This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 09/04/2020 at 06:09:56 (UTC).

Brian Mecinas, et al v. Katie Hobbs

Case Summary

On 07/06/2020 Brian Mecinas filed a Civil Right - Voting Discrimination lawsuit against Katie Hobbs. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-16301

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Voting Discrimination

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellants

PATTI SERRANO

CAROLYN VASKO

DNC SERVICES CORPORATION, DBA Democratic National Committee

PRIORITIES USA

DSCC

BRIAN MECINAS

Defendant / Appellee

KATIE HOBBS, the Arizona Secretary of State

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Austin C. Yost

Attorney at Perkins Coie

2901 North Central Avenue, Suite 2000

Phoenix, AZ 85012-2788

Abha Khanna

Attorney at Perkins Coie LLP

1201 Third Avenue, Suite 4900

Seattle, WA 98101

Sarah Rae Gonski Esquire

Attorney at Perkins Coie

2901 North Central Avenue, Suite 2000

Phoenix, AZ 85012-2788

Marc Erik Elias

Attorney at Perkins Coie LLP

700 Thirteenth Street N.W., Suite 800

Washington, DC 20005-3960

Elisabeth C. Frost

Attorney at Perkins Coie LLP

700 Thirteenth Street N.W., Suite 800

Washington, DC 20005-3960

John Michael Geise

Attorney at Perkins Coie LLP

700 Thirteenth Street N.W., Suite 800

Washington, DC 20005-3960

Jacki Anderson

Attorney at Perkins Coie LLP

700 Thirteenth Street N.W., Suite 800

Washington, DC 20005-3960

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Kara Marie Karlson

Attorney at Arizona Attorney General's Office

2005 N. Central Avenue

Phoenix, AZ 85004

Emma J. Cone-Roddy

Attorney at Osborn Maledon, PA

2929 N. Central Avenue, Suite 2100

Phoenix, AZ 85012

Kimberly Friday

Attorney at Osborn Maledon, PA

2929 N. Central Avenue, Suite 2100

Phoenix, AZ 85012

Mary O'Grady

Attorney at Osborn Maledon, PA

2929 N. Central Avenue, Suite 2100

Phoenix, AZ 85012

Linley Wilson

Attorney at Arizona Attorney General's Office

2005 N. Central Avenue

Phoenix, AZ 85004

 

