This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 05/23/2021 at 06:11:25 (UTC).

Brandy Sandoval v. Poe, et al

Case Summary

On 03/24/2021 Brandy Sandoval filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Poe. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-35214

  • Filing Date:

    03/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

 

Party Details

Defendant

DOUGLAS COUNTY JAIL AND STAFF

Defendant / Appellees

TURNER, Sargeant

OSBORNE

PIERCE, Deputy

WADE, Deputy

CHILDER'S, Deputy

CORRECT CARE SOLUTIONS

KELLY, Deputy

POE, Deputy

EGGLESTON, Deputy

DWIGHT, Deputy

MCIRVIN

TRACY

Plaintiff / Appellant

BRANDY MARIE SANDOVAL

Roseburg, OR 97470

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Aaron Paul Hisel

Attorney at Law Office of Gerald Warren and Associates

901 Capitol Street Ne

Salem, OR 97301

Gerald L. Warren

Attorney at Law Office of Gerald Warren and Associates

901 Capitol Street Ne

Salem, OR 97301

Jamie E. Valentine Esquire

Attorney at Keating Jones Hughes, PC

200 Sw Market Street, Suite 900

Portland, OR 97201

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Brandy Marie Sandoval

1153 Buckhorn Rd.

Roseburg, OR 97470

 

Court Documents

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

1 #3

Case Opening Packet

#2

#3

#4

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MANDATE ISSUED. (RRC, MHM and DAB) [12108598] (DJV) [Entered: 05/11/2021 08:06 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Filed order (RICHARD R. CLIFTON, MARY H. MURGUIA and DANIEL A. BRESS) A review of the record demonstrates that this court lacks jurisdiction over this appeal because the notice of appeal does not challenge any final or appealable orders of the district court. See 28 U.S.C. 1291. Consequently, this appeal is dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. All pending motions are denied as moot. DISMISSED. [12079478] (WL) [Entered: 04/19/2021 03:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed Appellant Brandy Marie Sandoval motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis. Deficiencies: None. Served on 04/12/2021. [12077439] (DJV) [Entered: 04/16/2021 01:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL AND PRO SE APPELLANT. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Brandy Marie Sandoval opening brief due 05/26/2021. Appellees Childer's, Correct Care Solutions, Dwight, Eggleston, Kelly, McIrvin, Osborne, Pierce, Poe, Tracy, Turner and Wade answering brief due 06/28/2021. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12052229] (RT) [Entered: 03/24/2021 02:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Osborne is a litigant

Latest cases where TRACY is a litigant

Latest cases where CORRECT CARE SOLUTIONS LLC is a litigant