This case was last updated from PACER on 04/20/2020 at 06:05:10 (UTC).

Boon Sia v. Dane Field

Case Summary

On 02/20/2020 Boon Sia filed an Other lawsuit against Dane Field. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals - Bankruptcy, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-1036

  • Filing Date:

    02/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals - Bankruptcy, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Appellant

BOON HAN SIA

Honolulu, HI 96818

Debtor

In re: ADAM LEE

Appellee

DANE S. FIELD, Trustee

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

Boon Han Sia

4172 Halupa Street

Honolulu, HI 96818

Appellee Attorney

Enver W. Painter Jr.

1188 Bishop Street

Honolulu, HI 96813

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) Filed CONDITIONAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL (Deputy Clerk; vjw);( lack of prosecution). Re: Appellant Boon Han Sia's opening brief due 04/29/2020. (VJ) [Entered: 04/15/2020 01:27 PM]

#4

(#4) Certificate of readiness received. (VJ) [Entered: 03/25/2020 10:22 AM]

#3

(#3) Sent BRIEFING ORDER & NOTICE to appellant Boon Han Sia. Copies to all parties. Appellant Boon Han Sia's opening brief due 04/09/2020. (VJ) [Entered: 02/24/2020 01:37 PM]

#2

Bankruptcy Court Notice Form

2 #1

Opening Letter

#1

(#1) Received notice of appeal filed in Bankruptcy Court on 02/14/2020, notice of referral, transmittal form. (VJ) [Entered: 02/24/2020 12:40 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Filed CONDITIONAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL (Deputy Clerk; vjw);( lack of prosecution). Re: Appellant Boon Han Sia's opening brief due 04/29/2020. (VJ) [Entered: 04/15/2020 01:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Certificate of readiness received. (VJ) [Entered: 03/25/2020 10:22 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Sent BRIEFING ORDER & NOTICE to appellant Boon Han Sia. Copies to all parties. Appellant Boon Han Sia's opening brief due 04/09/2020. (VJ) [Entered: 02/24/2020 01:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice to all parties and Bankruptcy Court RE: BAP Case number assigned:HI- 20-1036. (VJ) [Entered: 02/24/2020 01:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Received notice of appeal filed in Bankruptcy Court on 02/14/2020, notice of referral, transmittal form. (VJ) [Entered: 02/24/2020 12:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DANE S. FIELD, Chapter 7 Trustee is a litigant