This case was last updated from PACER on 05/19/2020 at 06:03:28 (UTC).

Bradley Blansette v. Bayer Corporation, et al

Case Summary

On 03/20/2020 Bradley Blansette filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Bayer Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eighth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-1591

  • Filing Date:

    03/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eighth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals Inc.

Merck & Company, Inc.

Bayer Pharma AG

Bayer AG

Bayer Corporation

Plaintiff / Appellant

Bradley R. Blansette

Scottsdale, AZ 85250

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Joseph Michael Price

Attorney at FAEGRE & DRINKER

2200 Wells Fargo Center, 90 S. Seventh Street

Minneapolis, MN 55402-3901

Andrew K. Solow

Attorney at ARNOLD & PORTER

250 W. 55Th Street

New York, NY 10019-9710

Michelle Marie Tessier

Attorney at FAEGRE & DRINKER

2200 Wells Fargo Center, 90 S. Seventh Street

Minneapolis, MN 55402-3901

Sally L. Pei

Attorney at ARNOLD & PORTER

601 Massachusetts Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20001

Robert J. Katerberg

Attorney at ARNOLD & PORTER

601 Massachusetts Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20001

Lori B. Leskin

Attorney at ARNOLD & PORTER

250 W. 55Th Street

New York, NY 10019-9710

Arthur E. Brown

Attorney at ARNOLD & PORTER

250 W. 55Th Street

New York, NY 10019-9710

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Bradley R. Blansette

8619 Plaza Avenue, E.

Scottsdale, AZ 85250

 

Court Documents

Open Document

CLERK ORDER:Granting in Part [ # 4907027-2 ] motion for extension of time to file brief filed by Appellant Bradley R. Blansette [4907153] Brief of Bradley R. Blansette due 05/29/2020 [4907153] [20-1591] (CRJ) [Entered: 04/27/2020 04:26 PM]

Open Document #2

ProSe NDA

Open Document #1

Motion for extension of time to file brief

Open Document

CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellee Merck & Company. - FOR CAL [4896315] [20-1591] (RJK) [Entered: 03/27/2020 10:24 AM]

Open Document

CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellees Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals Inc. and Bayer Corporation. - FOR CAL [4896313] [20-1591] (RJK) [Entered: 03/27/2020 10:23 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Sally L. Pei for Appellees Bayer Corporation, Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals Inc. and Merck & Company w/service 03/27/2020 [4896291] [20-1591] (SLP) [Entered: 03/27/2020 09:46 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Robert J. Katerberg for Appellees Bayer Corporation, Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals Inc. and Merck & Company w/service 03/27/2020 [4896288] [20-1591] (RJK) [Entered: 03/27/2020 09:44 AM]

Open Document

BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: If the original file of the U.S. District Court is available for review in electronic format, the court will rely on the electronic version of the record in its review. The appendices required by 8th Circuit Rule 30A shall not be required. In accordance with 8th Circuit Local Rule 30A (a)(2), the clerk of the United States District Court is requested to forward to this Court forthwith any portions of the original record which are not available in an electronic format or filed under seal, exhibits, administrative records and state court files. BRIEF OF APPELLANT Bradley R. Blansette due 04/29/2020. Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. [4893789] [20-1591] (MMH) [Entered: 03/20/2020 11:05 AM]

Open Document

Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, and Judgment 2/24/20 [4893782] [20-1591] (MMH) [Entered: 03/20/2020 10:55 AM]

Open Document #2

ProSe NDA

Open Document #1

ProSe Docketing Letter

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK ORDER:Granting in Part [ # 4907027-2 ] motion for extension of time to file brief filed by Appellant Bradley R. Blansette [4907153] Brief of Bradley R. Blansette due 05/29/2020 [4907153] [20-1591] (CRJ) [Entered: 04/27/2020 04:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION for extension of time to file brief until 08/25/2020, filed by Appellant Bradley R. Blansette w/service by USCA8 04/27/2020. [4907027] [20-1591] (CRJ) [Entered: 04/27/2020 02:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellee Merck & Company. - FOR CAL [4896315] [20-1591] (RJK) [Entered: 03/27/2020 10:24 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellees Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals Inc. and Bayer Corporation. - FOR CAL [4896313] [20-1591] (RJK) [Entered: 03/27/2020 10:23 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Sally L. Pei for Appellees Bayer Corporation, Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals Inc. and Merck & Company w/service 03/27/2020 [4896291] [20-1591] (SLP) [Entered: 03/27/2020 09:46 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Robert J. Katerberg for Appellees Bayer Corporation, Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals Inc. and Merck & Company w/service 03/27/2020 [4896288] [20-1591] (RJK) [Entered: 03/27/2020 09:44 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: If the original file of the U.S. District Court is available for review in electronic format, the court will rely on the electronic version of the record in its review. The appendices required by 8th Circuit Rule 30A shall not be required. In accordance with 8th Circuit Local Rule 30A (a)(2), the clerk of the United States District Court is requested to forward to this Court forthwith any portions of the original record which are not available in an electronic format or filed under seal, exhibits, administrative records and state court files. BRIEF OF APPELLANT Bradley R. Blansette due 04/29/2020. Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. [4893789] [20-1591] (MMH) [Entered: 03/20/2020 11:05 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, and Judgment 2/24/20 [4893782] [20-1591] (MMH) [Entered: 03/20/2020 10:55 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case docketed. [4893771] [20-1591] (MMH) [Entered: 03/20/2020 10:45 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MERCK & CO. INC. D/B/A MERCK, SHARP & DOHME CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Bayer HealthCare LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Bayer Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Bayer AG is a litigant