Court Documents

#14

#11

10 #2

Additional Document

10 #1

Main Document

#9

8 #3

Exhibit G

8 #2

Exhibit F

8 #1

Plaintiffs-Appellants' Reply In Support of Emergency Motion Under Circuit Rule 2

7 #2

Exhibits for Response to Emergency Motion for Injunction Pending Appeal

7 #1

Response to Emergency Motion for Injunction Pending Appeal

#6

2 #7

Exhibit E

2 #6

Exhibit D

2 #5

Exhibit C

2 #4

Exhibit B

2 #3

Exhibit A

#2

Index of Exhibits

2 #1

Motion For Injunction Pending Appeal

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/30/2020
  • Docket(#15) Added Attorney(s) Jacki Anderson, John Michael Geise for party(s) Appellant Brian Mecinas Appellant Carolyn Vasko Appellant Priorities USA Appellant DSCC Appellant Patti Serrano Appellant DNC Services Corporation, in case 20-16301. [11771653] (CW) [Entered: 07/30/2020 09:38 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. All further inquiries regarding this appeal, including request for extensions of time, should be directed to the Clerk's Office. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant settlement discussions while the appeal is pending. [11771607] (VS) [Entered: 07/30/2020 09:19 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • Docket(#13) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Jacki L. Anderson (Perkins Coie LLP, 700 13th Street, NW, Suite 800, Washington DC 20005-3960) for Appellants DNC Services Corporation, DSCC, Brian Mecinas, Priorities USA, Patti Serrano and Carolyn Vasko. Date of service: 07/30/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11771589] [20-16301] (Anderson, Jacki) [Entered: 07/30/2020 09:08 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • Docket(#12) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of John Michael Geise (Perkins Coie LLP, 700 13th Street, NW, Suite 800, Washington DC 20005-3960) for Appellants DNC Services Corporation, DSCC, Brian Mecinas, Priorities USA, Patti Serrano and Carolyn Vasko. Date of service: 07/30/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11771579] [20-16301] (Geise, John) [Entered: 07/30/2020 09:00 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: TAH): The parties joint motion (Docket Entry No. [ # 10 ]) to extend the due dates for the briefs is granted. The opening brief is due December 17, 2020. The answering brief is due January 28, 2021. The optional reply brief is due February 18, 2021. [11771135] (AF) [Entered: 07/29/2020 04:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Filed (ECF) Appellants DNC Services Corporation, DSCC, Brian Mecinas, Priorities USA, Patti Serrano and Carolyn Vasko Joint Motion for miscellaneous relief [Joint Motion for a Modified Briefing Schedule]. Date of service: 07/29/2020. [11770442] [20-16301] (Gonski, Sarah) [Entered: 07/29/2020 10:41 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Filed order (SIDNEY R. THOMAS, MARY M. SCHROEDER and CONSUELO M. CALLAHAN): Appellants emergency motion for injunctive relief (Docket Entry No. [ # 2 ]) is denied. Winter v. Natural Res. Def. Council, Inc., 555 U.S. 7, 20 (2008). The briefing schedule established previously remains in effect. [11762428] (AF) [Entered: 07/22/2020 03:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Filed (ECF) Appellants DNC Services Corporation, DSCC, Brian Mecinas, Priorities USA, Patti Serrano and Carolyn Vasko reply to response (). Date of service: 07/20/2020. [11761071] [20-16301] (Gonski, Sarah) [Entered: 07/21/2020 04:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Filed (ECF) Appellee Katie Hobbs response to motion ([ # 2 ] Motion (ECF Filing), [ # 2 ] Motion (ECF Filing)). Date of service: 07/17/2020. [11757398] [20-16301] (Karlson, Kara) [Entered: 07/17/2020 03:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: By 07/28/2020, counsel to email Circuit Mediator regarding settlement potential. Include Ninth Circuit case number in subject line. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested, and should not be filed with the court. The existing briefing schedule remains in effect. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. [11752267] (VS) [Entered: 07/14/2020 11:30 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • Docket(#5) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 07/13/2020. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11750575]. [20-16301] (AD) [Entered: 07/13/2020 12:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Filed (ECF) Appellants DSCC, DNC Services Corporation, Brian Mecinas, Priorities USA, Patti Serrano and Carolyn Vasko Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 07/13/2020. [11750275] [20-16301] (Gonski, Sarah) [Entered: 07/13/2020 10:32 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: AT): The court has received appellants emergency motion for injunctive relief pending appeal. The response to the motion is due by 5:00 p.m. Friday, July 17, 2020. The optional reply is due by 5:00 p.m. Tuesday, July 21, 2020.[11750034] (WL) [Entered: 07/13/2020 08:29 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellants DNC Services Corporation, DSCC, Brian Mecinas, Priorities USA, Patti Serrano and Carolyn Vasko EMERGENCY Motion for injunction pending appeal. Date of service: 07/10/2020. [11749622] [20-16301] (Gonski, Sarah) [Entered: 07/10/2020 05:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellants DNC Services Corporation, DSCC, Brian Mecinas, Priorities USA, Patti Serrano and Carolyn Vasko Mediation Questionnaire due on 07/13/2020. Transcript ordered by 08/03/2020. Transcript due 09/01/2020. Appellants DNC Services Corporation, DSCC, Brian Mecinas, Priorities USA, Patti Serrano and Carolyn Vasko opening brief due 10/14/2020. Appellee Katie Hobbs answering brief due 11/16/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11742913] (RT) [Entered: 07/06/2020 02:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Priorities USA is a litigant

Latest cases where DSCC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kimberly Irene Friday

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Linley Wilson