This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 11/04/2019 at 06:03:22 (UTC).

BP Exploration & Prodn, Inc., et al v. Claimant ID 100049831

Case Summary

On 09/05/2019 BP Exploration Prodn, Inc filed an Other - Environment lawsuit against Claimant ID 100049831. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-30730

  • Filing Date:

    09/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Environment

 

Party Details

Appellants

BP AMERICA PRODUCTION COMPANY

BP, P.L.C.

BP EXPLORATION & PRODUCTION, INCORPORATED

Appellee

CLAIMANT ID 100049831

Hernando, MS 38632

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorneys

George W. Hicks Jr.

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis, L.L.P.

1301 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20004

Daniel A. Cantor

Attorney at Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer, L.L.P.

601 Massachusetts Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20001

James Andrew Langan Esq.

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis, L.L.P.

300 N. Lasalle Street

Chicago, IL 60654

Devin Chase Reid Esq.

Attorney at Liskow & Lewis, P.L.C.

701 Poydras Street, Hancock Whitney Center

New Orleans, LA 70139

Don Keller Haycraft

Attorney at Liskow & Lewis, P.L.C.

701 Poydras Street, Hancock Whitney Center

New Orleans, LA 70139

Andrew David Bergman

Attorney at Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer, L.L.P.

700 Louisiana Street

Houston, TX 77002-2755

Appellee Attorneys

Claimant ID 100049831

P.O. Box 248

Hernando, MS 38632

Jennifer Holifield

Attorney at Speegle, Hoffman, Holman & Holifield, L.L.C.

5 Dauphin Street, P.O. Box 11

Mobile, AL 36601-0000

Jerome E. Speegle

Attorney at Speegle, Hoffman, Holman & Holifield, L.L.C.

5 Dauphin Street, P.O. Box 11

Mobile, AL 36601-0000

 

Court Documents

Open Document

LETTER filed by Appellants BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Incorporated and BP, P.L.C. Removing counsel. Date of Service: 10/28/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Bergman, Haycraft, Hicks, Langan, Reid; Attorney for Interested Parties: Creevy, Gisleson, Herman, Hron, Quackenbos, Roy; Attorney for Appellees: Holifield, Speegle; US mail - Attorney for Appellant: Cantor [19-30730] (George W. Hicks Jr.) [Entered: 10/28/2019 09:10 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-30730] (Andrew David Bergman ) [Entered: 10/23/2019 11:13 AM]

Open Document

BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 11/12/2019 for Appellants BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Incorporated and BP, P.L.C.. [19-30730] (DDL) [Entered: 10/03/2019 12:49 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-30730] (Jerome E. Speegle ) [Entered: 09/18/2019 11:22 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-30730] (Jennifer Holifield ) [Entered: 09/18/2019 11:20 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-30730] (Don Keller Haycraft ) [Entered: 09/11/2019 04:43 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Devin Chase Reid, Esq. for BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Incorporated and BP, P.L.C. for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-30730] (Devin Chase Reid ) [Entered: 09/11/2019 04:38 PM]

Open Document #2

Non Dispositive Court Order

Open Document #1

MOT-69 Cover Letter

Open Document

INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9140323-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [19-30730] (SEP) [Entered: 09/09/2019 03:19 PM]

Open Document

PRIVATE CIVIL FEDERAL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Incorporated and BP, P.L.C. [19-30730] (SEP) [Entered: 09/05/2019 10:35 AM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/28/2019
  • ATTORNEY NOT PARTICIPATING. George W. Hicks, Jr. is designated as inactive in this case. Reason:see letter filed this date. [19-30730] (AGL) [Entered: 10/28/2019 09:29 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • LETTER filed by Appellants BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Incorporated and BP, P.L.C. Removing counsel. Date of Service: 10/28/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Bergman, Haycraft, Hicks, Langan, Reid; Attorney for Interested Parties: Creevy, Gisleson, Herman, Hron, Quackenbos, Roy; Attorney for Appellees: Holifield, Speegle; US mail - Attorney for Appellant: Cantor [19-30730] (George W. Hicks Jr.) [Entered: 10/28/2019 09:10 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Andrew David Bergman for Appellant BP, P.L.C., Appellant BP America Production Company, Appellant BP Exploration & Production, Incorporated in case 19-30730 [19-30730] (AGL) [Entered: 10/23/2019 02:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-30730] (Andrew David Bergman ) [Entered: 10/23/2019 11:13 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 11/12/2019 for Appellants BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Incorporated and BP, P.L.C.. [19-30730] (DDL) [Entered: 10/03/2019 12:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Exhibits on File in District Court? Yes. Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [19-30730] (DDL) [Entered: 10/03/2019 12:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED FROM DISTRICT COURT for 2:19-CV-11653. Electronic ROA due on 10/16/2019. [19-30730] (AGL) [Entered: 10/01/2019 07:59 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Jerome E. Speegle for Appellee Claimant ID 100049831 in case 19-30730 [19-30730] (AGL) [Entered: 09/19/2019 07:04 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Jennifer S. Holifield for Appellee Claimant ID 100049831 in 19-30730 [19-30730] (AGL) [Entered: 09/19/2019 07:02 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-30730] (Jerome E. Speegle ) [Entered: 09/18/2019 11:22 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-30730] (Jennifer Holifield ) [Entered: 09/18/2019 11:20 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Devin Chase Reid for Appellant BP, P.L.C. in 19-30730, Attorney Devin Chase Reid for Appellant BP America Production Company in 19-30730, Attorney Devin Chase Reid for Appellant BP Exploration & Production, Incorporated in 19-30730 [19-30730] (AGL) [Entered: 09/12/2019 11:55 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Don Keller Haycraft for party(s) Appellant BP, P.L.C. Appellant BP America Production Company Appellant BP Exploration & Production, Incorporated, in case 19-30730 [19-30730] (MRW) [Entered: 09/12/2019 11:16 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-30730] (Don Keller Haycraft ) [Entered: 09/11/2019 04:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Devin Chase Reid, Esq. for BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Incorporated and BP, P.L.C. for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-30730] (Devin Chase Reid ) [Entered: 09/11/2019 04:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COURT ORDER vacating the order dated 09/08/2015 in Case No. 13-30843. The clerk will open future appeals stemming from the discretionary review of settlement claims under seal only when the underlying case was sealed by the district court. The parties are to file a motion requesting to seal this case (or matters in this case), is necessary. (IN DETAIL). [19-30730] (SEP) [Entered: 09/09/2019 03:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9140323-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [19-30730] (SEP) [Entered: 09/09/2019 03:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PRIVATE CIVIL FEDERAL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Incorporated and BP, P.L.C. [19-30730] (SEP) [Entered: 09/05/2019 10:35 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BP, P.L.C. is a litigant

Latest cases where BP EXPLORATION & PRODUCTION, INCORPORATED is a litigant

Latest cases where BP AMERICA PRODUCTION COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrew David Bergman