This case was last updated from PACER on 12/18/2020 at 06:04:34 (UTC).

BP Exploration & Prodn, Inc., et al v. Claimant ID 100209074

Case Summary

On 10/19/2020 BP Exploration Prodn, Inc filed an Other - Environment lawsuit against Claimant ID 100209074. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-30650

  • Filing Date:

    10/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Environment

 

Party Details

Appellants

BP America Production Company

BP, P.L.C.

BP Exploration & Production, Incorporated

Appellee

Claimant ID 100209074

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorneys

George W. Hicks Jr.

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis, L.L.P.

1301 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20004

Aaron Lloyd Nielson

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis, L.L.P.

1301 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20004

Daniel A. Cantor

Attorney at Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer, L.L.P.

601 Massachusetts Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20001

James Andrew Langan Esq.

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis, L.L.P.

300 N. Lasalle Street

Chicago, IL 60654

Devin Chase Reid Esq.

Attorney at Liskow & Lewis, P.L.C.

701 Poydras Street, Hancock Whitney Center

New Orleans, LA 70139

Appellee Attorney

Stephen C. Olen Esq.

Attorney at Cunningham Bounds, L.L.C.

1601 Dauphin Street

Mobile, AL 36604

 

Court Documents

Open Document #2

DIS-4 Order

Open Document #1

MDT-1 Letter

Open Document

UNOPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellants BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Incorporated and BP, P.L.C. to dismiss appeal pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 42 [9442878-2]. Date of service: 11/16/2020 via US mail - Attorney for Appellant: Cantor; email - Attorney for Interested Parties: Creevy, Gisleson, Herman, Hron, Quackenbos, Roy; Attorney for Appellee: Olen; Attorney for Appellant: Reid [20-30650] (Devin Chase Reid ) [Entered: 11/16/2020 08:51 AM]

Open Document

BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 12/14/2020 for Appellants BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Incorporated and BP, P.L.C.. [20-30650] (DDL) [Entered: 11/03/2020 01:39 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Devin Chase Reid, Esq. for BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Incorporated and BP, P.L.C. for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [20-30650] (Devin Chase Reid ) [Entered: 10/29/2020 02:14 PM]

Open Document

LETTER filed by Appellants BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Incorporated and BP, P.L.C. withdrawing Messrs. Hicks, Nielson, and Langan as counsel. Date of Service: 10/27/2020 via US mail - Attorney for Appellant: Cantor; email - Attorney for Interested Parties: Creevy, Gisleson, Herman, Hron, Quackenbos, Roy; Attorney for Appellants: Hicks, Langan, Nielson, Reid; Attorney for Appellee: Olen [20-30650] (George W. Hicks Jr.) [Entered: 10/27/2020 04:36 PM]

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT ORDER received advising transcript unnecessary for appeal purposes. [20-30650] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellants BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Incorporated and BP, P.L.C. advising transcript unnecessary for appeal purposes. Date of Service: 10/23/2020 via US mail - Attorney for Appellant: Cantor; email - Attorney for Interested Parties: Creevy, Gisleson, Herman, Hron, Quackenbos, Roy; Attorney for Appellants: Hicks, Langan, Nielson, Reid; Attorney for Appellee: Olen [20-30650] (Devin Chase Reid ) [Entered: 10/23/2020 01:57 PM]

Open Document #2

Non Dispositive Court Order

Open Document #1

MOT-69 Cover Letter

Open Document

INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9428105-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [20-30650] (SEP) [Entered: 10/23/2020 12:48 PM]

Open Document

PRIVATE CIVIL FEDERAL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Incorporated and BP, P.L.C. [20-30650] (SEP) [Entered: 10/19/2020 09:54 AM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK ORDER granting Motion to dismiss appeal pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 42 filed by Appellants BP Exploration & Production, Incorporated, BP America Production Company and BP, P.L.C. [ # 9442878-2 ] [20-30650] (RLL) [Entered: 11/16/2020 10:01 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUNOPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellants BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Incorporated and BP, P.L.C. to dismiss appeal pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 42 [9442878-2]. Date of service: 11/16/2020 via US mail - Attorney for Appellant: Cantor; email - Attorney for Interested Parties: Creevy, Gisleson, Herman, Hron, Quackenbos, Roy; Attorney for Appellee: Olen; Attorney for Appellant: Reid [20-30650] (Devin Chase Reid ) [Entered: 11/16/2020 08:51 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 12/14/2020 for Appellants BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Incorporated and BP, P.L.C.. [20-30650] (DDL) [Entered: 11/03/2020 01:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • DocketELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Admitted Exhibits on File in District Court? Yes. Video/Audio Exhibits on File in District Court? No Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [20-30650] (DDL) [Entered: 11/03/2020 01:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Devin Chase Reid for Appellant BP, P.L.C. in 20-30650, Attorney Devin Chase Reid for Appellant BP America Production Company in 20-30650, Attorney Devin Chase Reid for Appellant BP Exploration & Production, Incorporated in 20-30650 [20-30650] (RLL) [Entered: 11/03/2020 09:15 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Devin Chase Reid, Esq. for BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Incorporated and BP, P.L.C. for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [20-30650] (Devin Chase Reid ) [Entered: 10/29/2020 02:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED from District Court for 2:20-CV-2340. Electronic ROA due on 11/12/2020. [20-30650] (RLL) [Entered: 10/28/2020 12:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketATTORNEY NOT PARTICIPATING. George W. Hicks, Jr., James Andrew Langan, Aaron Lloyd Nielson are designated as inactive in this case. Reason: remove per letter filed 10/27/2020; other counsel remain to represent appellants. [20-30650] (RLL) [Entered: 10/28/2020 09:50 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER filed by Appellants BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Incorporated and BP, P.L.C. withdrawing Messrs. Hicks, Nielson, and Langan as counsel. Date of Service: 10/27/2020 via US mail - Attorney for Appellant: Cantor; email - Attorney for Interested Parties: Creevy, Gisleson, Herman, Hron, Quackenbos, Roy; Attorney for Appellants: Hicks, Langan, Nielson, Reid; Attorney for Appellee: Olen [20-30650] (George W. Hicks Jr.) [Entered: 10/27/2020 04:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT ORDER received advising transcript unnecessary for appeal purposes. [20-30650] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellants BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Incorporated and BP, P.L.C. advising transcript unnecessary for appeal purposes. Date of Service: 10/23/2020 via US mail - Attorney for Appellant: Cantor; email - Attorney for Interested Parties: Creevy, Gisleson, Herman, Hron, Quackenbos, Roy; Attorney for Appellants: Hicks, Langan, Nielson, Reid; Attorney for Appellee: Olen [20-30650] (Devin Chase Reid ) [Entered: 10/23/2020 01:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT ORDER vacating the order dated 09/08/2015 in Case No. 13-30843. The clerk will open future appeals stemming from the discretionary review of settlement claims under seal only when the underlying case was sealed by the district court. The parties are to file a motion requesting to seal this case (or matters in this case), if necessary. (IN DETAIL). [20-30650] (SEP) [Entered: 10/23/2020 12:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9428105-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [20-30650] (SEP) [Entered: 10/23/2020 12:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRIVATE CIVIL FEDERAL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Incorporated and BP, P.L.C. [20-30650] (SEP) [Entered: 10/19/2020 09:54 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BP AMERICA PRODUCTION COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where BP, P.L.C. is a litigant

Latest cases where BP EXPLORATION & PRODUCTION, INCORPORATED is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stephen C. Olen Esq.