This case was last updated from PACER on 07/15/2019 at 06:07:02 (UTC).

Brand Tarzana Surgical Institu v. Blue Cross Blue Shield of IL

Case Summary

On 05/16/2019 Brand Tarzana Surgical Institu filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Blue Cross Blue Shield of IL. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-55565

  • Filing Date:

    05/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

BRAND TARZANA SURGICAL INSTITUTE, INC., a California Corporation

Defendant / Appellee

BLUE CROSS AND BLUE SHIELD OF ILLINOIS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Richard D. Williams Esquire

Attorney at Williams Law Firm PC

1539 Westwood Blvd., Suite 200

Los Angeles, CA 90024

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Amir Shlesinger Esquire

Attorney at Reed Smith LLP

355 South Grand Avenue, Suite 2900

Los Angeles, CA 90071

David Jason de Jesus Esquire

Attorney at Reed Smith LLP

101 Second Street, Suite 1800

San Francisco, CA 94105

Raymond A. Cardozo

Attorney at Reed Smith LLP

101 Second Street, Suite 1800

San Francisco, CA 94105

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: The Mediation Program of the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals facilitates settlement while appeals are pending. By 06/07/2019, counsel for all parties intending to file briefs in this matter are requested to inform the Circuit Mediator by email of their clients' views on whether the issues on appeal or the underlying dispute might be amenable to settlement presently or in the foreseeable future. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested... This communication should not be filed with the court... The existing briefing schedule remains in effect... [11308736] (CL) [Entered: 05/24/2019 12:17 PM]

1 #2

Mediation Letter

1 #3

Case Opening Packet

#2

(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellant Brand Tarzana Surgical Institute, Inc. Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 05/21/2019. [11304529] [19-55565] (Williams, Richard) [Entered: 05/21/2019 01:33 PM]

#1

Docketing Letter

#11

(#11) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant further settlement discussions. The briefing schedule previously established by the court remains in effect. [11335900] (CL) [Entered: 06/18/2019 01:54 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant further settlement discussions. The briefing schedule previously established by the court remains in effect. [11335900] (CL) [Entered: 06/18/2019 01:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • (#10) Added attorney David Jason de Jesus for Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Illinois. [11319735] (RL) [Entered: 06/04/2019 04:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • (#9) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of David J. de Jesus for Appellee Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Illinois. Date of service: 06/04/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11319723] [19-55565] (de Jesus, David) [Entered: 06/04/2019 04:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • (#8) Added attorney Raymond A. Cardozo for Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Illinois. [11319716] (RL) [Entered: 06/04/2019 04:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • (#7) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Raymond A. Cardozo for Appellee Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Illinois. Date of service: 06/04/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11319701] [19-55565] (Cardozo, Raymond) [Entered: 06/04/2019 04:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • (#6) Streamlined request [5] by Appellant Brand Tarzana Surgical Institute, Inc. to extend time to file the brief is approved. Amended briefing schedule: Appellant Brand Tarzana Surgical Institute, Inc. opening brief due 08/14/2019. Appellee Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Illinois answering brief due 09/13/2019. The optional reply brief is due 21 days from the date of service of the answering brief. [11319068] (SB) [Entered: 06/04/2019 11:54 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • (#5) Filed (ECF) Streamlined request for extension of time to file Opening Brief by Appellant Brand Tarzana Surgical Institute, Inc.. New requested due date is 08/14/2019. [11318880] [19-55565] (Williams, Richard) [Entered: 06/04/2019 10:54 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: The Mediation Program of the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals facilitates settlement while appeals are pending. By 06/07/2019, counsel for all parties intending to file briefs in this matter are requested to inform the Circuit Mediator by email of their clients' views on whether the issues on appeal or the underlying dispute might be amenable to settlement presently or in the foreseeable future. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested... This communication should not be filed with the court... The existing briefing schedule remains in effect... [11308736] (CL) [Entered: 05/24/2019 12:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • (#3) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 05/21/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11305072] (AD) [Entered: 05/21/2019 06:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Filed (ECF) Appellant Brand Tarzana Surgical Institute, Inc. Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 05/21/2019. [11304529] [19-55565] (Williams, Richard) [Entered: 05/21/2019 01:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 05/23/2019. Appellant Brand Tarzana Surgical Institute, Inc. opening brief due 07/15/2019. Appellee Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Illinois answering brief due 08/14/2019. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11300191] (JBS) [Entered: 05/16/2019 01:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.