This case was last updated from PACER on 08/01/2021 at 06:01:26 (UTC).

Brian Taylor v. Club Demonstration Services, et al

Case Summary

On 06/02/2021 Brian Taylor filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Club Demonstration Services. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-2058

  • Filing Date:

    06/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BRIAN L. TAYLOR

Newark, NJ 07112

Defendant / Appellant

CLUB DEMONSTRATION SERVICES INC

Defendant / Appellee

MARC SULLIVAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Brian L. Taylor

120 Vassar Avenue, Apartment 3

Newark, NJ 07112

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Jocelyn A. Merced Esq.

Attorney at Ogletree Deakins

10 Madison Avenue, Suite 400

Morristown, NJ 07960

Peter O. Hughes Esq.

Attorney at Ogletree Deakins

10 Madison Avenue, Suite 400

Morristown, NJ 07960

 

Court Documents

10 #2

Briefing and Scheduling Order

10 #1

Briefing Notice Issued

#9

(#9) WRITTEN STATEMENT OF PARTICIPATION from Pro Se Appellee Brian L. Taylor. (CLW) [Entered: 06/15/2021 01:24 PM]

#8

(#8) ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellant Club Demonstration Services Inc advising this court that no transcripts are available. [21-2058] (JAM) [Entered: 06/15/2021 12:42 PM]

#7

(#7) ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Club Demonstration Services Inc. [21-2058] (JAM) [Entered: 06/15/2021 12:40 PM]

#6

(#6) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Club Demonstration Services Inc. [21-2058] (JAM) [Entered: 06/15/2021 12:34 PM]

#5

(#5) ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellant Club Demonstration Services Inc. [21-2058] (JAM) [Entered: 06/15/2021 12:28 PM]

#4

(#4) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Jocelyn A. Merced, Esq. on behalf of Appellant(s) Club Demonstration Services, Inc.. [21-2058] (JAM) [Entered: 06/15/2021 12:25 PM]

#3

(#3) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Peter O. Hughes, Esq. on behalf of Appellant(s) Club Demonstration Services, Inc.. [21-2058] (POH) [Entered: 06/15/2021 12:20 PM]

1 #6

Amended Case Opening Letter

1 #5

Case Opening Letter

1 #4

Case Caption

1 #3

District Court Order

1 #2

District Court Opinion

#1

Notice of Appeal

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED. Brief on behalf of Appellant Club Demonstration Services Inc due on or before 08/02/2021. Appendix due on or before 08/02/2021. (CLW) [Entered: 06/22/2021 12:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) WRITTEN STATEMENT OF PARTICIPATION from Pro Se Appellee Brian L. Taylor. (CLW) [Entered: 06/15/2021 01:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellant Club Demonstration Services Inc advising this court that no transcripts are available. [21-2058] (JAM) [Entered: 06/15/2021 12:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Club Demonstration Services Inc. [21-2058] (JAM) [Entered: 06/15/2021 12:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Club Demonstration Services Inc. [21-2058] (JAM) [Entered: 06/15/2021 12:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellant Club Demonstration Services Inc. [21-2058] (JAM) [Entered: 06/15/2021 12:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Jocelyn A. Merced, Esq. on behalf of Appellant(s) Club Demonstration Services, Inc.. [21-2058] (JAM) [Entered: 06/15/2021 12:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Peter O. Hughes, Esq. on behalf of Appellant(s) Club Demonstration Services, Inc.. [21-2058] (POH) [Entered: 06/15/2021 12:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • Docket(#2) RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (AMR) [Entered: 06/02/2021 02:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Club Demonstration Services Inc in District Court No. 2-20-cv-02803.--[Edited 06/02/2021 by LML to attach amended case opening letter] (AMR) [Entered: 06/02/2021 02:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Club Demonstration Services, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Peter O. Hughes Esq.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jocelyn A. Merced Esq.