This case was last updated from PACER on 03/29/2020 at 06:02:33 (UTC).

Brandon Soderberg v. Audrey Carrion

Case Summary

On 01/29/2020 Brandon Soderberg filed a Civil Right - State Statute Constitutionality lawsuit against Audrey Carrion. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-1094

  • Filing Date:

    01/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - State Statute Constitutionality

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendants and Defendant / Appellees

PATRICIA TRIKERIOTIS, as Court Reporter for Baltimore City

ROBIN WATSON, as Court Reporter for Prince George's County

Plaintiff / Appellants

OPEN JUSTICE BALTIMORE

BALTIMORE ACTION LEGAL TEAM

BAYNARD WOODS

BRANDON SODERBERG

LIFE AFTER RELEASE

QIANA JOHNSON

Defendant / Appellees

HON. SHEILA R. TILLERSON ADAMS, as Administrative Judge for Maryland's Seventh Judicial Circuit

PATRICIA TRIKERIOTIS, as Court Reporter for Baltimore City

ROBIN WATSON, as Court Reporter for Prince George's County

HON. W. MICHEL PIERSON, Administrative Judge for Maryland's Eighth Judicial Circuit

HON. AUDREY J. S. CARRION, Administrative Judge for Maryland's Eighth Judicial Circuit

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Daniel B. Rice

Attorney at GEORGETOWN UNIVERSITY LAW CENTER

600 New Jersey Avenue Nw

Washington, DC 20001

Adam G. Holofcener

Attorney at MARYLAND VOLUNTEER LAWYERS FOR THE ARTS

120 West North Avenue

Baltimore, MD 21201

Nicolas Y. Riley

Attorney at GEORGETOWN UNIVERSITY LAW CENTER

600 New Jersey Avenue Nw

Washington, DC 20001

Daniel Bruce Rice

Attorney at GEORGETOWN UNIVERSITY LAW CENTER

600 New Jersey Avenue Nw

Washington, DC 20001

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Michele J. McDonald

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF MARYLAND

200 St. Paul Place

Baltimore, MD 21202

Joseph Dudek Esq.

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF MARYLAND

200 St. Paul Place

Baltimore, MD 21202

 

Court Documents

#33

(#33) ORDER filed granting Motion to extend filing time [ # 32 ]. Number of days granted: 14. FILING OF PAPER COPIES OF BRIEFS/APPENDICES IS SUSPENDED PENDING FURTHER NOTICE FROM THE COURT. Copies to all parties. [1000709685] [20-1094] EB [Entered: 03/26/2020 08:59 AM]

#32

(#32) MOTION by Floyd Abrams Institute for Freedom of Expression to extend filing time for amicus curiae brief in support of plaintiffs-appellants until April 13, 2020.. Date and method of service: 03/25/2020 ecf. [1000709344] [20-1094] David Schulz [Entered: 03/25/2020 03:16 PM]

#31

(#31) Corrected JOINT APPENDIX (electronic and paper form) by Baltimore Action Legal Team, Life After Release, Open Justice Baltimore, Qiana Johnson, Brandon Soderberg and Baynard Woods. [1000708506] [20-1094] Nicolas Riley [Entered: 03/24/2020 02:58 PM]

#30

(#30) ORDER filed granting Motions to extend filing time [ # 28 ], [ # 27 ]. Number of days granted: 14. FILING OF PAPER COPIES OF BRIEFS/APPENDICES IS SUSPENDED PENDING FURTHER NOTICE FROM THE COURT. Copies to all parties. [1000708225] [20-1094] EB [Entered: 03/24/2020 11:09 AM]

#29

(#29) Docket correction requested from Baltimore Action Legal Team, Qiana Johnson, Life After Release, Open Justice Baltimore, Brandon Soderberg and Baynard Woods. Re: [ # 26 ] appendix. Access to appendix has been restricted to case participants. [20-1094] EB [Entered: 03/24/2020 09:34 AM]

#28

(#28) MOTION by Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press as Amicus Curiae to extend filing time for amicus brief until 4/13/20.. Date and method of service: 03/23/2020 ecf. [1000707791] [20-1094] Jennifer Nelson [Entered: 03/23/2020 09:36 PM]

