This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 10/09/2021 at 05:43:25 (UTC).

Brian Heyward v. Department of Labor

Case Summary

On 10/07/2021 Brian Heyward filed an Other lawsuit against Department of Labor. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-2097

  • Filing Date:

    10/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BRIAN HEYWARD

Piedmont, SC 29673

Respondent

DEPARTMENT OF LABOR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Brian Heyward

129 Alberta Circle

Piedmont, SC 29673

Respondent Attorneys

Lauren Stephanie Goodman

Attorney at U. S. DEPARTMENT OF LABOR

200 Constitution Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20210

Heather R. Phillips

Attorney at U. S. DEPARTMENT OF LABOR

200 Constitution Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20210

Thomas O. Shepherd Jr.

Attorney at U. S. DEPARTMENT OF LABOR

200 Constitution Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20210-0001

Other Attorneys

Alvin Jack Finklea

Attorney at SCOPELITIS GARVIN LIGHT HANSON & FEARY, PC

10 West Market Street

Indianapolis, IN 46204

 

Court Documents

2 #1

Petition for review of agency order

#2

Agency Order 07/29/2021

2 #3

Order on Reconsideration 09/07/2021

#1

3 #1

Informal briefing order

3 #2

form(s) sent

#4

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) FEE NOTICE issued to Brian Heyward - initial notice. Fee or application to proceed as indigent due 10/22/2021. Originating case number: ARB 2021-0023 / ALJ 2020-STA-00117. [21-2097] CT [Entered: 10/07/2021 01:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. Informal Opening Brief due 11/01/2021. Administrative Record due 11/16/2021. Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief served. [21-2097] CT [Entered: 10/07/2021 01:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: ARB 2021-0023 / ALJ 2020-STA-00117. Case manager: CathyHerb. [21-2097] CT [Entered: 10/07/2021 09:27 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Petition for review of agency order filed by Brian Heyward .[1001037186] [21-2097] CT [Entered: 10/07/2021 09:32 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Department Of Labor is a litigant