This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 03/06/2021 at 06:33:47 (UTC).

Bradley Steiger v. Warden, et al

Case Summary

On 01/05/2021 Bradley Steiger filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Warden. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-10045

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit

 

Party Details

Respondent / Appellees

WARDEN

ATTORNEY GENERAL, STATE OF ALABAMA

Petitioner / Appellant

BRADLEY JOSEPH STEIGER

Wetumpka, AL 36093

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent / Appellee Attorneys

Steven Marshall

Attorney at Alabama Attorney General's Office

501 Washington Ave, Po Box 300152

Montgomery, AL 36130

Kristi Oggs Wilkerson

Attorney at Alabama Attorney General's Office

501 Washington Ave, Po Box 300152

Montgomery, AL 36130

Petitioner / Appellant Attorney

Bradley Joseph Steiger

4049 Us Hwy 231 #1024

Wetumpka, AL 36093

 

Court Documents

Open Document

MOTION for certificate of appealability construed from the notice of appeal filed by Appellant Bradley Joseph Steiger. Opposition to Motion is Unknown [9318409-1] [Entered: 02/25/2021 10:53 AM]

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Document

NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Bradley Joseph Steiger. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 02/03/2021 08:32 AM]

Open Document

Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Kristi Oggs Wilkerson for Appellee Warden. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [21-10045] (ECF: Kristi Wilkerson) [Entered: 01/25/2021 10:43 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Kristi Wilkerson, Attorney for Warden Steven Marshall for Warden. [21-10045] (ECF: Kristi Wilkerson) [Entered: 01/22/2021 12:38 PM]

Open Document #2

USDC Order or Motion on COA & IFP

Open Document #1

HAB-5 Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document #5

USDC Judgment, DE # 36

Open Document #4

USDC Opinion and Order, DE # 35

Open Document #3

USDC Report and Recommendations, DE # 33

Open Document #2

Habeas Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal

Open Document #1

DKT-2 Notice to Counsel/Parties

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION for certificate of appealability construed from the notice of appeal filed by Appellant Bradley Joseph Steiger. Opposition to Motion is Unknown [9318409-1] [Entered: 02/25/2021 10:53 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION to proceed IFP filed by Appellant Bradley Joseph Steiger. Opposition to Motion is Unknown [9302956-1] [Entered: 02/08/2021 08:13 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Bradley Joseph Steiger. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 02/03/2021 08:32 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Kristi Oggs Wilkerson for Appellee Warden. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [21-10045] (ECF: Kristi Wilkerson) [Entered: 01/25/2021 10:43 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Kristi Wilkerson, Attorney for Warden Steven Marshall for Warden. [21-10045] (ECF: Kristi Wilkerson) [Entered: 01/22/2021 12:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUSDC order denying COA and denying IFP as to Appellant Bradley Joseph Steiger was filed on 01/12/2021. Docket Entry 40. [Entered: 01/13/2021 09:15 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHABEAS APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Bradley Joseph Steiger on 12/30/2020. Fee Status: Fee Not Paid. [Entered: 01/11/2021 02:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WARDEN is a litigant