This case was last updated from PACER on 09/14/2019 at 06:04:04 (UTC).

Brandon Harris v. Rives, et al

Case Summary

On 07/16/2019 Brandon Harris filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Rives. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Sixth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-5761

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Sixth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

CHRISTIAN COUNTY JAIL STAFF

DEPUTY HENDRICKS

LT. RIVES

DEPUTY HURT

DEPUTY ROBERTSON, in their official capacities

Plaintiff / Appellant

BRANDON MARQUE HARRIS

Hopkinsville, KY 42240

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Brandon Marque Harris

Attorney at Christian County Jail

410 W. Seventh Street

Hopkinsville, KY 42240

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) Copy of appeal packet sent to district court for filing. (JE) [Entered: 07/17/2019 08:26 AM]

6 #1

Cover Letter

#1

(#1) Prisoner Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Mr. Brandon Marque Harris. Transcript needed: n. (JE) [Entered: 07/16/2019 03:10 PM]

6 #2

judge order filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER filed: It is ordered that the appeal is DISMISSED. John M. Rogers, Helene N. White and Jane Branstetter Stranch, Circuit Judges. (JE) [Entered: 08/28/2019 02:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • (#5) Update fee status change to pending in the district court. IFP motion filed 8/12/2019, RE 25. (JE) [Entered: 08/15/2019 10:25 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Copy of appeal packet sent to district court for filing. (JE) [Entered: 07/17/2019 08:26 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • (#3) Defendant not served in district court, complaint dismissed prior to service. (JE) [Entered: 07/16/2019 03:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • (#2) The case manager for this case is: Jennifer Earl (JE) [Entered: 07/16/2019 03:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Prisoner Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Mr. Brandon Marque Harris. Transcript needed: n. (JE) [Entered: 07/16/2019 03:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.