This case was last updated from PACER on 09/14/2019 at 06:04:45 (UTC).

BookIT Oy v. Bank of America Corporation

Case Summary

On 07/16/2019 BookIT Oy filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Bank of America Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-2142

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.

BANK OF AMERICA CORPORATION

Plaintiff / Appellant

BOOKIT OY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

M. Brett Johnson Esq.

Attorney at Fish & Richardson PC

1717 Main Street, Suite 5000

Dallas, TX 75201

Katherine Marcom

Attorney at Winston & Strawn LLP

2121 N Pearl Street, Suite 900

Dallas, TX 75201

George C. Lombardi Esq.

Attorney at Winston & Strawn LLP

35 West Wacker Drive

Chicago, IL 60601

Dustin James Edwards

Attorney at Winston & Strawn LLP

4111 Lehigh Avenue

Houston, TX 77005

Samantha Maxfield Lerner

Attorney at Winston & Strawn LLP

35 West Wacker Drive

Chicago, IL 60601

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Scott Cole

Attorney at McKool Smith, PC

300 W 6Th Street

Austin, TX 78701

Joel Lance Thollander

Attorney at McKool Smith, PC

300 W 6Th Street

Austin, TX 78701

Richard Alan Kamprath

Attorney at McKool Smith, PC

300 Crescent Court

Dallas, TX 75201

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) Entry of appearance for Joel L. Thollander as of counsel for Appellant BookIT Oy. Service: 07/30/2019 by email. [624668] [19-2142] [Joel Thollander] [Entered: 07/30/2019 04:49 PM]

#7

(#7) Entry of appearance for George C. Lombardi as principal counsel for Appellees Bank of America Corporation and Bank of America, N.A.. Service: 07/30/2019 by email. [624687] [19-2142] [George Lombardi] [Entered: 07/30/2019 06:53 PM]

#10

(#10) Entry of appearance for Dustin J. Edwards as of counsel for Appellees Bank of America Corporation and Bank of America, N.A.. Service: 07/30/2019 by email. [624690] [19-2142] [Dustin Edwards] [Entered: 07/30/2019 07:04 PM]

#8

(#8) Certificate of Interest for Appellees Bank of America Corporation and Bank of America, N.A.. Service: 07/30/2019 by email. [624688] [19-2142] [George Lombardi] [Entered: 07/30/2019 06:58 PM]

#6

(#6) Entry of appearance for Richard Kamprath as of counsel for Appellant BookIT Oy. Service: 07/30/2019 by email. [624681] [19-2142] [Richard Kamprath] [Entered: 07/30/2019 05:15 PM]

#11

(#11) Entry of appearance for Katherine A. Marcom as of counsel for Appellees Bank of America Corporation and Bank of America, N.A.. Service: 07/30/2019 by email. [624691] [19-2142] [Katherine Marcom] [Entered: 07/30/2019 07:18 PM]

#9

(#9) Docketing Statement for the Appellees Bank of America Corporation and Bank of America, N.A.. Service: 07/30/2019 by email. [624689] [19-2142] [George Lombardi] [Entered: 07/30/2019 07:00 PM]

#4

(#4) Docketing Statement for the Appellant BookIT Oy. Service: 07/30/2019 by email. [624665] [19-2142] [Scott Cole] [Entered: 07/30/2019 04:47 PM]

#12

(#12) Entry of appearance for Samantha M. Lerner as of counsel for Appellees Bank of America Corporation and Bank of America, N.A.. Service: 07/30/2019 by email. [624693] [19-2142] [Samantha Lerner] [Entered: 07/30/2019 08:04 PM]

#1

Notice of Docketing

#2

(#2) Entry of appearance for Scott L. Cole as principal counsel for Appellant BookIT Oy. Service: 07/30/2019 by email. [624662] [19-2142] [Scott Cole] [Entered: 07/30/2019 04:41 PM]

#3

(#3) Certificate of Interest for Appellant BookIT Oy. Service: 07/30/2019 by email. [624664] [19-2142] [Scott Cole] [Entered: 07/30/2019 04:46 PM]

1 #2

Civil case docketed

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Entry of appearance for Samantha M. Lerner as of counsel for Appellees Bank of America Corporation and Bank of America, N.A.. Service: 07/30/2019 by email. [624693] [19-2142] [Samantha Lerner] [Entered: 07/30/2019 08:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Entry of appearance for Katherine A. Marcom as of counsel for Appellees Bank of America Corporation and Bank of America, N.A.. Service: 07/30/2019 by email. [624691] [19-2142] [Katherine Marcom] [Entered: 07/30/2019 07:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Entry of appearance for Dustin J. Edwards as of counsel for Appellees Bank of America Corporation and Bank of America, N.A.. Service: 07/30/2019 by email. [624690] [19-2142] [Dustin Edwards] [Entered: 07/30/2019 07:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Docketing Statement for the Appellees Bank of America Corporation and Bank of America, N.A.. Service: 07/30/2019 by email. [624689] [19-2142] [George Lombardi] [Entered: 07/30/2019 07:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Certificate of Interest for Appellees Bank of America Corporation and Bank of America, N.A.. Service: 07/30/2019 by email. [624688] [19-2142] [George Lombardi] [Entered: 07/30/2019 06:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Entry of appearance for George C. Lombardi as principal counsel for Appellees Bank of America Corporation and Bank of America, N.A.. Service: 07/30/2019 by email. [624687] [19-2142] [George Lombardi] [Entered: 07/30/2019 06:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Entry of appearance for Richard Kamprath as of counsel for Appellant BookIT Oy. Service: 07/30/2019 by email. [624681] [19-2142] [Richard Kamprath] [Entered: 07/30/2019 05:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Entry of appearance for Joel L. Thollander as of counsel for Appellant BookIT Oy. Service: 07/30/2019 by email. [624668] [19-2142] [Joel Thollander] [Entered: 07/30/2019 04:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Docketing Statement for the Appellant BookIT Oy. Service: 07/30/2019 by email. [624665] [19-2142] [Scott Cole] [Entered: 07/30/2019 04:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Certificate of Interest for Appellant BookIT Oy. Service: 07/30/2019 by email. [624664] [19-2142] [Scott Cole] [Entered: 07/30/2019 04:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Entry of appearance for Scott L. Cole as principal counsel for Appellant BookIT Oy. Service: 07/30/2019 by email. [624662] [19-2142] [Scott Cole] [Entered: 07/30/2019 04:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 07/09/2019. [621185] Entry of Appearance due 07/30/2019. Certificate of Interest is due on 07/30/2019. Docketing Statement due 07/30/2019. Appellant's brief is due 09/16/2019. [TAM] [Entered: 07/16/2019 08:41 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.