This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 08/05/2022 at 06:11:12 (UTC).

Brian Anderson v. Arizona Department of Corrections Rehabilitation a, et al

Case Summary

On 06/06/2022 Brian Anderson filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Arizona Department of Corrections Rehabilitation a,. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-15832

  • Filing Date:

    06/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

BRIAN LYLE ANDERSON

San Luis, AZ 85349

Defendant / Appellees

ARIZONA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS REHABILITATION AND REENTRY

DAVID SHINN, Director, Director - ADCRR

JOSEPH PROFIRI, Deputy Director - ADCRR

LANCE HETMER, Divisions Director - ADCRR

UNKNOWN PARTY, Assistant Director - ADCRR Health Services

GLORIA MATTICE, Deputy Warden - ASPC Yuma - Dakota Unit

JAMES MESS, Assistant Deputy Warden - ASPC Yuma - Dakota Unit

CENTURION MANAGED CARE, Contracted Health Services for ADCRR

ELIJAH JORDAN, M.D. at ASPC Yuma - Dakota Unit and Centurion Managed Care

ZAID SIDI, Physicians Assistant at ASPC Yuma - Dakota Unit and Centurion Managed Care

PAUL DANKEMEYER, Doctor of Dental Surgery at ASPC Yuma - Dakota Unit and Centurion Managed Care

CARLI MYERS, Registered Nurse and Director of Nursing at ASPC Yuma - Dakota Unit and Centurion Managed Care

BRIN HOFER, Facility Health Administrator at ASPC Yuma - Dakota Unit and Centurion Managed Care

JAMES W. BAIRD, Medical Doctor at ASPC Yuma - Dakota Unit and Centurion Managed Care through Telemed in Tucson, Arizona Office

JENKINS, Unknown (Deceased) Warden, ASPC-Yuma Complex

ARIZONA, STATE OF

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Brian Lyle Anderson

Attorney at ASPC - ARIZONA STATE PRISON COMPLEX (YUMA)

P.O. Box 8909

San Luis, AZ 85349

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Sarah Lynn Barnes Esquire

Attorney at Broening Oberg Woods & Wilson, PC

2800 N Central Avenue, Suite 1600

Phoenix, AZ 85004-1580

Ken Sanders

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE ARIZONA ATTORNEY GENERAL

416 W Congress

Tucson, AZ 85701

Daniel Patrick Schaack Esquire

Attorney at Arizona Attorney General's Office

2005 N Central Avenue

Phoenix, AZ 85004

 

Court Documents

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

1 #3

Case Opening Packet

#2

(#2) Received notice of change of address dated 06/17/2022 from Brian Lyle Anderson. New address: ASPC, Dakota Unit, P.O. Box 8909, San Luis, AZ 85349. [12483003] (HH) [Entered: 06/29/2022 11:32 AM]

#5

(#5) Filed Appellant Brian Lyle Anderson letter dated 06/29/2022 re: Requesting copy of rules and docket sheet. Paper filing deficiency: None. [12488078] (HH) [Entered: 07/07/2022 09:19 AM]

#7

(#7) Filed Appellant Brian Lyle Anderson motion to extend time of 30-days to file appellant opening brief. Deficiencies: None. Served on 07/04/2022. [12490978] (HH) [Entered: 07/11/2022 02:37 PM]

#8

(#8) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: th): Granting Appellant's Motion [ # 7 ] to extend time to file the opening brief. Appellant Brian Lyle Anderson opening brief due 08/25/2022. Appellees' answering brief due 09/26/2022. The appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. This order was issued prior to the expiration of time within which a response may be filed. Fed. R. App. P. 27(b). [12491134] (TH) [Entered: 07/11/2022 03:51 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/29/2022
  • Docket(#10) Added Attorney Daniel Patrick Schaack for Appellee Arizona, State Of, in case 22-15832. [12505022] (HH) [Entered: 07/29/2022 11:09 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • Docket(#9) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Daniel P. Schaack (Office of the Attorney General, 2005 N. Central Avenue, Phoenix, AZ 85004-1592) for Appellee Arizona, State Of. Date of service: 07/29/2022. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12504956] [22-15832] (Schaack, Daniel) [Entered: 07/29/2022 10:25 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: th): Granting Appellant's Motion [ # 7 ] to extend time to file the opening brief. Appellant Brian Lyle Anderson opening brief due 08/25/2022. Appellees' answering brief due 09/26/2022. The appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. This order was issued prior to the expiration of time within which a response may be filed. Fed. R. App. P. 27(b). [12491134] (TH) [Entered: 07/11/2022 03:51 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Filed Appellant Brian Lyle Anderson motion to extend time of 30-days to file appellant opening brief. Deficiencies: None. Served on 07/04/2022. [12490978] (HH) [Entered: 07/11/2022 02:37 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • Docket(#6) Sent Appellant a copy of the docket sheet and the FRAP and Ninth Circuit rules in response to the Form 29 request filed on 07/06/2022. [12488185] (JR) [Entered: 07/07/2022 10:14 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Filed Appellant Brian Lyle Anderson letter dated 06/29/2022 re: Requesting copy of rules and docket sheet. Paper filing deficiency: None. [12488078] (HH) [Entered: 07/07/2022 09:19 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • Docket(#4) Attorney Neil Singh substituted by Attorney Ken Sanders in 22-15832. [12483945] (HH) [Entered: 06/30/2022 11:32 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • Docket(#3) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Ken Sanders (Office of the Attorney General, 416 W. Congress, 2nd Floor, Tucson, AZ 85701) for Appellee Arizona, State Of. Substitution for Attorney Neil Singh for Appellee Arizona, State Of. Date of service: 06/30/2022. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12483927] [22-15832] (Sanders, Ken) [Entered: 06/30/2022 11:26 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Received notice of change of address dated 06/17/2022 from Brian Lyle Anderson. New address: ASPC, Dakota Unit, P.O. Box 8909, San Luis, AZ 85349. [12483003] (HH) [Entered: 06/29/2022 11:32 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL AND PRO SE APPELLANT. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Brian Lyle Anderson opening brief due 07/26/2022. Appellees Arizona Department of Corrections Rehabilitation and Reentry, Arizona, State Of, James W. Baird, Centurion Managed Care, Paul Dankemeyer, Lance Hetmer, Brin Hofer, Jenkins, Elijah Jordan, Gloria Mattice, James Mess, Carli Myers, Joseph Profiri, David Shinn, Director, Zaid Sidi and Unknown Party answering brief due 08/25/2022. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12464388] (ABT) [Entered: 06/06/2022 02:10 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less