This case was last updated from PACER on 01/22/2021 at 06:04:50 (UTC).

BP Engy v. Global Hlth Tech Grp

Case Summary

On 11/23/2020 BP Engy filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Global Hlth Tech Grp. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-20610

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellants

Global Health Technology Group, L.L.C.

Greg Lindberg

Plaintiff / Appellee

BP Energy Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Aaron Zachary Tobin

Attorney at Condon Tobin Sladek Thornton, P.L.L.C.

8080 Park Lane

Dallas, TX 75231

David Steven Coale Esq.

Attorney at Lynn Pinker Hurst & Schwegmann, L.L.P.

2100 Ross Avenue

Dallas, TX 75201

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Kenneth Eugene Broughton Jr.

Attorney at Reed Smith, L.L.P.

811 Main Street

Houston, TX 77002

Robert Alan York

Attorney at Reed Smith, L.L.P.

811 Main Street

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

Open Document

DISCOUNT OF 10% invoked. Transcript Order: Court Reporter: Fred E. Warner. To avoid further action the transcript must be filed by 02/03/2021. Transcript Due/Court Reporter Discount Date updated to 02/03/2021 for Fred E. Warner, Court Reporter [20-20610] (CAG) [Entered: 01/15/2021 09:12 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [20-20610] (David Steven Coale ) [Entered: 01/04/2021 04:34 PM]

Open Document

Attorney David S. Coale is advised to resubmit an appearance form to include complete address of law firm. Also, office and cell phone numbers on appeaance form differ from what is listed in PACER. [20-20610] (LBM) [Entered: 01/04/2021 04:14 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [20-20610] (David Steven Coale ) [Entered: 01/04/2021 01:08 PM]

Open Document #2

Transcript Order Form

Open Document #1

Reptr-1 Letter

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Kenneth Eugene Broughton, Jr. for BP Energy Company for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [20-20610] (Kenneth Eugene Broughton Jr.) [Entered: 12/08/2020 02:36 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [20-20610] (Robert Alan York ) [Entered: 12/08/2020 02:28 PM]

Open Document

ATTORNEY TRANSCRIPT ORDER form filed by Appellants Global Health Technology Group, L.L.C. and Mr. Greg Lindbergfor the Court to process. Date of service: 12/04/2020 via email - Attorney for Appellee: Broughton; Attorney for Appellant: Tobin. [20-20610] (Aaron Zachary Tobin ) [Entered: 12/04/2020 03:08 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [20-20610] (Aaron Zachary Tobin ) [Entered: 12/04/2020 03:04 PM]

Open Document

INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9450545-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Transcript order due on 12/10/2020 for Appellants Global Health Technology Group, L.L.C. and Greg Lindberg [20-20610] (DMS) [Entered: 11/25/2020 02:23 PM]

Open Document

PRIVATE CIVIL DIVERSITY CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants Global Health Technology Group, L.L.C. and Mr. Greg Lindberg [20-20610] (ABT) [Entered: 11/23/2020 02:13 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISCOUNT OF 10% invoked. Transcript Order: Court Reporter: Fred E. Warner. To avoid further action the transcript must be filed by 02/03/2021. Transcript Due/Court Reporter Discount Date updated to 02/03/2021 for Fred E. Warner, Court Reporter [20-20610] (CAG) [Entered: 01/15/2021 09:12 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) David Steven Coale for party(s) Appellant Global Health Technology Group, L.L.C. Appellant Greg Lindberg, in case 20-20610 [20-20610] (CAG) [Entered: 01/05/2021 08:45 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [20-20610] (David Steven Coale ) [Entered: 01/04/2021 04:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAttorney David S. Coale is advised to resubmit an appearance form to include complete address of law firm. Also, office and cell phone numbers on appeaance form differ from what is listed in PACER. [20-20610] (LBM) [Entered: 01/04/2021 04:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [20-20610] (David Steven Coale ) [Entered: 01/04/2021 01:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNO COURT REPORTER ACKNOWLEDGMENT RECEIVED for Mr. Fred E. Warner. Transcript Order: Court Reporter: Fred E. Warner, Dt. Ct. Rprt. Time Begins: 12/04/2020. Transcript deadlines created - Ct. Reporter Acknowledgment deadline canceled. Transcript Due/Court Reporter Discount Date is 01/04/2021 for Fred E. Warner, Court Reporter [20-20610] (CAG) [Entered: 12/23/2020 08:53 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Kenneth Eugene Broughton Jr. for Appellee BP Energy Company in 20-20610 [20-20610] (CAG) [Entered: 12/09/2020 10:07 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Robert Alan York for party(s) Appellee BP Energy Company, in case 20-20610 [20-20610] (CAG) [Entered: 12/09/2020 10:05 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Kenneth Eugene Broughton, Jr. for BP Energy Company for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [20-20610] (Kenneth Eugene Broughton Jr.) [Entered: 12/08/2020 02:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [20-20610] (Robert Alan York ) [Entered: 12/08/2020 02:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Aaron Zachary Tobin for Appellant Greg Lindberg in 20-20610, Attorney Aaron Zachary Tobin for Appellant Global Health Technology Group, L.L.C. in 20-20610 [20-20610] (ABT) [Entered: 12/07/2020 01:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellants Global Health Technology Group, L.L.C. and Mr. Greg Lindberg. DETAILS: Transcript Order: Court Reporter: Fred E. Warner, Proceeding Type and Date: Hearing 09/16/2020. Transcript Order ddl satisfied. Ct. Reporter Acknowledgment due on 12/17/2020 for Fred Warner, Court Reporter. Electronic Filing Processed: [ # 9456278-2 ] [20-20610] (ABT) [Entered: 12/07/2020 01:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketATTORNEY TRANSCRIPT ORDER form filed by Appellants Global Health Technology Group, L.L.C. and Mr. Greg Lindbergfor the Court to process. Date of service: 12/04/2020 via email - Attorney for Appellee: Broughton; Attorney for Appellant: Tobin. [20-20610] (Aaron Zachary Tobin ) [Entered: 12/04/2020 03:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [20-20610] (Aaron Zachary Tobin ) [Entered: 12/04/2020 03:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9450545-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Transcript order due on 12/10/2020 for Appellants Global Health Technology Group, L.L.C. and Greg Lindberg [20-20610] (DMS) [Entered: 11/25/2020 02:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRIVATE CIVIL DIVERSITY CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants Global Health Technology Group, L.L.C. and Mr. Greg Lindberg [20-20610] (ABT) [Entered: 11/23/2020 02:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BP Energy Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kenneth E. Broughton, Jr

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert Alan York