This case was last updated from PACER on 03/06/2021 at 06:20:11 (UTC).

B.R. v. F.C.S.B.

Case Summary

On 01/05/2021 B R filed a Civil Right - Education Discrimination lawsuit against F C S B. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-1005

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Education Discrimination

 

Party Details

Defendant

MIKE AND MARY ROES 1-15

Defendant / Appellants

T.B.

J.F.

J.O.

A.F.

M.C.

C.K.

P.A.H.

B.H.

M.P.F.

F.C.S.B.

S.T.

F.T.

Plaintiff / Appellee

B.R.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Michael Eugene Kinney

Attorney at MICHAEL E. KINNEY, PLC

1801 Robert Fulton Drive

Reston, VA 20176

Bruce Michael Blanchard

Attorney at ODIN, FELDMAN & PITTLEMAN, PC

1775 Wiehle Avenue

Reston, VA 20190

James Paul Menzies Miller

Attorney at ODIN, FELDMAN & PITTLEMAN, PC

1775 Wiehle Avenue

Reston, VA 20190

James F. Davis

Attorney at JAMES F. DAVIS, PC

10513 Judicial Drive

Fairfax, VA 22030

Stuart Alan Raphael

Attorney at HUNTON ANDREWS KURTH, LLP

2200 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20037

Ryan Michael Bates

Attorney at HUNTON ANDREWS KURTH, LLP

1751 Pinnacle Drive

Mclean, VA 22102-0000

Sona Rewari

Attorney at HUNTON ANDREWS KURTH, LLP

2200 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20037

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

William Henry O'Brien

Attorney at DOUMMAR & O'BRIEN

1397 Laskin Road

Virginia Beach, VA 23451

Thomas Needham Sweeney

Attorney at MESSA & ASSOCIATES, PC

123 South 22Nd Street

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Tejinder Singh

Attorney at GOLDSTEIN & RUSSELL, P.C.

7475 Wisconsin Avenue

Bethesda, MD 20814

Daniel Woofter

Attorney at GOLDSTEIN & RUSSELL, P.C.

7475 Wisconsin Avenue

Bethesda, MD 20814

 

Court Documents

#36

(#36) ORDER filed granting Motion to extend filing time [ # 35 ]. Number of days granted: 28. Response brief due 04/15/2021. Paper copy requirements are temporarily suspended unless the case is under pre-argument review or being scheduled for argument, in which case a total of four paper copies of formal briefs and appendices are required. Copies to all parties. [1000908137] [21-1005] EB [Entered: 03/02/2021 09:55 AM]

#35

(#35) MOTION by B.R. to extend filing time for response brief until April 15, 2021.. Date and method of service: 03/02/2021 ecf. [1000907958] [21-1005] Tejinder Singh [Entered: 03/02/2021 07:17 AM]

#34

(#34) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Daniel Woofter for B.R.. [1000899265] [21-1005] Daniel Woofter [Entered: 02/16/2021 11:48 AM]

#33

(#33) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Tejinder Singh for B.R.. [1000899260] [21-1005] Tejinder Singh [Entered: 02/16/2021 11:45 AM]

#32

(#32) BRIEF by F.C.S.B.; S.T.; A.F.; P.A.H.; T.B.; B.H.; M.P.F.; M.C.; F.T.; J.F.; C.K.; J.O. in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: OPENING. [1000899107] [21-1005]--[Edited 02/16/2021 by EB- docket text modified] Stuart Raphael [Entered: 02/16/2021 10:11 AM]

#31

(#31) JOINT APPENDIX (electronic and paper form) by F.C.S.B.;S.T.; A.F.; P.A.H.; T.B.; B.H.; M.P.F.; M.C.; F.T.; J.F.; C.K.; J.O. Digital media exhibit volume? No. [1000899105] [21-1005]--[Edited 02/16/2021 by EB- docket text modified] Stuart Raphael [Entered: 02/16/2021 10:10 AM]

#30

(#30) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by B.R.. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000881291] [21-1005] Thomas Sweeney [Entered: 01/14/2021 10:10 AM]

#29

(#29) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL for B.R.. [1000881284] [21-1005] Thomas Sweeney [Entered: 01/14/2021 10:07 AM]

#28

(#28) Amended DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by C.K.. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000879808] [21-1005] James Davis [Entered: 01/12/2021 11:49 AM]

#9

(#9) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Sona Rewari for F.C.S.B.. [1000878420] [21-1005] Sona Rewari [Entered: 01/08/2021 03:29 PM]

#8

(#8) DOCKETING STATEMENT by F.C.S.B.. [21-1005] Stuart Raphael [Entered: 01/08/2021 03:22 PM]

#7

(#7) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by F.C.S.B.. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000878218] [21-1005] Stuart Raphael [Entered: 01/08/2021 12:48 PM]

#6

(#6) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Stuart A. Raphael for F.C.S.B.. [1000878215] [21-1005] Stuart Raphael [Entered: 01/08/2021 12:46 PM]

#5

(#5) BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Bruce Michael Blanchard. Paper copy requirements are temporarily suspended unless the case is under pre-argument review or being scheduled for argument, in which case a total of four paper copies of formal briefs and appendices are required. Opening Brief and Appendix due 02/16/2021. Response Brief due 03/18/2021. [21-1005] EB [Entered: 01/05/2021 04:44 PM]

