This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 06/11/2022 at 06:41:19 (UTC).

Brian Bash v. Textron Financial Corporation

Case Summary

On 03/30/2020 Brian Bash filed a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit against Textron Financial Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Sixth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-3351

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

 

Party Details

Appellant and Plaintiff / Appellant

BRIAN A. BASH, Chapter 7 Trustee

Debtor

In re: FAIR FINANCE COMPANY

Appellee and Defendant / Appellee

TEXTRON FINANCIAL CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Scott C. Holbrook

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler

1900 E. Ninth Street, Suite 3200

Cleveland, OH 44114-3485

Daniel R. Warren

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler

1900 E. Ninth Street, Suite 3200

Cleveland, OH 44114-3485

Michael Andrew VanNiel

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler

1900 E. Ninth Street, Suite 3200

Cleveland, OH 44114-3485

Jeremy Dunnaback

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler

1900 E. Ninth Street, Suite 3200

Cleveland, OH 44114-3485

Appellee and Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Kenneth C. Johnson

100 S. Third Street

Columbus, OH 43215

James Preston Schuck

100 S. Third Street

Columbus, OH 43215

Quintin F. Lindsmith

Attorney at Bricker & Eckler

100 S. Third Street

Columbus, OH 43215

Mitchell A. Karlan

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher

200 Park Avenue, 47Th Floor

New York, NY 10166

Lee G. Dunst

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher

200 Park Avenue, 47Th Floor

New York, NY 10166

Nancy Hart

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher

200 Park Avenue, 47Th Floor

New York, NY 10166

Timothy Sun

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher

200 Park Avenue, 47Th Floor

New York, NY 10166

 

Court Documents

#54

53 #2

Judge Order - Rehearing Denied

53 #1

Cover Letter

#52

#51

#50

RESTRICTED

#49

48 #3

Judgment

48 #2

Opinion

48 #1

Cover Letter

#45

#44

RESTRICTED

#43

#42

#41

RESTRICTED

#39

35 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#54) MANDATE ISSUED with no costs taxed. (DRK) [Entered: 10/13/2021 01:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#53) ORDER filed denying corrected petition for panel rehearing [ # 52 ] filed by Mr. Daniel R. Warren. R. Guy Cole, Jr., Circuit Judge; John K. Bush, Circuit Judge and John B. Nalbandian, Circuit Judge. (JAC) [Entered: 10/05/2021 03:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#52) CORRECTED PETITION for rehearing before original panel filed by Mr. Daniel R. Warren for Brian A. Bash. Certificate of Service: 09/27/2021. [20-3351]--[Edited 09/28/2021 by RLB] (DRW) [Entered: 09/27/2021 04:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#51) MOTION filed by Mr. Daniel R. Warren for Brian A. Bash for Leave to File Corrected Petition for Panel Rehearing Certificate of Service: 09/27/2021. [20-3351] (DRW) [Entered: 09/27/2021 04:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#50) ****DOCUMENT LOCKED - INCORRECT ELECTRONIC ENTRY - COUNSEL INSTRUCTED TO REFILE AS PETITION FOR REHEARING AND A SEPARATE MOTION TO FILE A CORRECTED PETITION IS REQUIRED TO BE FILED*** FILED: CORRECTED PETITION for rehearing before original panel by Mr. Daniel R. Warren for Brian A. Bash. Certificate of Service: 09/26/2021. [20-3351]--[Edited 09/27/2021 by RLB] (DRW) [Entered: 09/26/2021 02:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#49) PETITION for rehearing before original panel filed by Mr. Daniel R. Warren for Brian A. Bash. Certificate of Service: 09/24/2021. [20-3351] (DRW) [Entered: 09/24/2021 12:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#48) OPINION and JUDGMENT filed : AFFIRMED. Decision for publication. R. Guy Cole, Jr., John K. Bush, and John B. Nalbandian (AUTHORING), Circuit Judges. (CL) [Entered: 09/10/2021 12:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • Docket(#47) The case manager for this case is now: Robin Baker (JEC) [Entered: 08/18/2021 01:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • Docket(#46) **LOCKED - DOCKETED IN ERROR** TRANSCRIPT ordered from Ms. Susan Trischan, filed by Mr. Mitchell A. Karlan for Textron Financial Corporation. [46] ; ----- This is to order a transcript of the following proceedings and to certify that satisfactory financial arrangements have been completed ----- Transcript ordered on: 06/16/2021 ; District Court Judge/Magistrate: Patricia A. Gaughan ; Hearing Dates: June 10, 2021 - Appeal argument ; Method of Payment: Private Funds ; Court reporter acknowledgement is due in 14 days. Certificate of Service: 06/16/2021. [20-3351]--[Edited 06/16/2021 by RLJ] (MAK) [Entered: 06/16/2021 03:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45) CAUSE ARGUED, (via video), by Mr. Daniel R. Warren for Appellant Brian A. Bash and Mr. Mitchell A. Karlan for Appellee Textron Financial Corporation before Judges: Cole, Bush and Nalbandian. (LTK) [Entered: 06/10/2021 11:56 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
34 More Docket Entries
  • 04/09/2020
  • Docket(#10) Court Reporter Acknowledgement filed by Ms. Susan Trischan, for transcript [8] ; Arrangements for payment were made on 04/09/2020 ; Estimated completion date: 05/11/2020 ; Estimated number of pages: 2500 . [20-3351] (ST) [Entered: 04/09/2020 12:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • Docket(#9) NOTIFICATION: Setting acknowledgement deadline, relating to transcript order, [8]. Susan Trischan's acknowledgement is due 04/21/2020. (BLC) [Entered: 04/07/2020 08:46 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • Docket(#8) TRANSCRIPT ordered from Ms. Susan Trischan, filed by Mr. Daniel R. Warren for Brian A. Bash. [8] ; ----- This is to order a transcript of the following proceedings and to certify that satisfactory financial arrangements have been completed ----- Transcript ordered on: 04/06/2020 ; District Court Judge/Magistrate: Judge Patricia A. Gaughan ; Hearing Dates: Transcripts of Trial Proceedings for 2/24/20 to 2/28/20, 3/2/20 to 3/6/20, and 3/9/20 to 3/10/20. ; Other: Requesting transcripts for all trial proceedings. ; Method of Payment: Private Funds ; Court reporter acknowledgement is due in 14 days. Certificate of Service: 04/06/2020. [20-3351] (DRW) [Entered: 04/06/2020 05:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MEDIATOR-INITIATED CALL: A Telephone Mediation conference has been scheduled for 05/12/2020 at 9:30 AM (ET) with Paul Calico. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (LMR) [Entered: 03/31/2020 12:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • Docket(#6) Mediation Office is involved in this appeal. (LMR) [Entered: 03/31/2020 12:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Brian A. Bash by Michael A. VanNiel. Certificate of Service: 03/30/2020. [20-3351] (MAV) [Entered: 03/30/2020 02:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Brian A. Bash by Scott C. Holbrook. Certificate of Service: 03/30/2020. [20-3351] (SCH) [Entered: 03/30/2020 02:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Brian A. Bash by Daniel R. Warren. Certificate of Service: 03/30/2020. [20-3351] (DRW) [Entered: 03/30/2020 02:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • Docket(#2) The case manager for this case is: Bryant Crutcher: 513-564-7013. (BLC) [Entered: 03/30/2020 09:40 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Bankruptcy Case Docketed. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Brian A. Bash. Hearings held: y. (BLC) [Entered: 03/30/2020 09:28 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Scott C. Holbrook

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael A. VanNiel