra, Secretary, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services

Plaintiff / Appellant

Bridgett Memorial Healthcare, doing business as Bridge Solutions

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Jose Vela Jr.

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office

1000 Louisiana Street

Houston, TX 77002

Edward Himmelfarb

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20530

Abby Christine Wright

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20530

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Calvin Trey Scott

Attorney at Kennedy, Attorneys & Counselors at Law

12222 Merit Drive

Dallas, TX 75251

Mark S. Kennedy Esq.

Attorney at Kennedy, Attorneys & Counselors at Law

12222 Merit Drive

Dallas, TX 75251

 

Court Documents

Open Document

LETTER OF ADVISEMENT. Reason: advising parties of revised caption [21-20063] (SDH) [Entered: 03/23/2021 04:25 PM]

Open Document

CLERK ORDER granting Motion to extend time to file appellant's brief filed by Appellant Bridgett Memorial Healthcare [ # 9532802-2 ] A/Pet's Brief deadline updated to 04/23/2021 for Appellant Bridgett Memorial Healthcare [21-20063] (SDH) [Entered: 03/23/2021 03:40 PM]

Open Document

UNOPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellant Bridgett Memorial Healthcare to extend time to file brief as appellant until 04/23/2021 [9532802-2]. Date of service: 03/23/2021 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Himmelfarb, Vela, Wright; Attorney for Appellants: Kennedy, Scott [21-20063] (Mark S. Kennedy ) [Entered: 03/23/2021 01:04 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [21-20063] (Abby Christine Wright ) [Entered: 02/23/2021 02:44 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Calvin Trey Scott for Bridgett Memorial Healthcare for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [21-20063] (Calvin Trey Scott ) [Entered: 02/23/2021 12:53 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [21-20063] (Mark S. Kennedy ) [Entered: 02/23/2021 12:51 PM]

Open Document

CASE CAPTION updated. Appellee Alex M. Azar, II, Secretary, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services in 21-20063 substituted by Appellee Norris Cochran, Acting Secretary, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services in 21-20063 [21-20063] (RLL) [Entered: 02/22/2021 02:24 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [21-20063] (Edward Himmelfarb ) [Entered: 02/22/2021 01:14 PM]

Open Document

ATTORNEY TRANSCRIPT ORDER form filed by Appellant Bridgett Memorial Healthcarefor the Court to process. Date of service: 02/17/2021 via email - Attorney for Appellant: Scott; Attorney for Appellee: Vela. [21-20063] (Calvin Trey Scott ) [Entered: 02/17/2021 12:53 PM]

Open Document

BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 03/24/2021 for Appellant Bridgett Memorial Healthcare. [21-20063] (DDL) [Entered: 02/12/2021 09:54 AM]

Open Document

INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9501498-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [21-20063] (SDH) [Entered: 02/10/2021 11:32 AM]

Open Document

US CIVIL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Bridgett Memorial Healthcare [21-20063] (RLL) [Entered: 02/03/2021 10:43 AM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER OF ADVISEMENT. Reason: advising parties of revised caption [21-20063] (SDH) [Entered: 03/23/2021 04:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK ORDER granting Motion to extend time to file appellant's brief filed by Appellant Bridgett Memorial Healthcare [ # 9532802-2 ] A/Pet's Brief deadline updated to 04/23/2021 for Appellant Bridgett Memorial Healthcare [21-20063] (SDH) [Entered: 03/23/2021 03:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUNOPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellant Bridgett Memorial Healthcare to extend time to file brief as appellant until 04/23/2021 [9532802-2]. Date of service: 03/23/2021 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Himmelfarb, Vela, Wright; Attorney for Appellants: Kennedy, Scott [21-20063] (Mark S. Kennedy ) [Entered: 03/23/2021 01:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Abby Christine Wright for party(s) Appellee Norris Cochran, Acting Secretary, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, in case 21-20063 [21-20063] (SDH) [Entered: 02/24/2021 10:30 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Mark S. Kennedy for party(s) Appellant Bridgett Memorial Healthcare, in case 21-20063, by Attorney Calvin Trey Scott for Appellant Bridgett Memorial Healthcare in 21-20063 [21-20063] (SDH) [Entered: 02/24/2021 10:29 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [21-20063] (Abby Christine Wright ) [Entered: 02/23/2021 02:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Calvin Trey Scott for Bridgett Memorial Healthcare for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [21-20063] (Calvin Trey Scott ) [Entered: 02/23/2021 12:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [21-20063] (Mark S. Kennedy ) [Entered: 02/23/2021 12:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Edward Himmelfarb for party(s) Appellee Norris Cochran, Acting Secretary, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, in case 21-20063 [21-20063] (SDH) [Entered: 02/23/2021 09:37 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE CAPTION updated. Appellee Alex M. Azar, II, Secretary, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services in 21-20063 substituted by Appellee Norris Cochran, Acting Secretary, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services in 21-20063 [21-20063] (RLL) [Entered: 02/22/2021 02:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [21-20063] (Edward Himmelfarb ) [Entered: 02/22/2021 01:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellant Bridgett Memorial Healthcare advising transcript unnecessary as it is already filed. [21-20063] (SDH) [Entered: 02/19/2021 01:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketATTORNEY TRANSCRIPT ORDER form filed by Appellant Bridgett Memorial Healthcarefor the Court to process. Date of service: 02/17/2021 via email - Attorney for Appellant: Scott; Attorney for Appellee: Vela. [21-20063] (Calvin Trey Scott ) [Entered: 02/17/2021 12:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 03/24/2021 for Appellant Bridgett Memorial Healthcare. [21-20063] (DDL) [Entered: 02/12/2021 09:54 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • DocketELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Admitted Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Video/Audio Exhibits on File in District Court? No Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [21-20063] (DDL) [Entered: 02/12/2021 09:53 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED from District Court for 4:20-CV-1770. Electronic ROA due on 02/25/2021. [21-20063] (SDH) [Entered: 02/10/2021 11:37 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9501498-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [21-20063] (SDH) [Entered: 02/10/2021 11:32 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUS CIVIL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Bridgett Memorial Healthcare [21-20063] (RLL) [Entered: 02/03/2021 10:43 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Norris Cochran, Acting Secretary, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services is a litigant

Latest cases where Xavier Becerra, Secretary, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services is a litigant

Latest cases where ALEX M. AZAR, II, SECRETARY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Calvin Trey Scott