This case was last updated from PACER on 06/10/2019 at 06:14:59 (UTC).

Bradley Batz v. City of Sebring

Case Summary

On 04/11/2019 Bradley Batz filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against City of Sebring. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-11399

  • Filing Date:

    04/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellee

CITY OF SEBRING

Plaintiff / Appellant

BRADLEY BATZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Carly Dianne Wilson

Attorney at Allen Norton & Blue, PA

324 S Hyde Park Ave Ste 225

Tampa, FL 33606-4110

Brian Koji

Attorney at Allen Norton & Blue, PA

324 S Hyde Park Ave Ste 225

Tampa, FL 33606-4110

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Peter Helwig

Attorney at Harris & Helwig, PA

6700 S Florida Ave Ste 31

Lakeland, FL 33813

 

Court Documents

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Peter F. Helwig, Appellant-Plaintiff Peter Helwig for Bradley Batz. [19-11399] (ECF: Peter Helwig) [Entered: 05/30/2019 05:57 PM]

Open Document

Notice of deficient Appellant brief filed by Attorney Peter Helwig for Appellant Bradley Batz.Deficiencies: Missing Appearance of Counsel. [Entered: 05/28/2019 09:57 AM]

Open Document #10

Vol 4, Part 3

Open Document #9

Vol 4, Part 2

Open Document #8

Vol. 4, Part 1

Open Document #7

Vol. 3, part 2

Open Document #6

Vol 3, part 1

Open Document #5

Vol 2, Part 2

Open Document #4

Vol 2, Part `

Open Document #3

Vol 1, part 3

Open Document #2

Vol 1, part 2

Open Document #1

Appellant Appendix Filed

Open Document

Appellant's brief filed by Bradley Batz. [19-11399] (ECF: Peter Helwig) [Entered: 05/21/2019 04:03 PM]

Open Document

Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Peter Helwig for Appellant Bradley Batz. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-11399] (ECF: Peter Helwig) [Entered: 04/22/2019 12:48 PM]

Open Document

Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Peter Helwig for Appellant Bradley Batz. [19-11399] (ECF: Peter Helwig) [Entered: 04/22/2019 12:44 PM]

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney Peter Helwig for Appellant Bradley Batz. No hearings. [19-11399] (ECF: Peter Helwig) [Entered: 04/22/2019 12:40 PM]

Open Document

Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Brian Koji for Appellee City of Sebring. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-11399] (ECF: Brian Koji) [Entered: 04/22/2019 08:41 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Carly Dianne Wilson for City of Sebring. [19-11399] (ECF: Carly Wilson) [Entered: 04/18/2019 01:25 PM]

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Peter F. Helwig, Appellant-Plaintiff Peter Helwig for Bradley Batz. [19-11399] (ECF: Peter Helwig) [Entered: 05/30/2019 05:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • Received paper copies of EAppendix filed by Appellant Bradley Batz. 4 VOLUMES - 2 COPIES [Entered: 05/29/2019 11:22 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of deficient Appellant brief filed by Attorney Peter Helwig for Appellant Bradley Batz.Deficiencies: Missing Appearance of Counsel. [Entered: 05/28/2019 09:57 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • Received paper copies of EBrief filed by Appellant Bradley Batz. [Entered: 05/28/2019 09:50 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Appendix filed [4 VOLUMES] by Appellant Bradley Batz. [19-11399] (ECF: Peter Helwig) [Entered: 05/24/2019 01:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Appellant's brief filed by Bradley Batz. [19-11399] (ECF: Peter Helwig) [Entered: 05/21/2019 04:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Peter Helwig for Appellant Bradley Batz. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-11399] (ECF: Peter Helwig) [Entered: 04/22/2019 12:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Peter Helwig for Appellant Bradley Batz. [19-11399] (ECF: Peter Helwig) [Entered: 04/22/2019 12:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney Peter Helwig for Appellant Bradley Batz. No hearings. [19-11399] (ECF: Peter Helwig) [Entered: 04/22/2019 12:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Brian Koji for Appellee City of Sebring. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-11399] (ECF: Brian Koji) [Entered: 04/22/2019 08:41 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Carly Dianne Wilson for City of Sebring. [19-11399] (ECF: Carly Wilson) [Entered: 04/18/2019 01:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Brian Koji for City of Sebring. [19-11399] (ECF: Brian Koji) [Entered: 04/18/2019 01:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Bradley Batz on 04/10/2019. Fee Status: Fee Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. The appellant's brief is due on or before 05/21/2019. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 04/25/2019 as to Appellant Bradley Batz. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 05/09/2019 as to Appellee City of Sebring [Entered: 04/17/2019 04:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.