#4

(#4) DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case. Originating case number: 1:19-cv-00917-RDA-TCB. Mailed to: Bruce Michael Blanchard. [21-1005] EB [Entered: 01/05/2021 04:36 PM]

#3

(#3) FEE NOTICE issued to Ryan Michael Bates, Mr. Bruce Michael Blanchard, James F. Davis, Mr. Michael Eugene Kinney, James Paul Menzies Miller, Stuart Alan Raphael - after grant of permission to appeal. Originating case number: 1:19-cv-00917-RDA-TCB. Mailed to: Bruce Michael Blanchard. [21-1005] EB [Entered: 01/05/2021 04:33 PM]

#2

(#2) Case transferred from miscellaneous docket 20-480. [21-1005] EB [Entered: 01/05/2021 04:15 PM]

#1

(#4) DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case. Originating case number: 1:19-cv-00917-RDA-TCB. Mailed to: Bruce Michael Blanchard. [21-1005] EB [Entered: 01/05/2021 04:36 PM]

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) ORDER filed granting Motion to extend filing time [ # 35 ]. Number of days granted: 28. Response brief due 04/15/2021. Paper copy requirements are temporarily suspended unless the case is under pre-argument review or being scheduled for argument, in which case a total of four paper copies of formal briefs and appendices are required. Copies to all parties. [1000908137] [21-1005] EB [Entered: 03/02/2021 09:55 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) MOTION by B.R. to extend filing time for response brief until April 15, 2021.. Date and method of service: 03/02/2021 ecf. [1000907958] [21-1005] Tejinder Singh [Entered: 03/02/2021 07:17 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Daniel Woofter for B.R.. [1000899265] [21-1005] Daniel Woofter [Entered: 02/16/2021 11:48 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Tejinder Singh for B.R.. [1000899260] [21-1005] Tejinder Singh [Entered: 02/16/2021 11:45 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) BRIEF by F.C.S.B.; S.T.; A.F.; P.A.H.; T.B.; B.H.; M.P.F.; M.C.; F.T.; J.F.; C.K.; J.O. in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: OPENING. [1000899107] [21-1005]--[Edited 02/16/2021 by EB- docket text modified] Stuart Raphael [Entered: 02/16/2021 10:11 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) JOINT APPENDIX (electronic and paper form) by F.C.S.B.;S.T.; A.F.; P.A.H.; T.B.; B.H.; M.P.F.; M.C.; F.T.; J.F.; C.K.; J.O. Digital media exhibit volume? No. [1000899105] [21-1005]--[Edited 02/16/2021 by EB- docket text modified] Stuart Raphael [Entered: 02/16/2021 10:10 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by B.R.. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000881291] [21-1005] Thomas Sweeney [Entered: 01/14/2021 10:10 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL for B.R.. [1000881284] [21-1005] Thomas Sweeney [Entered: 01/14/2021 10:07 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) Amended DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by C.K.. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000879808] [21-1005] James Davis [Entered: 01/12/2021 11:49 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) Corrected APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by James F Davis for C.K.. [1000879800] [21-1005] James Davis [Entered: 01/12/2021 11:45 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Ryan M. Bates for F.C.S.B.. [1000878478] [21-1005] Ryan Bates [Entered: 01/08/2021 04:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Sona Rewari for F.C.S.B.. [1000878420] [21-1005] Sona Rewari [Entered: 01/08/2021 03:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) DOCKETING STATEMENT by F.C.S.B.. [21-1005] Stuart Raphael [Entered: 01/08/2021 03:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by F.C.S.B.. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000878218] [21-1005] Stuart Raphael [Entered: 01/08/2021 12:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Stuart A. Raphael for F.C.S.B.. [1000878215] [21-1005] Stuart Raphael [Entered: 01/08/2021 12:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Bruce Michael Blanchard. Paper copy requirements are temporarily suspended unless the case is under pre-argument review or being scheduled for argument, in which case a total of four paper copies of formal briefs and appendices are required. Opening Brief and Appendix due 02/16/2021. Response Brief due 03/18/2021. [21-1005] EB [Entered: 01/05/2021 04:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case. Originating case number: 1:19-cv-00917-RDA-TCB. Mailed to: Bruce Michael Blanchard. [21-1005] EB [Entered: 01/05/2021 04:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) FEE NOTICE issued to Ryan Michael Bates, Mr. Bruce Michael Blanchard, James F. Davis, Mr. Michael Eugene Kinney, James Paul Menzies Miller, Stuart Alan Raphael - after grant of permission to appeal. Originating case number: 1:19-cv-00917-RDA-TCB. Mailed to: Bruce Michael Blanchard. [21-1005] EB [Entered: 01/05/2021 04:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Case transferred from miscellaneous docket 20-480. [21-1005] EB [Entered: 01/05/2021 04:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:19-cv-00917-RDA-TCB. Case manager: EBorneisen. [21-1005] EB [Entered: 01/05/2021 04:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where T B A MEDICAL CENTER INC is a litigant

Latest cases where F.T. is a litigant

Latest cases where PAH CO is a litigant

Latest cases where C.K. is a litigant