This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 04/17/2022 at 00:51:26 (UTC).

Braidwood Management v. EEOC

Case Summary

On 02/14/2022 Braidwood Management filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against EEOC. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-10145

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellees

Braidwood Management, Incorporated, on behalf of themselves and others similarly situated

Bear Creek Bible Church

Defendant / Appellants

Equal Employment Opportunity Commission

Charlotte A. Burrows

United States of America

Janet Dhillon

Jocelyn Samuels

Andrea R. Lucas

Keith E. Sonderling, in their official capacities as chair, vicechair, and commissioners of the Equal Employment Opportunity Commission

Merrick Garland, U.S. Attorney General

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Jonathan F. Mitchell

111 Congress Avenue

Austin, TX 78701-0000

Gene Patrick Hamilton

Attorney at America First Legal Foundation

300 Independence Avenue, S.E.

Washington, DC 20003

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Jack Starcher

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20530

Charles Wylie Scarborough

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20530

Brian Walters Stoltz

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office

1100 Commerce Street

Dallas, TX 75242-1699

Benjamin Thomas Takemoto

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

P.O. Box 883

Washington, DC 20044-0000

 

Court Documents

Open Document

CIVIL RIGHTS CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants Bear Creek Bible Church and Braidwood Management, Incorporated [22-10145] (RAJ) [Entered: 02/14/2022 02:06 PM]

Open Document

INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete. Action: Case OK to Process. [9779480-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Transcript order due on 03/04/2022 for Appellants Bear Creek Bible Church and Braidwood Management, Incorporated [22-10145] (CAS) [Entered: 02/17/2022 03:45 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [22-10145] (Jack Starcher ) [Entered: 03/02/2022 03:50 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [22-10145] (Charles Wylie Scarborough ) [Entered: 03/03/2022 04:40 PM]

Open Document

ATTORNEY TRANSCRIPT ORDER form filed by Appellants Bear Creek Bible Church and Braidwood Management, Incorporatedfor the Court to process. Date of service: 03/10/2022 via email - Attorney for Appellant: Mitchell; Attorney for Appellees: Scarborough, Starcher, Stoltz; US mail - Attorney for Appellee: Takemoto. [22-10145] (Jonathan F. Mitchell ) [Entered: 03/10/2022 01:17 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [22-10145] (Jonathan F. Mitchell ) [Entered: 03/10/2022 06:23 PM]

Open Document

No Description Available

Open Document

INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete. Action: Case OK to Process. [9799837-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [22-10145] (CAS) [Entered: 03/16/2022 03:40 PM]

Open Document

BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 05/09/2022 for Appellants/Cross-Appellees Bear Creek Bible Church and Braidwood Management, Incorporated. [22-10145] (CMB) [Entered: 03/28/2022 02:40 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [22-10145] (Gene Patrick Hamilton ) [Entered: 03/29/2022 08:19 AM]

Open Document

UNOPPOSED JOINT MOTION filed by Appellees/Cross-Appellants Ms. Charlotte A. Burrows, Mr. Janet Dhillon, EEOC, Mr. Merrick Garland, U.S. Attorney General, Mr. Andrea R. Lucas, Ms. Jocelyn Samuels, Mr. Keith E. Sonderling and USA to allow the appellees to file their brief first, and that the appellants respond [9813071-2], to extend time to file brief as appellant until 05/31/2022 [9813071-3], to extend time to file brief as cross appellant until 08/01/2022. [9813071-4]. Date of service: 04/01/2022 [22-10145] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: UNOPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellants/Cross-Appellees Braidwood Management, Incorporated and Bear Creek Bible Church to amend Notice Brief [ # 9808614-2 ] dated 03/28/2022 [9813071-2]. Date of service: 04/01/2022 via email - Attorney for Appellants/Cross-Appellees: Hamilton, Mitchell; Attorney for Appellees/Cross-Appellants: Scarborough, Starcher, Stoltz; US mail - Attorney for Appellee/Cross-Appellant: Takemoto [22-10145] (Jonathan F. Mitchell ) [Entered: 04/01/2022 11:22 AM]

Open Document #1

MOT-2 Letter

Open Document #2

Court Order

Open Document

BRIEFING RESUMED. A/Pet's Brief Due on 05/31/2022 for Appellants/Cross-Appellees Charlotte A. Burrows, Janet Dhillon, Equal Employment Opportunity Commission, Merrick Garland, U.S. Attorney General, Andrea R. Lucas, Jocelyn Samuels, Keith E. Sonderling and United States of America. [22-10145] (CAS) [Entered: 04/11/2022 08:14 AM]