#27

(#27) MOTION by Cato Institute as Amicus Curiae to extend filing time for amicus brief until 4/13/2020.. Date and method of service: 03/23/2020 ecf. [1000707777] [20-1094] Eugene Volokh [Entered: 03/23/2020 07:18 PM]

#26

RESTRICTED

#25

(#25) BRIEF by Baltimore Action Legal Team, Life After Release, Open Justice Baltimore, Qiana Johnson, Brandon Soderberg and Baynard Woods in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: OPENING. [1000707761] [20-1094] Nicolas Riley [Entered: 03/23/2020 06:06 PM]

#9

(#9) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Daniel B. Rice for Baltimore Action Legal Team, Qiana Johnson, Life After Release, Open Justice Baltimore, Brandon Soderberg and Baynard Woods. [1000679227] [20-1094] Daniel Rice [Entered: 02/07/2020 02:31 PM]

#8

(#8) NOTICE ISSUED re: case caption. Copies to all parties. [20-1094] EB [Entered: 02/05/2020 04:05 PM]

#7

(#7) DOCKETING STATEMENT by Baltimore Action Legal Team, Qiana Johnson, Life After Release, Open Justice Baltimore, Brandon Soderberg and Baynard Woods. [20-1094] Nicolas Riley [Entered: 02/05/2020 03:16 PM]

#6

(#6) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Baltimore Action Legal Team, Qiana Johnson, Life After Release, Open Justice Baltimore, Brandon Soderberg and Baynard Woods. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000677301] [20-1094] Nicolas Riley [Entered: 02/05/2020 03:06 PM]

#5

(#5) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Adam G Holofcener for Baltimore Action Legal Team, Qiana Johnson, Life After Release, Open Justice Baltimore, Brandon Soderberg and Baynard Woods. [1000675184] [20-1094] Adam Holofcener [Entered: 02/03/2020 02:22 PM]

#4

(#4) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Nicolas Y. Riley for Baltimore Action Legal Team, Qiana Johnson, Life After Release, Open Justice Baltimore, Brandon Soderberg and Baynard Woods. [1000672834] [20-1094] Nicolas Riley [Entered: 01/29/2020 06:27 PM]

#3

(#3) BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Adam G. Holofcener; Daniel B. Rice. Opening Brief and Appendix due 03/09/2020. Response Brief due 04/08/2020. [20-1094] EB [Entered: 01/29/2020 12:48 PM]

#2

(#2) DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case. Originating case number: 1:19-cv-01559-RDB. Mailed to: Adam G. Holofcener; Daniel B. Rice. [20-1094] EB [Entered: 01/29/2020 12:46 PM]

#1

(#2) DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case. Originating case number: 1:19-cv-01559-RDB. Mailed to: Adam G. Holofcener; Daniel B. Rice. [20-1094] EB [Entered: 01/29/2020 12:46 PM]

