This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 02/07/2020 at 06:01:08 (UTC).

Bonnie Kenny, et al v. University of Delaware, et al

Case Summary

On 12/09/2019 Bonnie Kenny filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against University of Delaware. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-3818

  • Filing Date:

    12/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellants

BONNIE J. KENNY

CINDY GREGORY

Defendant / Appellees

CHRISSI RAWAK, individually and in her capacity as Athletic Director of the University of Delaware

UNIVERSITY OF DELAWARE

THOMAS LAPENTA, individually and in his capacity as Human Resources Director

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

James H. McMackin Esq. III

Attorney at Morris James

500 Delaware Avenue, Suite 1500

Wilmington, DE 19801

Allyson B. DiRocco Esq.

Attorney at Morris James

500 Delaware Avenue, Suite 1500

Wilmington, DE 19801

David H. Williams Esq.

Attorney at Morris James

500 Delaware Avenue, Suite 1500

Wilmington, DE 19801

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

James D. Taylor Esq. Jr.

Attorney at Saul Ewing Arnstein & Lehr

1201 North Market Street, Suite 2300

Wilmington, DE 19801

Jessica M. Jones Esq.

Attorney at Saul Ewing Arnstein & Lehr

1201 North Market Street, Suite 2300

Wilmington, DE 19801

Christina D. Riggs Esq.

Attorney at Saul Ewing Arnstein & Lehr

1500 Market Street, Centre Square West, 38Th Floor

Philadelphia, PA 19102

 

Court Documents

25 #2

Proposed Order Granting Motion to File Partially Sealed Appendix

25 #1

Motion(s)

24 #2

Briefing and Scheduling Order

24 #1

Standing Order

Open Document

ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Christina D. Riggs on behalf of Appellee(s) University of Delaware, Chrissi Rawak, Thomas LaPenta. [19-3818] (CDR) [Entered: 12/24/2019 09:22 AM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Jessica M. Jones on behalf of Appellee(s) University of Delaware, Chrissi Rawak, Thomas LaPenta. [19-3818] (JMJ) [Entered: 12/23/2019 11:30 AM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Chrissi Rawak. [19-3818] (JDT) [Entered: 12/23/2019 11:28 AM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Thomas Lapenta. [19-3818] (JDT) [Entered: 12/23/2019 11:27 AM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee University of Delaware. [19-3818] (JDT) [Entered: 12/23/2019 11:26 AM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from James D. Taylor, Jr. on behalf of Appellee(s) University of Delaware, Chrissi Rawak, Thomas LaPenta. [19-3818] (JDT) [Entered: 12/23/2019 11:25 AM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellants Bonnie J. Kenny and Cindy Gregory advising this court that transcripts are already on file in the District Court. [19-3818] (ABD) [Entered: 12/16/2019 03:58 PM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Cindy Gregory. [19-3818] (ABD) [Entered: 12/16/2019 03:54 PM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Bonnie J. Kenny. [19-3818] (ABD) [Entered: 12/16/2019 03:45 PM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellants Bonnie J. Kenny and Cindy Gregory. [19-3818] (ABD) [Entered: 12/16/2019 03:41 PM]

Open Document #6

Order Granting Defendnts' Motion Dismiss in Part Dated 02-22-2018

Open Document #5

Memorandum Opinion Dated 02-22-2018

Open Document #4

Judgment Dated 11-08-2019

Open Document #3

Order Granting Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment Dated 11-08-2019

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) ECF FILER: JOINT Motion filed by Appellants Cindy Gregory and Bonnie J. Kenny to seal Appendix - Partial. Certificate of Service dated 01/17/2020. Service made by ECF. [19-3818] (ABD) [Entered: 01/17/2020 12:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED. Brief on behalf of Appellants Cindy Gregory and Bonnie J. Kenny due on or before 02/11/2020. Appendix due on or before 02/11/2020. (MB) [Entered: 01/02/2020 08:10 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Christina D. Riggs on behalf of Appellee(s) University of Delaware, Chrissi Rawak, Thomas LaPenta. [19-3818] (CDR) [Entered: 12/24/2019 09:22 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Jessica M. Jones on behalf of Appellee(s) University of Delaware, Chrissi Rawak, Thomas LaPenta. [19-3818] (JMJ) [Entered: 12/23/2019 11:30 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Chrissi Rawak. [19-3818] (JDT) [Entered: 12/23/2019 11:28 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Thomas Lapenta. [19-3818] (JDT) [Entered: 12/23/2019 11:27 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee University of Delaware. [19-3818] (JDT) [Entered: 12/23/2019 11:26 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from James D. Taylor, Jr. on behalf of Appellee(s) University of Delaware, Chrissi Rawak, Thomas LaPenta. [19-3818] (JDT) [Entered: 12/23/2019 11:25 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellants Bonnie J. Kenny and Cindy Gregory advising this court that transcripts are already on file in the District Court. [19-3818] (ABD) [Entered: 12/16/2019 03:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Cindy Gregory. [19-3818] (ABD) [Entered: 12/16/2019 03:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Bonnie J. Kenny. [19-3818] (ABD) [Entered: 12/16/2019 03:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellants Bonnie J. Kenny and Cindy Gregory. [19-3818] (ABD) [Entered: 12/16/2019 03:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellants Bonnie J. Kenny and Cindy Gregory. [19-3818] (ABD) [Entered: 12/16/2019 03:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Allyson B. DiRocco on behalf of Appellant(s) Bonnie J. Kenny and Cindy Gregory. [19-3818] (ABD) [Entered: 12/16/2019 03:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from David H. Williams on behalf of Appellant(s) Bonnie J. Kenny and Cindy Gregory. [19-3818] (ABD) [Entered: 12/16/2019 03:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketRECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (MB) [Entered: 12/09/2019 08:55 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellants Cindy Gregory and Bonnie J. Kenny in District Court No. 1-17-cv-01156. (MB) [Entered: 12/09/2019 08:49 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where University of Delaware is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jessica M. Jones Esq.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christina D. Riggs

Latest cases represented by Lawyer James Darlington Taylor, Jr.