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBRIEFING RESUMED. A/Pet's Brief Due on 05/31/2022 for Appellants/Cross-Appellees Charlotte A. Burrows, Janet Dhillon, Equal Employment Opportunity Commission, Merrick Garland, U.S. Attorney General, Andrea R. Lucas, Jocelyn Samuels, Keith E. Sonderling and United States of America. [22-10145] (CAS) [Entered: 04/11/2022 08:14 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the joint motion to allow the Appellees/Cross-Appellants to file the opening brief and for the Appellants/Cross-Appellees to file the Cross-Appellant Brief is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the joint motion for an extension of time to file the opening brief, to and including May 31, 2022 is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the joint motion to allow sixty (60) days to file the Cross-Appellant Brief is GRANTED. [ # 9813071-2 ]; [ # 9813071-3 ]; [ # 9813071-4 ]; [9819867-2] A/Pet's Brief deadline for Braidwood Management and Bear Creek Bible Church is canceled [22-10145] (CAS) [Entered: 04/11/2022 08:04 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketCASE CAPTION updated. Party information modified for EEOC, Charlotte A. Burrows, USA, Janet Dhillon, Jocelyn Samuels, Andrea R. Lucas, Keith E. Sonderling, Merrick Garland, U.S. Attorney General, Braidwood Management, Incorporated and Bear Creek Bible Church in 22-10145. Update: Court order granting joint motion to allow the appellees to file the opening brief and for the appellants to respond. [22-10145] (CAS) [Entered: 04/11/2022 07:52 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUNOPPOSED JOINT MOTION filed by Appellees/Cross-Appellants Ms. Charlotte A. Burrows, Mr. Janet Dhillon, EEOC, Mr. Merrick Garland, U.S. Attorney General, Mr. Andrea R. Lucas, Ms. Jocelyn Samuels, Mr. Keith E. Sonderling and USA to allow the appellees to file their brief first, and that the appellants respond [9813071-2], to extend time to file brief as appellant until 05/31/2022 [9813071-3], to extend time to file brief as cross appellant until 08/01/2022. [9813071-4]. Date of service: 04/01/2022 [22-10145] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: UNOPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellants/Cross-Appellees Braidwood Management, Incorporated and Bear Creek Bible Church to amend Notice Brief [ # 9808614-2 ] dated 03/28/2022 [9813071-2]. Date of service: 04/01/2022 via email - Attorney for Appellants/Cross-Appellees: Hamilton, Mitchell; Attorney for Appellees/Cross-Appellants: Scarborough, Starcher, Stoltz; US mail - Attorney for Appellee/Cross-Appellant: Takemoto [22-10145] (Jonathan F. Mitchell ) [Entered: 04/01/2022 11:22 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Gene Patrick Hamilton for party(s) Appellant/Cross-Appellee Bear Creek Bible Church Appellant/Cross-Appellee Braidwood Management, Incorporated, in case 22-10145 [22-10145] (CAS) [Entered: 03/30/2022 03:02 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [22-10145] (Gene Patrick Hamilton ) [Entered: 03/29/2022 08:19 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 05/09/2022 for Appellants/Cross-Appellees Bear Creek Bible Church and Braidwood Management, Incorporated. [22-10145] (CMB) [Entered: 03/28/2022 02:40 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Admitted Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Video/Audio Exhibits on File in District Court? Yes Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [22-10145] (CMB) [Entered: 03/28/2022 01:21 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketSUPPLEMENTAL ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED from District Court for 4:18-CV-824. Electronic ROA due on 03/31/2022. [22-10145] (CAS) [Entered: 03/16/2022 03:44 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete. Action: Case OK to Process. [9799837-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [22-10145] (CAS) [Entered: 03/16/2022 03:40 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED from District Court for 4:18-CV-824. Electronic ROA due on 03/28/2022. [22-10145] (CAS) [Entered: 03/11/2022 11:30 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellants Bear Creek Bible Church and Braidwood Management, Incorporated advising transcript unnecessary as it is already filed. Transcript Order ddl satisfied [22-10145] (CAS) [Entered: 03/11/2022 11:27 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [22-10145] (Jonathan F. Mitchell ) [Entered: 03/10/2022 06:23 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketATTORNEY TRANSCRIPT ORDER form filed by Appellants Bear Creek Bible Church and Braidwood Management, Incorporatedfor the Court to process. Date of service: 03/10/2022 via email - Attorney for Appellant: Mitchell; Attorney for Appellees: Scarborough, Starcher, Stoltz; US mail - Attorney for Appellee: Takemoto. [22-10145] (Jonathan F. Mitchell ) [Entered: 03/10/2022 01:17 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Charles Wylie Scarborough for party(s) Appellee Keith E. Sonderling Appellee Merrick Garland, U.S. Attorney General Appellee EEOC Appellee Andrea R. Lucas Appellee USA Appellee Jocelyn Samuels Appellee Charlotte A. Burrows Appellee Janet Dhillon, in case 22-10145 [22-10145] (CAS) [Entered: 03/04/2022 03:08 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [22-10145] (Charles Wylie Scarborough ) [Entered: 03/03/2022 04:40 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Jack Starcher for party(s) Appellee Keith E. Sonderling Appellee Merrick Garland, U.S. Attorney General Appellee EEOC Appellee Andrea R. Lucas Appellee USA Appellee Jocelyn Samuels Appellee Charlotte A. Burrows Appellee Janet Dhillon, in case 22-10145 [22-10145] (CAS) [Entered: 03/03/2022 03:09 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [22-10145] (Jack Starcher ) [Entered: 03/02/2022 03:50 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete. Action: Case OK to Process. [9779480-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Transcript order due on 03/04/2022 for Appellants Bear Creek Bible Church and Braidwood Management, Incorporated [22-10145] (CAS) [Entered: 02/17/2022 03:45 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL RIGHTS CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants Bear Creek Bible Church and Braidwood Management, Incorporated [22-10145] (RAJ) [Entered: 02/14/2022 02:06 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less