This case was last updated from PACER on 05/10/2019 at 06:03:15 (UTC).

Brian Miranda-Ortiz v. United States

Case Summary

On 03/11/2019 Brian Miranda-Ortiz filed a Prisoner - Vacate Sentence lawsuit against United States. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eighth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1485

  • Filing Date:

    03/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Vacate Sentence

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eighth Circuit

 

Party Details

Respondent / Appellee

United States of America

Petitioner / Appellant

Brian Miranda-Ortiz, also known as Jose Orlando Soriano-Quijada

Washington, MS 39190

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent / Appellee Attorneys

Craig Raymond Baune

Attorney at U.S. ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

600 U.S. Courthouse, 300 S. Fourth Street

Minneapolis, MN 55415-0000

Allen A. Slaughter Jr.

Attorney at U.S. ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

600 U.S. Courthouse, 300 S. Fourth Street

Minneapolis, MN 55415-0000

Petitioner / Appellant Attorney

Brian Miranda-Ortiz

Attorney at ADAMS COUNTY CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION

P.O. Box 1600

Washington, MS 39190

 

Court Documents

Open Document

CLERK LETTER sent regarding petitioner's request for copies. [4772569] [19-1485] (CBO) [Entered: 04/01/2019 10:34 AM]

Open Document #1

Letter requesting copy of PSI report

Open Document #2

Envelope

Open Document #3

ProSe NDA

Open Document #7

Attachment B

Open Document #8

ProSe NDA

Open Document #6

Attachment A

Open Document #5

Exhibit G - Objection

Open Document #4

Exhibit F - Declaration in Support

Open Document #3

Exhibit E - Affidavit in Support

Open Document #2

Exhibit D - Memorandum in Support

Open Document #1

Exhibit C in support of 2255

Open Document #8

ProSe NDA

Open Document #1

Application for COA

Open Document #2

Affidavit in Support of Application for COA

Open Document #5

Exhibit A in Support of COA

Open Document #6

Exhibit B in Support of COA

Open Document #3

Letter Requesting Filing of Docs

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK LETTER sent regarding petitioner's request for copies. [4772569] [19-1485] (CBO) [Entered: 04/01/2019 10:34 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • LETTER from Appellant Mr. Brian Miranda-Ortiz regarding request for copies w/service 04/01/2019 [4772560] [19-1485] (CBO) [Entered: 04/01/2019 10:23 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • Tendered Letter re: PSI and Statement of Reasons received from Appellant Mr. Brian Miranda-Ortiz [4770819] [19-1485] (AMT) [Entered: 03/26/2019 12:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DOCUMENT FILED - Exhibits "C" through "G" and attachments "A" and "B" in support of petitioner's 2255 motion. filed by Mr. Brian Miranda-Ortiz. w/service 03/22/2019. [4769695] [19-1485] (CBO) [Entered: 03/22/2019 11:10 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION for Certificate of Appealability, filed by Appellant Mr. Brian Miranda-Ortiz w/service 03/22/2019. Includes application, affidavit(s), supplement, and exhibit(s). [4769676] [19-1485] (CBO) [Entered: 03/22/2019 10:41 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • RECORD FILED - SEALED RECORDS, Location STL, Comments: 1 envelope containing Sealed Plea Agreement and Sentencing Stipulations - District Court document #147, Source Location: USDC / MN [4769413] [19-1485] (STL) [Entered: 03/21/2019 02:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • RECORD FILED - SEALED PSI REPORT, 1 volumes, Location STL, Comments: 1 volume, 3 copies of Sealed PSI Report, Addendums, and Statement of Reasons, Source Location: USDC / MN [4766078] [19-1485] (STL) [Entered: 03/13/2019 10:44 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • Originating court document filed consisting of originating court order of 03/07/2019 Granting IFP and Denying COA, [4764931] [19-1485] (CBO) [Entered: 03/11/2019 11:21 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK ORDER:If the original file of the United States District Court is available for review in electronic format, the court will rely on the electronic version of the record in its review. The appendices required by Eighth Circuit Rule 30A shall not be required. In accordance with Eighth Circuit Local Rule 30A(a)(2), the Clerk of the United States District Court is requested to forward to this Court forthwith any portions of the original record which are not available in an electronic format through PACER, including any documents maintained in paper format or filed under seal, exhibits, administrative records and state court files. These documents should be submitted within 10 days. [4764868] [19-1485] (CBO) [Entered: 03/11/2019 10:36 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal filed 3/4/2019, docket entries, memorandum and order filed 2/4/2019, and judgment filed 2/7/2019. [4764857] [19-1485] (CBO) [Entered: 03/11/2019 10:22 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Prisoner case docketed. [4764796] [19-1485] (CBO) [Entered: 03/11/2019 09:38 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.