This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 03/26/2022 at 07:26:49 (UTC).

Bradley Barlow v. Service Employees Internationa, et al

Case Summary

On 11/16/2021 Bradley Barlow filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Service Employees Internationa. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-3096

  • Filing Date:

    11/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

BRADLEY BARLOW

Defendant / Appellees

SERVICE EMPLOYEES INTERNATIONAL UNION LOCAL 668

SECRETARY PENNSYLVANIA OFFICE OF ADMINISTRATION

BRIAN T. LYMAN, in his official capacities as Chief Accounting Officer for the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania and Deputy Secretary for the Office of Comptroller Operations

MICHAEL NEWSOME

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Nathan J. McGrath Esq.

Attorney at The Fairness Center

500 North Third Street, Floor 2, Suite 600B

Harrisburg, PA 17101

Danielle A. Susanj Esq.

Attorney at The Fairness Center

500 North Third Street, Floor 2, Suite 600B

Harrisburg, PA 17101

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Jeffrey B. Demain Esq.

Attorney at Altshuler Berzon

177 Post Street, Suite 300

San Francisco, CA 94108

Lauren M. Hoye Esq.

Attorney at Willig Williams & Davidson

1845 Walnut Street, 24Th Floor

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Scott A. Kronland Esq.

Attorney at Altshuler Berzon

177 Post Street, Suite 300

San Francisco, CA 94108

P. Casey Pitts Esq.

Attorney at Altshuler Berzon

177 Post Street, Suite 300

San Francisco, CA 94108

Caleb C. Enerson Esq.

Attorney at Pennsylvania Department of Labor & Industry

651 Boas Street, 10Th Floor

Harrisburg, PA 17121

Ryan B. Smith Esq.

Attorney at Office of Attorney General of Pennsylvania

1600 Arch Street, Suite 300

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Nancy A. Walker Esq.

Attorney at Office of Attorney General of Pennsylvania

1600 Arch Street, Suite 300

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Michael J. Scarinci Esq.

Attorney at Office of Attorney General of Pennsylvania

Strawberry Square

Harrisburg, PA 17120

 

Court Documents

#16

(#24) ECF FILER: Notice filed by Appellant Bradley Barlow in 21-3096, Appellant Frances Biddiscombe in 21-3097, Appellant Miriam Fultz in 22-1108. Certificate of Service dated 02/15/2022. Service made by ECF. [21-3096, 21-3097, 22-1108] (NJM) [Entered: 02/15/2022 04:36 PM]

#5

(#23) CLERK ORDER. 22-1108 is consolidated with Nos. 21-3096 and 21-3097 for purposes of scheduling, the joint appendix, the appellees' briefs, and disposition. The appellants are not required to file a consolidated brief addressing all appeals, but they are represented by the same counsel and should file a single brief if possible. Cf. 3d Cir. L.A.R. 3.2. The Court strongly disfavors redundant briefing. Because Nos. 21-3096 and 21-3097 are stayed pending Adams, so too is No. 22-1108. The parties must notify the Court when the mandate in Adams has issued. Briefing schedules in these appeals will be issued thereafter. If any party objects to this consolidation and stay order, a motion seeking relief should be filed within fourteen days. [21-3096, 21-3097, 22-1108] (JK) [Entered: 01/21/2022 09:50 AM]

#22

(#22) ORDER (Clerk) granting Appellants' Unopposed Motion to Stay Appeals Pending Disposition of Adams v. Teamsters Union Local 429, No. 20-1824. The previously issued briefing schedules in these appeals are vacated, and the appeals are stayed until after the Court decides Adams v. Teamsters Union Local 429, No. 20-1824. The parties must notify the Court when the mandate in Adams has issued. New briefing schedules in these appeals will be issued thereafter. [21-3096, 21-3097] (JK) [Entered: 12/15/2021 10:55 AM]

#21

(#21) ECF FILER: UNOPPOSED Motion filed by Appellant Bradley Barlow in 21-3096, Appellant Frances Biddiscombe in 21-3097 to stay proceedings. Certificate of Service dated 12/09/2021. Service made by ECF. [21-3096, 21-3097]--[Edited 12/09/2021 by JK] (NJM) [Entered: 12/09/2021 10:31 AM]

#20

(#20) ORDER (Clerk) granting Motions by Appellants Barlow and Biddiscombe to Amend the Caption. [21-3096, 21-3097] (JK) [Entered: 12/08/2021 10:08 AM]

19 #2

Standing Order Excess Pagination

19 #1

Briefing and Scheduling Order

#18

(#18) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Jeffrey B. Demain on behalf of Appellee(s) Service Employees International Union, Local 668. [21-3097, 21-3096] (JBD) [Entered: 12/01/2021 02:39 PM]

#17

(#17) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Jeffrey B. Demain on behalf of Appellee(s) Service Employees International Union, Local 668. [21-3096, 21-3097] (JBD) [Entered: 12/01/2021 02:35 PM]

#5

(#5) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Service Employees International Union Local 668. [21-3096] (SAK) [Entered: 11/24/2021 01:31 PM]

#4

(#4) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Scott A. Kronland on behalf of Appellee(s) Service Employees International Union Local 668. [21-3096] (SAK) [Entered: 11/24/2021 01:29 PM]

