This case was last updated from PACER on 05/10/2019 at 06:06:31 (UTC).

Boumekpor v. Wal-Mart Stores East, LP

Case Summary

On 03/11/2019 Boumekpor filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, First Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1256

  • Filing Date:

    03/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, First Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

DONNE K. BOUMEKPOR

West Springfield, MA 01089

Defendant / Appellee

WAL-MART STORES EAST, LP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Donne K. Boumekpor

65 Craig Dr

West Springfield, MA 01089

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Richard J. Marks

Attorney at Littler Mendelson PC

1 International Pl, Ste 2700

Boston, MA 02110-0000

Stephen T. Melnick III

Attorney at Littler Mendelson PC

1 International Pl, Ste 2700

Boston, MA 02110-0000

 

Court Documents

Open Document #1

Abbreviated Record

Open Document

SUPPLEMENTAL record filed. Docket entries: Doc. No. 33 (Voluntary Dismissal). [19-1256] (TS) [Entered: 03/26/2019 09:25 AM]

Open Document #3

Notice Regarding Native PDF

Open Document

ORDER to Show Cause entered directing appellant to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed as untimely. Show cause response due 03/28/2019. [19-1256] (TS) [Entered: 03/14/2019 02:03 PM]

Open Document #5

Notice to Counsel and Pro Se Litigants

Open Document

MANDATE issued. [19-1256] (TS) [Entered: 04/08/2019 10:52 AM]

Open Document #4

Transcript Report/Order Form

Open Document #2

Case Opening Notice

Open Document #2

Certificate of Service

Open Document

MOTION to dismiss case filed by Appellant Donne K. Boumekpor. Certificate of service was not included. [19-1256] (TS) [Entered: 03/26/2019 09:27 AM]

Open Document

JUDGMENT dismissing case pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 42(b). 19-1256 42b [19-1256] (TS) [Entered: 04/08/2019 10:51 AM]

Open Document #1

Main Document

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MANDATE issued. [19-1256] (TS) [Entered: 04/08/2019 10:52 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT dismissing case pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 42(b). 19-1256 42b [19-1256] (TS) [Entered: 04/08/2019 10:51 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION to dismiss case filed by Appellant Donne K. Boumekpor. Certificate of service was not included. [19-1256] (TS) [Entered: 03/26/2019 09:27 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUPPLEMENTAL record filed. Docket entries: Doc. No. 33 (Voluntary Dismissal). [19-1256] (TS) [Entered: 03/26/2019 09:25 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Wal-Mart Stores East, LP filed by Attorney Stephen T. Melnick. Certificate of service dated 03/25/2019. [19-1256] (STM) [Entered: 03/25/2019 11:06 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER to Show Cause entered directing appellant to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed as untimely. Show cause response due 03/28/2019. [19-1256] (TS) [Entered: 03/14/2019 02:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #27) filed by Appellant Donne K. Boumekpor. Transcript Report/Order form due 03/25/2019. [19-1256]. CLERK'S NOTE: Docket entry was edited to modify the docket text. (TS) [Entered: 03/11/2019 03:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.