This case was last updated from PACER on 09/14/2019 at 06:05:22 (UTC).

Brandon Sattler v. James Russell, et al

Case Summary

On 07/16/2019 Brandon Sattler filed an Other lawsuit against James Russell. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals - Bankruptcy, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1174

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals - Bankruptcy, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Appellant

BRANDON SATTLER

Debtor

In re: BRANDON SATTLER

Appellees

MARY CASSIDY

JULIE RUSSELL

JAMES RUSSELL

GRANT WHITCHER

JOSEPH CASSIDY

SHELLEY D. KROHN, Chapter 7 Trustee

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorneys

Richard A. Marcus

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF RICHARD A. MARCUS

28494 Westinghouse Place

Valencia, CA 91355-0000

Louis J. Esbin

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF LOUIS J. ESBIN

27201 Tourney Road

Valencia, CA 91355-1857

Appellee Attorneys

Ryan Jefferson Works

Attorney at McDonald Carano LLP

2300 West Sahara Avenue

Las Vegas, NV 89102-0000

Mark M. Weisenmiller

Attorney at Garman Turner Gordon LLP

650 White Drive

Las Vegas, NV 89119

Jeanette McPherson

Attorney at Schwartzer & McPherson Law Firm

2850 South Jones Boulevard

Las Vegas, NV 89146-0000

 

Court Documents

#2

Opening Letter Schedule

2 #4

BAP Rules

1 #4

Notice of Appeal / Copy of Bk.Ct. Order

#5

(#5) Filed (ECF) Attorney Mr. Louis J. Esbin for Appellant Brandon Sattler's response order (file a response to order)served on 08/07/2019 clerk - Attorney for Appellants: Esbin, Marcus; Attorney for Appellees: McPherson, Weisenmiller, Works; email - Attorney for Appellants: Esbin, Marcus; Attorney for Appellees: McPherson, Weisenmiller, Works; US mail - Attorney for Appellants: Esbin, Marcus; Attorney for Appellees: McPherson, Weisenmiller, Works. [19-1174] (LJE) [Entered: 08/07/2019 03:46 PM]

#9

(#9) Filed ORDER (TAYLOR); Motion to extend time to file appellant's opening brief filed by Attorney Louis J. Esbin is GRANTED. Appellant Brandon Sattler's opening brief due 10/31/2019. Appellees' Joseph Cassidy, Mary Cassidy, Shelley D. Krohn, James Russell, Julie Russell and Grant Whitcher's responsive brief(s) due 12/31/2019. Appellant Brandon Sattler's optional reply brief due 01/31/2020. (See order for details.) (VB) [Entered: 09/03/2019 09:51 AM]

2 #3

Banktruptcy Record Request Form

2 #1

Briefing Order

1 #2

Bk.Ct. Notice of Referral to BAP - Re: Notice of Appeal

1 #3

Bk.Ct. Appeal Memorandum - Re: Notice of Appeal

8 #2

Proposed Order Granting Briefing Schedule Motion

#1

Bk.Ct. Transmittal Form - Re: Notice of Appeal

8 #1

Main Document

#7

(#7) CERTIFICATE OF READINESS docketed. (VB) [Entered: 08/20/2019 01:16 PM]

#3

(#3) Received STATUS REPORT from Bankruptcy Court - Re: No appellant's designation of record and no appellant's statement of issues. (VB) [Entered: 07/31/2019 12:29 PM]

2 #5

BAP Administrative Order - Re: Attorney E-filing

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Filed ORDER (TAYLOR); Motion to extend time to file appellant's opening brief filed by Attorney Louis J. Esbin is GRANTED. Appellant Brandon Sattler's opening brief due 10/31/2019. Appellees' Joseph Cassidy, Mary Cassidy, Shelley D. Krohn, James Russell, Julie Russell and Grant Whitcher's responsive brief(s) due 12/31/2019. Appellant Brandon Sattler's optional reply brief due 01/31/2020. (See order for details.) (VB) [Entered: 09/03/2019 09:51 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Filed (ECF) Attorney Mr. Louis J. Esbin for Appellant Brandon Sattler's Emergency motion extending time to file appellant's opening brief until 10/31/2019; 08/30/2019 served by: clerk - Attorney for Appellants: Esbin, Marcus; Attorney for Appellees: McPherson, Weisenmiller, Works; email - Attorney for Appellants: Esbin, Marcus; Attorney for Appellees: McPherson, Weisenmiller, Works; US mail - Attorney for Appellant: Marcus. [19-1174] (LJE) [Entered: 08/30/2019 05:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) CERTIFICATE OF READINESS docketed. (VB) [Entered: 08/20/2019 01:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • (#6) No appellant's designation of record and no appellant's statement of issues deficiency issued on 07/31/2019 has been SATISFIED as of 08/07/2019. (VB) [Entered: 08/07/2019 04:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Filed (ECF) Attorney Mr. Louis J. Esbin for Appellant Brandon Sattler's response order (file a response to order)served on 08/07/2019 clerk - Attorney for Appellants: Esbin, Marcus; Attorney for Appellees: McPherson, Weisenmiller, Works; email - Attorney for Appellants: Esbin, Marcus; Attorney for Appellees: McPherson, Weisenmiller, Works; US mail - Attorney for Appellants: Esbin, Marcus; Attorney for Appellees: McPherson, Weisenmiller, Works. [19-1174] (LJE) [Entered: 08/07/2019 03:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY sent to Appellant - RE: No appellant's designation of record and no appellant's statement of issues. Appellant's Response Due: 08/14/2019. cc: All parties. (VB) [Entered: 07/31/2019 12:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Received STATUS REPORT from Bankruptcy Court - Re: No appellant's designation of record and no appellant's statement of issues. (VB) [Entered: 07/31/2019 12:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Sent BRIEFING ORDER & NOTICE to appellant Brandon Sattler. Copies to all parties. Sent Bankruptcy Record Request Form to Bankruptcy Court. Appellant Brandon Sattler's opening brief is due 08/30/2019. (VB) [Entered: 07/16/2019 01:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Received NOTICE OF APPEAL filed in Bankruptcy Court on 07/14/2019; Bk.Ct. Notice of Referral; Bk.Ct. Transmittal Form; Bk.Ct. Appeal Memorandum (Re: Notice of Appeal) and Copy 07/03/2019 Bk.Ct. Order Denying Motion to Vacate. (VB) [Entered: 07/16/2019 01:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.