This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 12/01/2022 at 05:18:39 (UTC).

Bose Corporation v. KOSS Corporation

Case Summary

On 11/29/2022 Bose Corporation filed an Other lawsuit against KOSS Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    23-1191

  • Filing Date:

    11/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Appellant

BOSE CORPORATION

Appellee

KOSS CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

Michael N. Rader

Attorney at Wolf Greenfield & Sacks, PC

605 Third Avenue

New York, NY 10158

Appellee Attorney

Mark G. Knedeisen

Attorney at K&L Gates LLP

K&L Gates Center, 210 Sixth Avenue

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

 

Court Documents

#1

Notice of Docketing

1 #2

Agency Case Docketed

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/29/2022
  • Docket(#2) Note to File: The following cases are consolidated: 23-1173 (Lead) with 23-1191 (Cross-Appeal). The parties must file all documents in the lead appeal only. [886918] [23-1173, 23-1191] [ALK] [Entered: 11/29/2022 12:26 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 11/18/2022. [886915] Entry of Appearance is due on 12/13/2022. Certificate of Interest is due on 12/13/2022. Docketing Statement is due on 12/13/2022. Certified List is due on 01/09/2023. [ALK] [Entered: 11/29/2022 12:22 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less