This case was last updated from PACER on 04/12/2020 at 06:05:41 (UTC).

Brian Newton v. Parker Drilling Mgmt. Svcs., et al

Case Summary

On 02/12/2020 Brian Newton filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Parker Drilling Mgmt Svcs . This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-55146

  • Filing Date:

    02/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant

PARKER DRILLING MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC., a Nevada Corporation

Plaintiff / Appellant

BRIAN NEWTON, an individual

Defendant / Appellee

PARKER DRILLING MANAGEMENT SERVICES, LTD., Erroneously Sued As Parker Drilling Management Services, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Michael Strauss Esquire

Attorney at Strauss & Strauss, APC

121 N. Fir Street, Suite F

Ventura, CA 93001

Aris Edmund Karakalos

Attorney at Strauss & Strauss, APC

121 N. Fir Street, Suite F

Ventura, CA 93001

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Ellen M. Bronchetti Esquire

Attorney at DLA Piper LLP (US)

555 Mission Street

San Francisco, CA 94105

Ronald J. Holland Esquire

Attorney at McDermott Will & Emery

415 Mission Street, Suite 5600

San Francisco, CA 94105

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant settlement discussions while the appeal is pending. [11658187] (BLS) [Entered: 04/10/2020 05:19 PM]

#4

(#4) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: By 03/16/2020, counsel to email Circuit Mediator regarding settlement potential. Include Ninth Circuit case number in subject line. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested, and should not be filed with the court. The existing briefing schedule remains in effect. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. [11615634] (BLS) [Entered: 03/02/2020 05:06 PM]

#2

(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellant Brian Newton Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 02/19/2020. [11602448] [20-55146] (Strauss, Michael) [Entered: 02/19/2020 04:48 PM]

1 #4

Case Opening Packet

1 #3

Mediation Letter

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant settlement discussions while the appeal is pending. [11658187] (BLS) [Entered: 04/10/2020 05:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: By 03/16/2020, counsel to email Circuit Mediator regarding settlement potential. Include Ninth Circuit case number in subject line. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested, and should not be filed with the court. The existing briefing schedule remains in effect. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. [11615634] (BLS) [Entered: 03/02/2020 05:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • Docket(#3) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 02/19/2020. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11602542]. [20-55146] (AD) [Entered: 02/19/2020 06:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellant Brian Newton Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 02/19/2020. [11602448] [20-55146] (Strauss, Michael) [Entered: 02/19/2020 04:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Brian Newton Mediation Questionnaire due on 02/19/2020. Transcript ordered by 03/12/2020. Transcript due 04/13/2020. Appellant Brian Newton opening brief due 05/21/2020. Appellee Parker Drilling Management Services, Ltd. answering brief due 06/22/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11594667] (JBS) [Entered: 02/12/2020 10:57 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.