This case was last updated from PACER on 11/04/2019 at 06:07:19 (UTC).

Brandon Duncan, et al v. City of San Diego, et al

Case Summary

On 09/05/2019 Brandon Duncan filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against City of San Diego. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-56038

  • Filing Date:

    09/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant

DOES, 1-10 in their official capacities

Defendant / Appellants

SCOTT HENDERSON, in his individual and official capacity

CITY OF SAN DIEGO, a California municipal corporation

RUDY CASTRO, in his individual and official capacity

Plaintiff / Appellees

AARON HARVEY, an individual

BRANDON DUNCAN, an individual

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellant Attorney

Stacy J. Plotkin-Wolff

Attorney at San Diego City Attorney's Office

1200 Third Avenue

San Diego, CA 92101

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Mark C. Zebrowski Esquire

Attorney at Morrison & Foerster LLP

12531 High Bluff Drive, Suite 100

San Diego, CA 92130

John R. Lanham

Attorney at Morrison & Foerster LLP

12531 High Bluff Drive, Suite 100

San Diego, CA 92130

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) MEDIATION CONFERENCE RESCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 11/14/2019, 10:00 a.m. Pacific Time. (originally scheduled on 11/12/2019 ). [11471157] (BLS) [Entered: 10/21/2019 11:48 AM]

#10

(#10) MEDIATION CONFERENCE RESCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 11/12/2019, 11:00 a.m. Pacific Time. (originally scheduled on 10/22/2019 ). [11458257] (CL) [Entered: 10/08/2019 02:48 PM]

#7

(#7) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 10/22/2019, 11:00 a.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11443395] (CL) [Entered: 09/25/2019 12:14 PM]

#5

(#5) Filed (ECF) Appellants Rudy Castro, City of San Diego and Scott Henderson response to Court order dated 09/17/2019. Date of service: 09/17/2019. [11434679] [19-56038] (Plotkin-Wolff, Stacy) [Entered: 09/17/2019 03:02 PM]

4 #2

Main Document

4 #1

Fee Due OSC

#2

Certificate of Service

2 #1

Mediation Questionnaire

1 #3

Case Opening Packet

1 #2

Mediation Letter

#1

Docketing Letter

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) MEDIATION CONFERENCE RESCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 11/14/2019, 10:00 a.m. Pacific Time. (originally scheduled on 11/12/2019 ). [11471157] (BLS) [Entered: 10/21/2019 11:48 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MEDIATION CONFERENCE RESCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 11/12/2019, 11:00 a.m. Pacific Time. (originally scheduled on 10/22/2019 ). [11458257] (CL) [Entered: 10/08/2019 02:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • (#9) Added Attorney(s) John R. Lanham for party(s) Appellee Aaron Harvey Appellee Brandon Duncan, in case 19-56038. [11452654] (JFF) [Entered: 10/03/2019 10:26 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • (#8) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of John R. Lanham (Morrison & Foerster LLP, 12531 High Bluff Drive, Suite 100, San Diego, CA 92130) for Appellees Brandon Duncan and Aaron Harvey. Date of service: 10/02/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11452275] [19-56038] (Lanham, John) [Entered: 10/02/2019 06:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 10/22/2019, 11:00 a.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11443395] (CL) [Entered: 09/25/2019 12:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • (#6) Received notification from District Court re: payment of docket fee. Amount Paid: USD 505.00. Date paid: 09/17/2019. [11435263] (RT) [Entered: 09/18/2019 09:33 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Filed (ECF) Appellants Rudy Castro, City of San Diego and Scott Henderson response to Court order dated 09/17/2019. Date of service: 09/17/2019. [11434679] [19-56038] (Plotkin-Wolff, Stacy) [Entered: 09/17/2019 03:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: TSP): Order to show cause docket fee due [11433796] (TSP) [Entered: 09/17/2019 09:52 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • (#3) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 09/12/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11430261][19-56038] (AD) [Entered: 09/12/2019 06:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Filed (ECF) Appellants City of San Diego, Scott Henderson and Rudy Castro Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 09/12/2019. [11430035] [19-56038] (Plotkin-Wolff, Stacy) [Entered: 09/12/2019 03:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 09/12/2019. Transcript ordered by 10/04/2019. Transcript due 11/04/2019. Appellants Rudy Castro, City of San Diego and Scott Henderson opening brief due 12/13/2019. Appellees Brandon Duncan and Aaron Harvey answering brief due 01/13/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11421770] (JBS) [Entered: 09/05/2019 10:29 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less