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) ORDER filed granting Motion to extend filing time [ # 32 ]. Number of days granted: 14. FILING OF PAPER COPIES OF BRIEFS/APPENDICES IS SUSPENDED PENDING FURTHER NOTICE FROM THE COURT. Copies to all parties. [1000709685] [20-1094] EB [Entered: 03/26/2020 08:59 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) MOTION by Floyd Abrams Institute for Freedom of Expression to extend filing time for amicus curiae brief in support of plaintiffs-appellants until April 13, 2020.. Date and method of service: 03/25/2020 ecf. [1000709344] [20-1094] David Schulz [Entered: 03/25/2020 03:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) Corrected JOINT APPENDIX (electronic and paper form) by Baltimore Action Legal Team, Life After Release, Open Justice Baltimore, Qiana Johnson, Brandon Soderberg and Baynard Woods. [1000708506] [20-1094] Nicolas Riley [Entered: 03/24/2020 02:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) ORDER filed granting Motions to extend filing time [ # 28 ], [ # 27 ]. Number of days granted: 14. FILING OF PAPER COPIES OF BRIEFS/APPENDICES IS SUSPENDED PENDING FURTHER NOTICE FROM THE COURT. Copies to all parties. [1000708225] [20-1094] EB [Entered: 03/24/2020 11:09 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) Docket correction requested from Baltimore Action Legal Team, Qiana Johnson, Life After Release, Open Justice Baltimore, Brandon Soderberg and Baynard Woods. Re: [ # 26 ] appendix. Access to appendix has been restricted to case participants. [20-1094] EB [Entered: 03/24/2020 09:34 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) MOTION by Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press as Amicus Curiae to extend filing time for amicus brief until 4/13/20.. Date and method of service: 03/23/2020 ecf. [1000707791] [20-1094] Jennifer Nelson [Entered: 03/23/2020 09:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) MOTION by Cato Institute as Amicus Curiae to extend filing time for amicus brief until 4/13/2020.. Date and method of service: 03/23/2020 ecf. [1000707777] [20-1094] Eugene Volokh [Entered: 03/23/2020 07:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) (ENTRY RESTRICTED) JOINT APPENDIX (electronic and paper form) by Baltimore Action Legal Team, Life After Release, Open Justice Baltimore, Qiana Johnson, Brandon Soderberg and Baynard Woods. [1000707763] [20-1094]--[Edited 03/24/2020 by EB- See ECF 31 for corrected joint appendix] Nicolas Riley [Entered: 03/23/2020 06:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) BRIEF by Baltimore Action Legal Team, Life After Release, Open Justice Baltimore, Qiana Johnson, Brandon Soderberg and Baynard Woods in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: OPENING. [1000707761] [20-1094] Nicolas Riley [Entered: 03/23/2020 06:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) ORDER filed denying as premature Motion to extend filing time [ # 23 ], [ # 22 ]. Copies to all parties. [1000704050] [20-1094] EB [Entered: 03/17/2020 04:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Joint MOTION by Baltimore Action Legal Team, Qiana Johnson, Life After Release, Open Justice Baltimore, Brandon Soderberg and Baynard Woods to extend filing time for opening/response brief until March 23, 2020 (Appellants' opening brief) April 6, 2020 (Amicus briefs supporting appellants or supporting neither party) May 22, 2020 (Appellees' response brief) May 29, 2020 (Amicus briefs supporting appellees) June 12, 2020 (Appellant's reply brief).. Date and method of service: 02/07/2020 ecf. [1000679339] [20-1094] Nicolas Riley [Entered: 02/07/2020 03:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Daniel B. Rice for Baltimore Action Legal Team, Qiana Johnson, Life After Release, Open Justice Baltimore, Brandon Soderberg and Baynard Woods. [1000679227] [20-1094] Daniel Rice [Entered: 02/07/2020 02:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE ISSUED re: case caption. Copies to all parties. [20-1094] EB [Entered: 02/05/2020 04:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) DOCKETING STATEMENT by Baltimore Action Legal Team, Qiana Johnson, Life After Release, Open Justice Baltimore, Brandon Soderberg and Baynard Woods. [20-1094] Nicolas Riley [Entered: 02/05/2020 03:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Baltimore Action Legal Team, Qiana Johnson, Life After Release, Open Justice Baltimore, Brandon Soderberg and Baynard Woods. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000677301] [20-1094] Nicolas Riley [Entered: 02/05/2020 03:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Adam G Holofcener for Baltimore Action Legal Team, Qiana Johnson, Life After Release, Open Justice Baltimore, Brandon Soderberg and Baynard Woods. [1000675184] [20-1094] Adam Holofcener [Entered: 02/03/2020 02:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Nicolas Y. Riley for Baltimore Action Legal Team, Qiana Johnson, Life After Release, Open Justice Baltimore, Brandon Soderberg and Baynard Woods. [1000672834] [20-1094] Nicolas Riley [Entered: 01/29/2020 06:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Adam G. Holofcener; Daniel B. Rice. Opening Brief and Appendix due 03/09/2020. Response Brief due 04/08/2020. [20-1094] EB [Entered: 01/29/2020 12:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case. Originating case number: 1:19-cv-01559-RDB. Mailed to: Adam G. Holofcener; Daniel B. Rice. [20-1094] EB [Entered: 01/29/2020 12:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:19-cv-01559-RDB. Case manager: EBorneisen. [20-1094] EB [Entered: 01/29/2020 12:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less