This case was last updated from PACER on 05/28/2019 at 06:09:26 (UTC).

Brandon Richardson v. Brandon Belote, et al

Case Summary

On 03/29/2019 Brandon Richardson filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Brandon Belote. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-40282

  • Filing Date:

    03/29/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

THADDEUS HUNT

SAQUED SALINAS

BRANDON BELOTE

REFUGIA CAMPOS

GARY CURRIE

WILLIAM STEPHENS

JUAN TREVINO

SONIA MORON

LANNETTE LINTHICUM

CAROLE MONROE

ALBERTO VALDEZ

DOVIE BUNCH

EILEEN KENNEDY

TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF CRIMINAL JUSTICE

Plaintiff / Appellant

BRANDON RICHARDSON

Beeville, TX 78102-0000

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Amber McKeon-Mueller

Attorney at Texas Municipal League

1821 Rutherford Lane

Austin, TX 78754-0000

Briana Marie Webb

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

P.O. Box 12548, Capitol Station

Austin, TX 78711-2548

Courtney Brooke Corbello

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

P.O. Box 12548

Austin, TX 78711-2548

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Brandon Richardson

Attorney at CID McConnell Prison

3001 S. Emily Drive

Beeville, TX 78102-0000

 

Court Documents

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-40282] (Courtney Brooke Corbello ) [Entered: 05/06/2019 10:37 AM]

Open Document

BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief due on 06/11/2019 for Appellant Brandon Richardson. [19-40282] (ABT) [Entered: 05/02/2019 08:09 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM received from Ms. Briana Marie Webb for Mr. Brandon Belote, Mr. Dovie Bunch, Mr. Thaddeus Hunt, Mr. Saqued Salinas, Mr. Juan Trevino and Mr. Alberto Valdez for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-40282] (Briana Marie Webb ) [Entered: 05/06/2019 05:20 PM]

Open Document

PRISONER CASE WITHOUT COUNSEL docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Brandon Richardson [19-40282] (CBW) [Entered: 03/29/2019 02:08 PM]

Open Document

INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9022217-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Fee or motion for IFP in DC due on 05/29/2019 for Appellant Brandon Richardson [19-40282] (CBW) [Entered: 04/04/2019 02:28 PM]

Open Document #2

BR-9 Letter

Open Document

BRIEFING SUSPENDED - the briefing notice was issued prematurely. There are transcripts that have not been ordered. A/Pet's Brief deadline canceled [19-40282] (ABT) [Entered: 05/15/2019 03:53 PM]

Open Document #1

Unfiled Appellant's Correspondence

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/16/2019
  • ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [19-40282] (SEP) [Entered: 05/16/2019 08:18 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • BRIEFING SUSPENDED - the briefing notice was issued prematurely. There are transcripts that have not been ordered. A/Pet's Brief deadline canceled [19-40282] (ABT) [Entered: 05/15/2019 03:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Briana Marie Webb for Appellee Dovie Bunch in 19-40282, Attorney Briana Marie Webb for Appellee Alberto Valdez in 19-40282, Attorney Briana Marie Webb for Appellee Juan Trevino in 19-40282, Attorney Briana Marie Webb for Appellee Saqued Salinas in 19-40282, Attorney Briana Marie Webb for Appellee Thaddeus Hunt in 19-40282, Attorney Briana Marie Webb for Appellee Brandon Belote in 19-40282. [19-40282] (SEP) [Entered: 05/08/2019 07:29 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE FORM received from Ms. Briana Marie Webb for Mr. Brandon Belote, Mr. Dovie Bunch, Mr. Thaddeus Hunt, Mr. Saqued Salinas, Mr. Juan Trevino and Mr. Alberto Valdez for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-40282] (Briana Marie Webb ) [Entered: 05/06/2019 05:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • ATTORNEY NOT PARTICIPATING. Briana Webb is designated as inactive for Appellees Refugia Campos and Sonia Moron. Reason: inadvertently added at case opening. [19-40282] (CAG) [Entered: 05/06/2019 04:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Courtney Brooke Corbello for party(s) Appellee Sonia Moron Appellee Refugia Campos, in case 19-40282 [19-40282] (ABT) [Entered: 05/06/2019 12:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-40282] (Courtney Brooke Corbello ) [Entered: 05/06/2019 10:37 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED FROM DISTRICT COURT for 2:14-CV-464. Electronic ROA due on 05/17/2019. [19-40282] (ABT) [Entered: 05/02/2019 08:12 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief due on 06/11/2019 for Appellant Brandon Richardson. [19-40282] (ABT) [Entered: 05/02/2019 08:09 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • DISTRICT COURT ORDER of 04/25/2019 granting IFP in accordance with the Prison Litigation Reform Act (PLRA) for Appellant Mr. Brandon Richardson. Initial partial filing fee assessed. [19-40282] (ABT) [Entered: 05/02/2019 08:08 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DOCUMENT RECEIVED - NO ACTION TAKEN. No action will be taken on the 4/14/19 correspondence received from Appellant Mr. Brandon Richardson advising of retliation and harrassment efforts experienced from within the prison officials. This Court has no direct authority over these assertions unless the actions have been brought before this court on appeal. [19-40282] (DLM) [Entered: 04/19/2019 02:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • DISTRICT COURT NOTICE - IFP pending for Appellant Mr. Brandon Richardson. Fee deadline satisfied. [19-40282] (AS) [Entered: 04/16/2019 02:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9022217-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Fee or motion for IFP in DC due on 05/29/2019 for Appellant Brandon Richardson [19-40282] (CBW) [Entered: 04/04/2019 02:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PRISONER CASE WITHOUT COUNSEL docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Brandon Richardson [19-40282] (CBW) [Entered: 03/29/2019 02:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.