#3

(#3) CLERK ORDER. The appeals are consolidated for purposes of scheduling, joint appendix, Appellees' brief, and disposition. Appellants are encouraged to consult with one another regarding the contents of their briefs as the Court disfavors repetitive briefs. Appellants may file a consolidated brief or join in or adopt portions by reference. [21-3096, 21-3097] (JK) [Entered: 11/16/2021 10:20 AM]

1 #6

Case Opening Letter

1 #5

Standing Order Excess Pagination

1 #4

Case Caption

1 #3

District Court Order

1 #2

District Court Memorandum

#1

Civil Case Docketed

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) ECF FILER: Notice filed by Appellant Bradley Barlow in 21-3096, Appellant Frances Biddiscombe in 21-3097, Appellant Miriam Fultz in 22-1108. Certificate of Service dated 02/15/2022. Service made by ECF. [21-3096, 21-3097, 22-1108] (NJM) [Entered: 02/15/2022 04:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) CLERK ORDER. 22-1108 is consolidated with Nos. 21-3096 and 21-3097 for purposes of scheduling, the joint appendix, the appellees' briefs, and disposition. The appellants are not required to file a consolidated brief addressing all appeals, but they are represented by the same counsel and should file a single brief if possible. Cf. 3d Cir. L.A.R. 3.2. The Court strongly disfavors redundant briefing. Because Nos. 21-3096 and 21-3097 are stayed pending Adams, so too is No. 22-1108. The parties must notify the Court when the mandate in Adams has issued. Briefing schedules in these appeals will be issued thereafter. If any party objects to this consolidation and stay order, a motion seeking relief should be filed within fourteen days. [21-3096, 21-3097, 22-1108] (JK) [Entered: 01/21/2022 09:50 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ORDER (Clerk) granting Appellants' Unopposed Motion to Stay Appeals Pending Disposition of Adams v. Teamsters Union Local 429, No. 20-1824. The previously issued briefing schedules in these appeals are vacated, and the appeals are stayed until after the Court decides Adams v. Teamsters Union Local 429, No. 20-1824. The parties must notify the Court when the mandate in Adams has issued. New briefing schedules in these appeals will be issued thereafter. [21-3096, 21-3097] (JK) [Entered: 12/15/2021 10:55 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ECF FILER: UNOPPOSED Motion filed by Appellant Bradley Barlow in 21-3096, Appellant Frances Biddiscombe in 21-3097 to stay proceedings. Certificate of Service dated 12/09/2021. Service made by ECF. [21-3096, 21-3097]--[Edited 12/09/2021 by JK] (NJM) [Entered: 12/09/2021 10:31 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ORDER (Clerk) granting Motions by Appellants Barlow and Biddiscombe to Amend the Caption. [21-3096, 21-3097] (JK) [Entered: 12/08/2021 10:08 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED. Brief on behalf of Appellants Bradley Barlow and Frances Biddiscombe due on or before 01/11/2022. Appendix due on or before 01/11/2022. [21-3096, 21-3097]--[VACATED PER CLERK'S ORDER DATED 12/15/2021 - Edited 12/15/2021 by JK] (JK) [Entered: 12/02/2021 10:21 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Jeffrey B. Demain on behalf of Appellee(s) Service Employees International Union, Local 668. [21-3097, 21-3096] (JBD) [Entered: 12/01/2021 02:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Jeffrey B. Demain on behalf of Appellee(s) Service Employees International Union, Local 668. [21-3096, 21-3097] (JBD) [Entered: 12/01/2021 02:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Michael Scarinci on behalf of Appellee(s) Secretary Michael Newsome, Deputy Secretary Brian Lyman. [21-3096] (MJS) [Entered: 11/29/2021 12:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellant Bradley Barlow advising this court that no transcripts are available. [21-3096] (NJM) [Entered: 11/29/2021 12:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Danielle R. Acker Susanj on behalf of Appellant(s) Bradley Barlow. [21-3096] (DAS) [Entered: 11/29/2021 11:21 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Nathan J. McGrath on behalf of Appellant(s) Bradley Barlow. [21-3096] (NJM) [Entered: 11/29/2021 11:18 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from P. Casey Pitts on behalf of Appellee(s) Service Employees International Union, Local 668. [21-3096, 21-3097] (PCP) [Entered: 11/24/2021 02:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Service Employees International Union Local 668 in 21-3097, 21-3096. [21-3097, 21-3096] (SAK) [Entered: 11/24/2021 02:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Scott A. Kronland on behalf of Appellee(s) Service Employees International Union, Local 668. [21-3097, 21-3096] (SAK) [Entered: 11/24/2021 02:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Service Employees International Union Local 668. [21-3096] (SAK) [Entered: 11/24/2021 01:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Scott A. Kronland on behalf of Appellee(s) Service Employees International Union Local 668. [21-3096] (SAK) [Entered: 11/24/2021 01:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CLERK ORDER. The appeals are consolidated for purposes of scheduling, joint appendix, Appellees' brief, and disposition. Appellants are encouraged to consult with one another regarding the contents of their briefs as the Court disfavors repetitive briefs. Appellants may file a consolidated brief or join in or adopt portions by reference. [21-3096, 21-3097] (JK) [Entered: 11/16/2021 10:20 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • Docket(#2) RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (JK) [Entered: 11/16/2021 09:29 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Bradley Barlow in District Court No. 1-20-cv-02459. (JK) [Entered: 11/16/2021 09:26 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SECRETARY PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS is a litigant

Latest cases where SERVICE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jeffrey B. Demain Esquire

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lauren M. Hoye Esq.