This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 06/20/2021 at 06:03:17 (UTC).

Brian Gozdenovich v. AARP Inc, et al

Case Summary

On 04/21/2021 Brian Gozdenovich filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against AARP Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-1775

  • Filing Date:

    04/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

AARP SERVICES INC

UNITEDHEALTH GROUP INC

AARP INC

UNITEDHEALTHCARE INSURANCE CO

AARP INSURANCE PLAN

Plaintiff / Appellant

BRIAN GOZDENOVICH, on behalf of himself and all others similarly situated

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Heather S. Goldman Esq.

Attorney at Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner

1155 F Street, N.W.

Washington, DC 20004

Liza M. Walsh Esq.

Attorney at Walsh Pizzi O'Reilly & Falanga

Three Gateway Center, 100 Mulberry Street, 15Th Floor

Newark, NJ 07102

Katelyn O'Reilly Esq.

Attorney at Walsh Pizzi O'Reilly & Falanga

Three Gateway Center, 100 Mulberry Street, 15Th Floor

Newark, NJ 07102

Jeffrey S. Russell Esq.

Attorney at Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner

211 North Broadway, One Metropolitan Square, Suite 3600

St. Louis, MO 63102

Alec W. Farr Esq.

Attorney at Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner

1155 F Street, N.W.

Washington, DC 20004

George C. Jones Esq.

Attorney at McElroy Deutsch Mulvaney & Carpenter

1300 Mount Kemble Avenue, P.O. Box 2075

Morristown, NJ 07962

Thomas R. Curtin Esq.

Attorney at McElroy Deutsch Mulvaney & Carpenter

1300 Mount Kemble Avenue, P.O. Box 2075

Morristown, NJ 07962

Kathleen N. Fennelly Esq.

Attorney at McElroy Deutsch Mulvaney & Carpenter

1300 Mount Kemble Avenue, P.O. Box 2075

Morristown, NJ 07962

Brian D. Boyle Esq.

Attorney at O'Melveny & Myers

1625 Eye Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Meaghan M. VerGow Esq.

Attorney at O'Melveny & Myers

1625 Eye Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

James E. Cecchi Esq.

Attorney at Carella Byrne Cecchi Olstein Brody & Agnello

5 Becker Farm Road

Roseland, NJ 07068

Andrew J. Obergfell Esq.

Attorney at Bursor & Fisher

888 Seventh Avenue, 10Th Floor

New York, NY 10019

Scott A. Bursor Esq.

Attorney at Bursor & Fisher

701 Brickell Avenue, Suite 1420

Miami, FL 10019

 

Court Documents

#20

19 #8

Exhibit G

19 #7

Exhibit F

19 #6

Exhibit E

19 #5

Exhibit D

19 #4

Exhibit C

19 #3

Exhibit B

19 #2

Exhibiit A

19 #1

Motion(s)

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

1 #3

Case Caption

1 #2

District Court Letter Order

#1

Notice of Appeal

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ORDER (Clerk) referring the Joint Motion to Continue Impoundment of Sealed Record to a motions panel. If the Court grants the motion, the parties must file the sealed documents in a separately bound volume(s) of the appendix. Further, the parties should review 3d Cir LAR 106.1(a) with respect to briefs, motions, and other filings. Redacted versions of documents should be filed to the greatest extent possible. (JK) [Entered: 05/21/2021 05:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ECF FILER: JOINT Motion filed by Appellees UnitedHealth Group Inc and UnitedHealthCare Insurance Co to seal All documents sealed by the District Court in the proceedings below.. Certificate of Service dated 05/20/2021. Service made by ECF. [21-1775] (TRC) [Entered: 05/20/2021 04:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from George C. Jones on behalf of Appellee(s) United Health Group Inc.; UnitedHealthcare Insurance Co.. [21-1775] (GCJ) [Entered: 05/20/2021 10:28 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Thomas R. Curtin on behalf of Appellee(s) UnitedHealth Group, Inc. and UnitedHealthcare Insurance Co.. [21-1775] (TRC) [Entered: 05/19/2021 04:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Alec Winfield Farr on behalf of Appellee(s) AARP, Inc., AARP Services, Inc. AARP Insurance Plan. [21-1775] (AWF) [Entered: 05/17/2021 01:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Notice to Counsel. The attached document is restricted. To view document, click on the document number link in the NDA (Notice of Docket Activity). In order to access this document, you must be the attorney of record using your individual ECF login and password. (TNH) [Entered: 05/07/2021 12:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Scott A. Bursor on behalf of Appellant(s) Brian Gozdenovich. [21-1775] (SAB) [Entered: 05/04/2021 04:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellant Brian Gozdenovich advising this court that no transcripts are available. [21-1775] (LHT) [Entered: 05/04/2021 03:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellant Brian Gozdenovich. [21-1775] (LHT) [Entered: 05/04/2021 03:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Brian Gozdenovich. [21-1775] (LHT) [Entered: 05/04/2021 03:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Liza M. Walsh on behalf of Appellee(s) AARP, Inc., AARP Services, Inc., and AARP Insurance Plan. [21-1775] (LMW) [Entered: 05/04/2021 03:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from James E. Cecchi on behalf of Appellant(s) Brian Gozdenovich. [21-1775] (JEC) [Entered: 05/04/2021 02:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Lindsey H. Taylor on behalf of Appellant(s) Brian Gozdenovich. [21-1775] (LHT) [Entered: 05/04/2021 02:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellees AARP Inc, AARP Insurance Plan and AARP Services Inc. [21-1775] (JSR) [Entered: 05/04/2021 01:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Jeffrey S. Russell on behalf of Appellee(s) AARP, Inc., AARP Services, Inc., and AARP Insurance Plan. [21-1775] (JSR) [Entered: 05/04/2021 01:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Brian D. Boyle on behalf of Appellee(s) UnitedHealth Group Inc. and UnitedHealthcare Insurance Co.. [21-1775] (BDB) [Entered: 05/04/2021 12:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellees UnitedHealth Group Inc and UnitedHealthCare Insurance Co. [21-1775] (MMV) [Entered: 05/03/2021 02:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Meaghan VerGow on behalf of Appellee(s) UnitedHealth Group Inc. and UnitedHealthcare Insurance Co.. [21-1775] (MMV) [Entered: 05/03/2021 02:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • Docket(#2) RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (AMR) [Entered: 04/21/2021 11:36 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Brian Gozdenovich in District Court No. 2-18-cv-02788. (AMR) [Entered: 04/21/2021 11:32 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AARP Services, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where AARP Insurance plan is a litigant

Latest cases where AARP is a litigant

Latest cases where UNITED HEALTHCARE INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant