This case was last updated from PACER on 01/11/2020 at 06:00:30 (UTC).

Breen v. Green, et al

Case Summary

On 11/12/2019 Breen filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against Green. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, First Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-2133

  • Filing Date:

    11/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, First Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant

E*TRADE FINANCIAL CORP.

Defendant / Appellants

HOWLAND GREEN

LINDA GREEN

Plaintiff / Appellee

CATHERINE BREEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellant Attorney

Stephen J. Brouillard

Attorney at Bianchi Brouillard Sousa & O'Connell

56 Pine St, Ste 250

Providence, RI 02903

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Ryan J. Lutrario

Attorney at Indeglia & Associates

300 Centerville Rd, Summit East, Ste 320

Warwick, RI 02886

Vincent A. Indeglia

Attorney at Indeglia & Associates

300 Centerville Rd, Summit East

E. Greenwich, RI 02818-1685

 

Court Documents

Open Document

MANDATE issued. [19-2133] (GB) [Entered: 01/02/2020 12:18 PM]

Open Document

JUDGMENT entered: Upon consideration of appellants' unopposed motion, it is hereby ordered that this appeal be voluntarily dismissed pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 42(b). Mandate to issue forthwith. [19-2133] (GB) [Entered: 01/02/2020 12:17 PM]

Open Document

MOTION to dismiss case filed by Appellants Howland Green and Linda Green. Certificate of service dated 12/20/2019. [19-2133] (SJB) [Entered: 12/20/2019 01:28 PM]

Open Document #2

Notice Regarding Native PDF

Open Document #1

Appellant's Briefing Notice

Open Document

NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Catherine Breen filed by Attorney Ryan J. Lutrario. Certificate of service dated 12/04/2019. [19-2133] (RJL) [Entered: 12/04/2019 03:11 PM]

Open Document

NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Catherine Breen filed by Attorney Vincent A. Indeglia. Certificate of service dated 11/21/2019. [19-2133] (VAI) [Entered: 11/21/2019 01:45 PM]

Open Document #2

Transcript Acknowledgment

Open Document #1

Transcript Order Form

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellants Howland Green and Linda Green indicating transcripts are being ordered. Certificate of service dated 11/18/2019. [19-2133] (SJB) [Entered: 11/18/2019 01:46 PM]

Open Document

DOCKETING statement filed by Appellants Howland Green and Linda Green. Certificate of service dated 11/16/2019. [19-2133] (SJB) [Entered: 11/16/2019 08:27 AM]

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellants Howland Green and Linda Green indicating transcripts are being ordered. Certificate of service dated 11/16/2019. [19-2133] CLERK'S NOTE: The document is incomplete. THE FILER IS DIRECTED TO RE-FILE THE DOCUMENT WITHIN TWO DAYS. (SJB) [Entered: 11/16/2019 08:22 AM]

Open Document

SUPPLEMENTAL record filed. Docket entries: 56 (application for writ of execution) and related docket note. [19-2133] (KPC) [Entered: 11/14/2019 04:55 PM]

Open Document #3

Notice Regarding Native PDF

Open Document #2

Case Opening Notice

Open Document #1

Abbreviated Record

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • MANDATE issued. [19-2133] (GB) [Entered: 01/02/2020 12:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT entered: Upon consideration of appellants' unopposed motion, it is hereby ordered that this appeal be voluntarily dismissed pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 42(b). Mandate to issue forthwith. [19-2133] (GB) [Entered: 01/02/2020 12:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION to dismiss case filed by Appellants Howland Green and Linda Green. Certificate of service dated 12/20/2019. [19-2133] (SJB) [Entered: 12/20/2019 01:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • BRIEFING schedule set. Brief and Appendix due 01/27/2020 for appellants Howland Green and Linda Green. Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 31(a), appellee's brief will be due 30 days following service of appellant's brief and appellant's reply brief will be due 21 days following service of appellee's brief. [19-2133] (GB) [Entered: 12/18/2019 11:12 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Catherine Breen filed by Attorney Ryan J. Lutrario. Certificate of service dated 12/04/2019. [19-2133] (RJL) [Entered: 12/04/2019 03:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Catherine Breen filed by Attorney Vincent A. Indeglia. Certificate of service dated 11/21/2019. [19-2133] (VAI) [Entered: 11/21/2019 01:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • NOTICE of filing the following transcript(s) in district court by Court Reporter FTR - RI: 08/26/2019, Motion to Reopen. In accordance with Judicial Conference Policy, the transcript will not be available to the public by remote electronic access for ninety days after the filing date. During that ninety day period, the transcript may be purchased through the court reporter or viewed at the public terminal at the district court. [19-2133] (KPC) [Entered: 11/19/2019 12:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellants Howland Green and Linda Green indicating the following transcripts are being ordered: 08/26/2019, Motion to Reopen. Transcript(s) due 01/21/2020 from Court Reporter FTR - RI. [19-2133] (KPC) [Entered: 11/19/2019 12:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellants Howland Green and Linda Green indicating transcripts are being ordered. Certificate of service dated 11/18/2019. [19-2133] (SJB) [Entered: 11/18/2019 01:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DOCKETING statement filed by Appellants Howland Green and Linda Green. Certificate of service dated 11/16/2019. [19-2133] (SJB) [Entered: 11/16/2019 08:27 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellants Howland Green and Linda Green indicating transcripts are being ordered. Certificate of service dated 11/16/2019. [19-2133] CLERK'S NOTE: The document is incomplete. THE FILER IS DIRECTED TO RE-FILE THE DOCUMENT WITHIN TWO DAYS. (SJB) [Entered: 11/16/2019 08:22 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Howland Green and Linda Green filed by Attorney Stephen J. Brouillard. Certificate of service dated 11/16/2019. [19-2133] (SJB) [Entered: 11/16/2019 08:18 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUPPLEMENTAL record filed. Docket entries: 56 (application for writ of execution) and related docket note. [19-2133] (KPC) [Entered: 11/14/2019 04:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #52) filed by Appellants Howland Green and Linda Green. Docketing Statement, Transcript Report/Order form, and Appearance form due 11/26/2019. [19-2133] (KPC) [Entered: 11/12/2019 08:55 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.